Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 280 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2187 Week
» 20969 Month
» 269262 Year
» 1153643 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5017   11/07/1932

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/07/1932 ST DONAT'S CASTLE
26/04/1954 THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT 28TH 61ST

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 11/07/1932 to Taunton (TN)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off Gloucester Horton Road (85B)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 30 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Hawksworth 4,000g 4037 01/01/1901 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2609 07/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2426 22/11/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2406 09/02/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2637 30/06/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2631 24/03/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2534 10/06/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2784 24/09/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2554 28/11/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 8 wheeled 4,000g 2586 23/06/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2615 17/12/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2884 14/02/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2866 30/07/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4005 28/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4054 19/05/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4005 30/01/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2729 29/01/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2929 10/02/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4040 05/01/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2601 29/09/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4058 01/07/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2848 06/03/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2777 12/01/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TN Taunton (New) 11/07/1932
CDF Cardiff Canton 09/11/1932
PDN Old Oak Common m/e 11/1933
LA Laira 29/12/1934
NA Newton Abbot m/e 01/1935
LA Laira 05/03/1936
NA Newton Abbot 08/07/1937
WOS Worcester 01/04/1939
SDN Swindon 14/02/1947
WOS Worcester m/e 04/1947
85B Gloucester Horton Road m/e 10/1951
   Withdrawn 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 8w/e 03/11/1951
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/07/1932 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6604)
29/02/1936 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4621)
10/06/1940 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4624)
23/06/1944 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6663)
17/12/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4655)
14/02/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4657)
30/07/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4642)
19/05/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6655)
29/01/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6647)
05/01/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6670)
06/03/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6602)
12/01/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6687)
07/09/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6665)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 26/09/1933 11/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 27/10/1934 29/12/1934 64 days Intermediate 169631
Swindon Works 06/03/1935 09/03/1935 4 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 16/01/1936 05/03/1936 50 days General
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
243600
Swindon Works 20/01/1937 11/02/1937 23 days Light Repair
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/04/1937 28/04/1937 17 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 20/05/1937 08/07/1937 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2637 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
319908
Swindon Works 02/02/1939 01/04/1939 59 days Intermediate
Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
419714
Swindon Works 23/04/1940 15/06/1940 54 days General
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2534 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
491195
Swindon Works 27/08/1941 29/09/1941 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2784 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 13/10/1942 01/12/1942 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2554 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
616403
Swindon Works 09/05/1944 27/06/1944 50 days General
Boiler number 6663 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2586 (Collett 8 wheeled 4,000g) attached.
698069
Swindon Works 14/11/1945 17/12/1945 34 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
773241
Swindon Works 17/01/1947 14/02/1947 29 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2884 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
838612
Swindon Works 08/06/1948 30/07/1948 53 days General
Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2866 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
902736
Swindon Works 18/04/1950 19/05/1950 32 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4054 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1002304
Swindon Works 01/01/1951 30/01/1951 30 days Unclassified
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 19/12/1951 29/01/1952 42 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1093152
Swindon Works 21/11/1952 10/02/1953 82 days Light Casual
Tender number 2929 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 02/12/1953 05/01/1954 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4040 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1186911
Swindon Works 14/08/1954 16/09/1954 34 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 26/10/1954 15/11/1954 21 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 23/08/1955 29/09/1955 38 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1268988
Swindon Works 30/11/1956 06/03/1957 97 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2848 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1328116
Swindon Works 13/11/1958 12/01/1959 61 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2777 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1432451
Swindon Works 27/06/1960 07/09/1960 73 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
1506521

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/01/1901 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4037    
07/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2609    
11/07/1932 To Service To service as GWR Number 5017, name: ST DONAT'S CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Taunton (TN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
09/11/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
26/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/09/1933. Dep: ?/11/1933.    
11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
22/11/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2426    
27/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/10/1934. Dep: 29/12/1934.    
29/12/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
01/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
06/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/03/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935.    
16/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1936. Dep: 05/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
   
05/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
20/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1937. Dep: 11/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/04/1937. Dep: 28/04/1937.    
20/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/05/1937. Dep: 08/07/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2637 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
02/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/02/1939. Dep: 01/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/04/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
23/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2534 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1941. Dep: 29/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2784 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1942. Dep: 01/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2554 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1944. Dep: 27/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6663 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2586 (Collett 8 wheeled 4,000g) attached.
   
14/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/11/1945. Dep: 17/12/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2615 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/01/1947. Dep: 14/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2884 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
08/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1948. Dep: 30/07/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2866 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/01/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4005    
18/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/04/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4054 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
01/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/01/1951. Dep: 30/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
19/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1951. Dep: 29/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/11/1952. Dep: 10/02/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2929 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/12/1953. Dep: 05/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4040 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
26/04/1954 Naming Renamed 'THE GLOUCESTERSHIRE REGIMENT 28TH 61ST'    
14/08/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1954. Dep: 16/09/1954.    
26/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/10/1954. Dep: 15/11/1954.    
23/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1955. Dep: 29/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/07/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4058    
30/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/11/1956. Dep: 06/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2848 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1958. Dep: 12/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2777 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/06/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/06/1960. Dep: 07/09/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
   
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5017 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev