Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 580 Today
» 1134 Yesterday
» 1714 Week
» 21447 Month
» 318461 Year
» 395048 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5018 27/06/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24018 04/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 27/06/1959
Withdrawn 16/08/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys
Cut Up 01/06/1976
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 27/06/1959
17A Derby w/e 27/06/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 26/09/1959
1B Camden w/e 17/10/1959
1E Bletchley w/e 03/01/1966
5A Crewe Diesel w/e 26/03/1966
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 01/10/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 10/06/1967
66A Polmadie w/e 09/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 16/08/1975


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
27/06/1959 To Service To service as D5018
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
17/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
25/02/1961 Sightings Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop.   Link
16/03/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel erecting shop.   Link
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
26/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
10/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
04/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24018    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
16/08/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24018    
01/06/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev