Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 862 Today
» 879 Yesterday
» 1741 Week
» 10483 Month
» 354662 Year
» 865764 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5019   24/07/1932

Names Carried
Date From Name
24/07/1932 TREAGO CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 24/07/1932 to Swindon (SDN)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off Stafford Road (84A)
Scrapping During 09/1962
Service Life 30 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2611 07/1932 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2579 27/03/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2631 09/06/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2774 28/01/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2597 12/06/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2617 03/09/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2725 26/01/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2550 06/03/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2685 27/06/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2411 24/02/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4059 08/06/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4048 10/03/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4011 04/11/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4047 20/09/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2780 08/05/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 03/03/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SDN Swindon (New) 24/07/1932
LA Laira 19/08/1932
NA Newton Abbot 11/1933
LA Laira 13/12/1937
PDN Old Oak Common 05/02/1939
BRD Bristol Bath Road 17/06/1940
Brd Weston-super-Mare 04/1948
BRD Bristol Bath Road 05/1948
84A Stafford Road 08/05/1958
   Withdrawn 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/07/1932 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6606)
09/06/1936 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6601)
28/01/1939 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4642)
26/01/1944 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4636)
06/03/1946 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4648)
24/02/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4607)
18/10/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6610)
08/06/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6666)
10/03/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6684)
04/11/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6614)
20/09/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6634)
08/05/1958 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4629)
03/03/1961 Double Chimney fitted
03/03/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 9600)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 29/09/1933 11/1933   Intermediate  
Swindon Works 22/01/1935 05/04/1935 74 days Intermediate
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
161620
Swindon Works 05/05/1936 20/06/1936 47 days General
Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
234535
Swindon Works 26/10/1937 13/12/1937 49 days Intermediate 323641
Swindon Works 06/12/1938 05/02/1939 62 days General
Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
395580
Swindon Works 07/05/1940 17/06/1940 42 days Intermediate
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
476966
Swindon Works 07/07/1942 08/09/1942 64 days Intermediate
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
573494
Swindon Works 22/12/1943 30/01/1944 40 days General
Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
648822
Swindon Works 31/01/1946 06/03/1946 35 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2550 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
748560
Swindon Works 15/06/1946 27/06/1946 13 days Light Repair
Tender number 2685 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/01/1948 24/02/1948 34 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
829047
Swindon Works 19/09/1949 18/10/1949 30 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB)
913335
Swindon Works 15/05/1951 08/06/1951 25 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4059 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
0
Swindon Works 02/02/1953 10/03/1953 37 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6684 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4048 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1087414
Swindon Works 04/10/1954 04/11/1954 32 days Heavy General  
Swindon Works 22/05/1956 20/09/1956 122 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4047 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1267223
Swindon Works 30/10/1956 23/11/1956 25 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 24/03/1958 08/05/1958 46 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2780 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1359548
Swindon Works 04/01/1961 03/03/1961 59 days Heavy General
Boiler number 9600 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1454424

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1932 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2611    
24/07/1932 To Service To service as GWR Number 5019, name: TREAGO CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Swindon (SDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
19/08/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
29/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 29/09/1933. Dep: ?/11/1933.    
11/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
22/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/01/1935. Dep: 05/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1937. Dep: 13/12/1937.    
13/12/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
06/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1938. Dep: 05/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
07/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/05/1940. Dep: 17/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
07/07/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/07/1942. Dep: 08/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2617 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1943. Dep: 30/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/01/1946. Dep: 06/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2550 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1946. Dep: 27/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2685 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/01/1948. Dep: 24/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4607 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Weston-super-Mare (Brd)    
05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
19/09/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/09/1949. Dep: 18/10/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB)
   
15/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/05/1951. Dep: 08/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4059 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
02/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/02/1953. Dep: 10/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6684 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4048 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/11/1953 Modification Diagram HB number 6614 boiler fitted    
04/11/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4011    
04/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 04/11/1954.    
22/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/05/1956. Dep: 20/09/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4047 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
30/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1956. Dep: 23/11/1956.    
24/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1958. Dep: 08/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2780 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
04/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/01/1961. Dep: 03/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9600 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5019 from Stafford Road (84A)    

prev prev