Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1016 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6614 Week
» 29120 Month
» 332310 Year
» 1553875 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5018 on 28/07/1932

Names Carried
Date From Name
28/07/1932 ST MAWES CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 280
To Service Tue 28/07/1932 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 10/03/1964 off Reading (W.R.) (81D)
Scrapping During 11/1964 at Cohens (Kettering)
Service Life 31 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2610 28/07/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2608 10/09/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2534 25/11/1933 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2587 05/05/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2534 20/10/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2643 02/04/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2558 10/11/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2415 11/12/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2664 26/08/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2666 13/04/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2617 05/12/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2395 12/10/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2632 16/09/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 12/01/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2550 18/06/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2602 12/07/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2702 11/03/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2782 01/09/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2886 11/08/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2837 19/12/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2865 15/04/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2594 04/12/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4058 09/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2601 01/07/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2759 10/05/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2885 10/04/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2925 27/10/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4118 01/11/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2625 03/1964 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) on 28/07/1932
NA Newton Abbot on 23/01/1936
PDN Old Oak Common on 07/04/1936
SRD Stafford Road m/e 02/1945
82A Bristol Bath Road on 07/07/1950
82C Swindon on 23/09/1950
85B Gloucester Horton Road m/e 01/1951
86C Cardiff Canton m/e 10/1952
85B Gloucester Horton Road m/e 10/1952
81D Reading (W.R.) m/e 03/1958
   Withdrawn on 10/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 04/11/1950
ALLOC 85A Worcester w/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 14/07/1951
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   on 10/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/07/1932 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6605)
13/12/1934 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4636)
26/08/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6607)
12/10/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6605)
18/06/1946 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4637)
11/03/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4648)
01/09/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4624)
09/12/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6607)
15/04/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6686)
10/05/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7617)
01/11/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7632)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 29/11/1932 10/12/1932 12 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 04/10/1933 11/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 24/10/1934 24/12/1934 62 days General
Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA)
165827
Swindon Works 20/02/1936 07/04/1936 48 days Intermediate
Tender number 2643 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
247689
Swindon Works 12/11/1936 15/12/1936 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 19/07/1937 04/09/1937 48 days General
Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2664 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
333912
Swindon Works 20/02/1939 18/04/1939 58 days Intermediate
Tender number 2666 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
437627
Swindon Works 12/10/1940 10/12/1940 60 days Intermediate
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
532760
Swindon Works 12/08/1942 14/10/1942 64 days General
Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2395 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
621974
Swindon Works 21/11/1944 12/01/1945 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
702774
Swindon Works 14/05/1946 18/06/1946 36 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2550 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
802126
Swindon Works 06/02/1948 11/03/1948 35 days General
Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2702 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
879006
Swindon Works 28/07/1949 01/09/1949 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2782 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
950968
Swindon Works 15/11/1951 19/12/1951 35 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2837 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1028324
Swindon Works 02/03/1953 15/04/1953 45 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2865 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1100831
Swindon Works 18/01/1955 09/03/1955 51 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4058 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1179879
Swindon Works 03/01/1957 10/05/1957 128 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7617 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2759 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1265292
Swindon Works 23/01/1959 10/04/1959 78 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2885 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1348506
Swindon Works 02/09/1961 01/11/1961 61 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7632 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4118 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1441686

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender SLS/194804
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910
22/07/1956 Tests on the Severn Bridge The largest locomotive at the moment allowed over the bridge of the former Severn and Wye Railway is the G.W.R. mogul (2-6-0) as used on the passenger trains which travel this way on Sundays during period of winter time table when the Severn Tunnel is closed for maintenance purposes. On Sundays, 15th and 22nd July, tests took place with Castles 5018 an 5042, presumably for stresses and clearances. On a former date, a 500 ton load of ballast wagons was pushed on to the bridge by the Castles and then the locomotives themselves carried out a series of runs on the spans to west side (i.e. Severn Bridge station side) SLS/195608
17/09/1961 Swindon Works ('A' Shop) 'A' Shop: D604, D816/7/21/3/5/43/70, D3431, D6306/8/21, 2866, 3852, 4003/79/81/7/9, D1000-11, D2379-83, 4117, 4707, 4904/26/33/43/66/79/92/8, 5018/38/74/92, 5208, 5380, 6021/6, 6808/16/25/32/4/40, 6948, 7018/28, 7219, 7825, 7905/21, 13115/84/6, 13259/65, 92215/26. Works Sidings: D820, D2086, D2143/4, D2378, D7000, 1009, 3670, 3839/59, 4100, 4917/8/83, 5000/78, 5951/98, 6014/6/9/27, 6964/87/96, 7200, 7756/75, 7909, 8721, 9400, 9749, 73027, 78008, 92241/5. Triangle: 1640, 5087, 5198, 5516, 5934/75, 8762/72/87, 9751, 13355. Dump: 1361/6, 1433, 1604, 5318, 6720, 7745/98, 8429, 8740/74/7/89, 9735/6/67. 'C' Shop: 4203, 5110/95. Outside Stock Shed: D806, D4025, D6303, 4948, 5815, 6900. Weigh House : Nil. Outside Weigh House: D801. Gasworks : Nil. SLS/196111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2610    
28/07/1932 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5018, name: ST MAWES CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
10/09/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2608    
29/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/11/1932. Dep: 10/12/1932.    
04/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/10/1933. Dep: 00/11/1933.    
25/11/1933 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2534    
05/05/1934 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2587    
20/10/1934 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2534    
24/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1934. Dep: 24/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA)
   
23/01/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
20/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1936. Dep: 07/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2643 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/04/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
10/11/1936 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2558    
12/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1936. Dep: 15/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2415 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/07/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1937. Dep: 04/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2664 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1939. Dep: 18/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2666 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/10/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1940. Dep: 10/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1942. Dep: 14/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2395 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/09/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2632    
21/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/11/1944. Dep: 12/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
14/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/05/1946. Dep: 18/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2550 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/07/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2602    
06/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1948. Dep: 11/03/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2702 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/07/1949. Dep: 01/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2782 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
11/08/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2886    
15/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 19/12/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2837 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
02/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/03/1953. Dep: 15/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6686 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2865 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/12/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2594    
18/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 09/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4058 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
01/07/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2601    
03/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/01/1957. Dep: 10/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7617 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2759 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
23/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1959. Dep: 10/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2885 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/10/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2925    
02/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/09/1961. Dep: 01/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7632 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4118 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
03/1964 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2625    
10/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5018 from Reading (W.R.) (81D)    

prev prev