Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 553 Today
» 1100 Yesterday
» 5809 Week
» 24392 Month
» 221909 Year
» 298496 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5027   12/05/1934

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/05/1934 FARLEIGH CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 12/05/1934 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 20/11/1962 off Llanelly (87F)
Scrapping During 09/1963 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 28 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2640 04/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2530 28/03/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2597 31/10/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2558 30/12/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2558 29/07/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2551 17/08/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2449 15/10/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2389 10/12/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2400 02/12/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2412 21/07/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2818 30/10/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2850 17/02/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2814 08/02/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2724 04/11/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2868 17/05/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2590 13/06/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2446 27/05/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4036 17/01/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2819 03/06/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2643 14/06/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2597 09/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2887 26/06/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2689 23/04/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2635 17/04/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Notes
Notes This loco was involved in a collision on 16th March, 1945 - details would be welcomed.

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 12/05/1934
84K Chester West 04/11/1950
84A Stafford Road 06/11/1951
82A Bristol Bath Road 06/1954
81A Old Oak Common 20/03/1958
87G Carmarthen 05/07/1961
87F Llanelly 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn 20/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84K Chester West 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 15/07/1961
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   20/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/05/1934 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6614)
30/12/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6612)
02/12/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4602)
21/07/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6636)
17/02/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4638)
08/02/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6624)
17/10/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6604)
13/06/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6611)
17/01/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6682)
03/06/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6670)
26/06/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6624)
17/04/1961 Double Chimney fitted
17/04/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 9602)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 16/05/1935 03/06/1935 19 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 11/02/1936 07/04/1936 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2530 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
118414
Swindon Works 06/10/1936 08/11/1936 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 15/11/1937 08/01/1938 55 days General
Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
236650
Swindon Works 05/06/1939 04/08/1939 61 days Intermediate
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
349591
Swindon Works 19/08/1940 25/10/1940 68 days Light Repair
Tender number 2449 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/10/1941 13/12/1941 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
461699
Swindon Works 19/10/1943 08/12/1943 51 days General
Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
564667
Swindon Works 06/06/1945 21/07/1945 46 days General
Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
645945
Swindon Works 09/10/1945 30/10/1945 22 days Light Repair
Tender number 2818 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/01/1947 17/02/1947 31 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2850 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
719140
Swindon Works 03/01/1949 08/02/1949 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
798561
Swindon Works 15/09/1950 04/11/1950 51 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6604 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2724 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
897805
Swindon Works 08/05/1952 13/06/1952 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6611 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
968532
Swindon Works 07/04/1954 27/05/1954 51 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2446 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1065119
Swindon Works 05/12/1955 17/01/1956 44 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4036 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1154606
Swindon Works 04/04/1957 03/06/1957 61 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1227471
Swindon Works 20/02/1959 26/06/1959 127 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2887 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1315041
Swindon Works 30/01/1961 17/04/1961 78 days Heavy General
Boiler number 9602 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2635 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1401325

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1934 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2640    
12/05/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 5027, name: FARLEIGH CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
16/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1935. Dep: 03/06/1935.    
11/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1936. Dep: 07/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2530 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/10/1936. Dep: 08/11/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/06/1939. Dep: 04/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/08/1940 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2551    
19/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/08/1940. Dep: 25/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2449 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1943. Dep: 08/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4602 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1945. Dep: 21/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/10/1945. Dep: 30/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2818 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/01/1947. Dep: 17/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4638 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2850 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/01/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/01/1949. Dep: 08/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/09/1950. Dep: 04/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6604 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2724 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (84K)    
06/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
08/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/05/1952. Dep: 13/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6611 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/04/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/04/1954. Dep: 27/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2446 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
05/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 17/01/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4036 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
04/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/04/1957. Dep: 03/06/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
14/06/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2643    
09/08/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2597    
20/02/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1959. Dep: 26/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2887 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/04/1960 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2689    
30/01/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 17/04/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 9602 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2635 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
05/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
20/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5027 from Llanelly (87F)    
09/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev