|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 11/06/1934 | 17/06/1934 | 7 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 14/01/1936 | 07/03/1936 | 54 days | Intermediate | 123648 | ||
Swindon Works | 23/07/1937 | 17/09/1937 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
212917 | |
Swindon Works | 03/11/1937 | 09/12/1937 | 37 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 15/01/1938 | 12/02/1938 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 21/05/1938 | 25/06/1938 | 36 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 23/01/1939 | 03/02/1939 | 12 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 08/05/1939 | 26/06/1939 | 50 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2621 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
311686 | |
Swindon Works | 25/09/1940 | 20/11/1940 | 57 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2563 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
398982 | |
Swindon Works | 11/12/1940 | 23/12/1940 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 12/11/1941 | 19/11/1941 | 8 days | Fitting of GWR Automatic Train Control (ATC) | |||
Swindon Works | 14/09/1942 | 31/10/1942 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 4625 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
492162 | |
Swindon Works | 04/09/1944 | 27/10/1944 | 54 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
598542 | |
Swindon Works | 29/04/1946 | 30/05/1946 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
675536 | |
Swindon Works | 06/06/1946 | 13/06/1946 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 25/03/1948 | 30/04/1948 | 37 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 03/02/1950 | 10/03/1950 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
832906 | |
Swindon Works | 03/09/1951 | 10/10/1951 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6639 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4078 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
916145 | |
Swindon Works | 08/06/1953 | 06/08/1953 | 60 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2385 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1012186 | |
Swindon Works | 28/02/1955 | 07/04/1955 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1106994 | |
Swindon Works | 16/04/1955 | 26/04/1955 | 11 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Swindon Works | 31/12/1956 | 01/05/1957 | 122 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7631 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1201518 | |
Swindon Works | 22/12/1958 | 10/02/1959 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4100 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1281398 | |
Swindon Works | 15/02/1961 | 20/04/1961 | 65 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4089 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1352543 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1942 | Chirk Castle gives fine performance | Recently 5025 Chirk Castle took 15 coaches, crammed with passengers, to Paddington arriving 15 mins. early after 4 mins. late start from Bath; 126 mins. for 145-min. schedule. Load must have been near 500 tons. Climb to Corsham slow but steady. Left Chippenham 12-48 p.m., Swindon arr. 1.7, dep. 1.10 (on time). Run to Reading was very fast, and from Slough were obviously killing time. Crowded compartment prevented fuller details. At Paddington, witnessed the unusual sight of a middle-aged lady congratulating the crew on the early arrival. | SLS/194302 |
31/01/1943 | Sheds noted 1/43 | 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). | SLS/194302 |
31/10/1946 | General | The 12 noon Bristol to Paddington is always double headed (except Friday and Saturday). Locos, noted recently 6962 piloted by 5025 (15/10); 1005 piloted by 4073 (5/9); and 6968 piloted by 5019 (23/10). On 16/11 the 4.10 p.m. Paddington to Birkenhead was worked by 1003 (pilot) and 4053 | SLS/194701 |
31/03/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. | SLS/194805 |
19/02/1961 | Swindon Works (Works Yard) | Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/04/1934 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5025, name: CHIRK CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
11/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1934. Dep: 17/06/1934. | ||
14/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/01/1936. Dep: 07/03/1936. | ||
07/03/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
17/09/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Taunton (TN) | ||
10/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
23/07/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1937. Dep: 17/09/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
03/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/11/1937. Dep: 09/12/1937. | ||
15/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938. | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2396 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/01/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/01/1939. Dep: 03/02/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/05/1939. Dep: 26/06/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2621 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/09/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/09/1940. Dep: 20/11/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2563 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/12/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/12/1940. Dep: 23/12/1940. | ||
12/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Fitting of GWR Automatic Train Control (ATC)) - Arr: 12/11/1941. Dep: 19/11/1941. | ||
14/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4625 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/09/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/09/1944. Dep: 27/10/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/1945 | Allocation | |||
10/11/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
29/04/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1946. Dep: 30/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/06/1946. Dep: 13/06/1946. | ||
06/1947 | Allocation | |||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
07/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
09/1947 | Allocation | |||
08/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
25/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/03/1948. Dep: 30/04/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/02/1950. Dep: 10/03/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2654 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westbury (82D) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
24/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
30/04/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 10/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6639 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4078 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/01/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2811 | ||
06/05/1953 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2414 | ||
08/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/06/1953. Dep: 06/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2385 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/02/1955. Dep: 07/04/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/04/1955. Dep: 26/04/1955. | ||
05/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (82C) | ||
31/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/12/1956. Dep: 01/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7631 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxford (81F) | ||
22/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/12/1958. Dep: 10/02/1959. Work undertaken: Tender number 4100 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/02/1961. Dep: 20/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4089 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/12/1962 | To Store | To Store at Oxford (81F) | ||
29/10/1963 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Hereford (86C) | ||
13/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5025 from Hereford (86C) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |