Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 313 Today
» 1189 Yesterday
» 3775 Week
» 23508 Month
» 320522 Year
» 397109 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5019 11/07/1959
TOPS (Tops) 24019 05/1974

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Derby Works
To Service 11/07/1959
Withdrawn 05/10/1975
Time in Service 16 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys
Cut Up 01/05/1978
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
5B Crewe South (New) 11/07/1959
17A Derby w/e 11/07/1959
5B Crewe South w/e 26/09/1959
1B Camden w/e 17/10/1959
1E Bletchley w/e 03/01/1966
D01 London Division 18/04/1966
D02 Birmingham Division w/e 09/07/1966
D05 Stoke Division w/e 10/06/1967
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1969
55A Holbeck (MR) (Reinstated) w/e 11/10/1969
52A Gateshead w/e 08/05/1971
66A Polmadie w/e 16/10/1971
65A Eastfield 5w/e 01/04/1972
   Stored 5w/e 26/07/1975
   Withdrawn 05/10/1975

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
 


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
11/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Derby (17A)    
11/07/1959 To Service To service as D5019
Built at Derby Works
Allocated to Crewe South (5B)
   
26/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
17/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Camden (1B)    
15/12/1961 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Test house. SLS 1/1962 Link
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962 Link
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bletchley (1E)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to London Division (D01)    
09/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02)    
10/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05)    
01/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D5019    
11/10/1969 Reinstated Reinstated to Holbeck (MR) (55A)    
08/05/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
16/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
01/04/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
05/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 24019    
26/07/1975 Allocation      
26/07/1975 To Store To Store    
05/10/1975 Withdrawn Condemned as 24019    
01/05/1978 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev