Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 605 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6210 Week
» 17757 Month
» 417439 Year
» 494026 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5029   28/05/1934

Names Carried
Date From Name
28/05/1934 NUNNEY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Sat 28/05/1934 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Sat 28/12/1963 off Cardiff East Dock (88A)
Service Life 29 yrs , 7 mths

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2642 05/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2428 17/11/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2614 10/01/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2534 11/03/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2614 17/06/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2533 20/04/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2637 14/02/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2765 10/03/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2628 02/04/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2847 14/08/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2867 07/06/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2631 01/02/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2445 31/12/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2663 27/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2840 21/11/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2397 22/06/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2780 11/09/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4007 25/07/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2934 20/08/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2601 04/05/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4056 19/06/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4086 18/10/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4082 02/08/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2594 24/04/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4117 22/03/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 28/05/1934
85A Worcester 20/03/1958
83A Newton Abbot 05/05/1959
83D Laira 04/11/1959
   Stored (Laira) 14/03/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock (Reinstated) 15/12/1962
   Withdrawn 28/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 16/05/1959
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   28/12/1963
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/05/1934 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6616)
17/06/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6608)
14/01/1941 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6632)
07/06/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6617)
01/02/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6676)
27/01/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6638)
25/07/1952 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4652)
18/10/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6636)
02/08/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6659)
22/03/1961 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6668)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 12/11/1934 08/12/1934 27 days Light Repair
Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/01/1936 18/03/1936 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2534 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
118078
Swindon Works 07/12/1936 12/12/1936 6 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 27/04/1937 20/06/1937 55 days General
Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2614 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
197534
Swindon Works 06/03/1939 21/04/1939 47 days Intermediate
Tender number 2533 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
311287
Swindon Works 04/01/1941 22/02/1941 50 days General
Boiler number 6632 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2637 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
411444
Swindon Works 26/08/1941 02/09/1941 8 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 07/02/1942 14/03/1942 36 days Light Repair
Tender number 2765 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/02/1943 08/04/1943 45 days Intermediate
Tender number 2628 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
512646
Swindon Works 25/06/1945 14/08/1945 51 days Intermediate
Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
615650
Swindon Works 06/05/1947 07/06/1947 33 days General
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
714704
Swindon Works 31/12/1948 01/02/1949 33 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
818460
Swindon Works 30/12/1949 27/01/1950 29 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 6638 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
874003
Swindon Works 11/10/1950 21/11/1950 42 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2840 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
918900
Swindon Works 06/06/1951 22/06/1951 17 days Light Casual
Tender number 2397 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 11/06/1952 25/07/1952 45 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1007877
Swindon Works 05/08/1952 20/08/1952 16 days Unclassified
Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 05/03/1954 04/05/1954 61 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1104113
Swindon Works 09/09/1955 18/10/1955 40 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4086 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1181720
Swindon Works 30/03/1957 02/08/1957 126 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4082 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1267308
Swindon Works 28/01/1959 24/04/1959 87 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2594 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1358951
Swindon Works 03/02/1961 22/03/1961 48 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6668 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4117 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1451673

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1934 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2642    
28/05/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 5029, name: NUNNEY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
12/11/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/01/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2614    
22/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/01/1936. Dep: 18/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2534 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1936. Dep: 12/12/1936.    
27/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1937. Dep: 20/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2614 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/03/1939. Dep: 21/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2533 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6632 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2637 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1941. Dep: 02/09/1941.    
07/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2765 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/02/1943. Dep: 08/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2628 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/06/1945. Dep: 14/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1947. Dep: 07/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/12/1948. Dep: 01/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2631 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1949. Dep: 27/01/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6638 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2445 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1950. Dep: 21/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2840 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/06/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/06/1951. Dep: 22/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2397 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/09/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2780    
11/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/06/1952. Dep: 25/07/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4652 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
05/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 20/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/03/1954. Dep: 04/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2601 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/06/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4056    
09/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/09/1955. Dep: 18/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4086 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
30/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/03/1957. Dep: 02/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4082 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
28/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/01/1959. Dep: 24/04/1959.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2594 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
04/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
03/02/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/02/1961. Dep: 22/03/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6668 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4117 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
14/03/1962 To Store To Store at Laira (83D)    
15/12/1962 Reinstated Reinstated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
28/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5029 from Cardiff East Dock (88A)    

prev prev