Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 597 Today
» 1024 Yesterday
» 6574 Week
» 22772 Month
» 187672 Year
» 698774 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5030   01/06/1934

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/06/1934 SHIRBURN CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 01/06/1934 to Exeter (EXE)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off Carmarthen (87G)
Scrapping During 10/1962 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 20 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2643 05/1934 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2652 05/05/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2605 28/02/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2386 15/02/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2388 19/12/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 06/09/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2578 31/08/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2686 02/11/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2435 06/04/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2673 20/09/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2917 04/07/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2625 02/07/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2725 01/09/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4005 09/02/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2546 20/09/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2706 15/07/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2544 26/04/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4048 06/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4018 01/04/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4052 11/07/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4092 06/11/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4052 04/12/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4104 11/08/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2802 29/03/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4005 17/12/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2751 27/01/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2744 25/03/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2643 06/10/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXE Exeter (New) 01/06/1934
CDF Cardiff Canton 14/05/1936
NPT Ebbw Junction (Newport) 03/1941
CDF Cardiff Canton 08/1942
87G Carmarthen 19/08/1958
87E Landore 16/06/1960
87G Carmarthen 07/09/1960
   Withdrawn 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 09/08/1958
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 18/06/1960
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 05/10/1960
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/06/1934 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6617)
06/09/1941 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6625)
04/07/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6637)
01/09/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6631)
20/09/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4645)
26/04/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6681)
01/04/1953 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4608)
20/05/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6660)
17/12/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6616)
27/01/1961 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6634)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 06/02/1935 17/02/1935 12 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/03/1936 14/05/1936 63 days Intermediate
Tender number 2652 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
110593
Swindon Works 18/01/1938 10/03/1938 52 days Intermediate
Tender number 2605 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
213915
Swindon Works 17/01/1939 23/02/1939 38 days Light Repair
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 13/11/1939 25/12/1939 43 days Intermediate
Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
320773
Swindon Works 04/07/1941 13/09/1941 72 days General
Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
414154
Swindon Works 15/07/1943 05/09/1943 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2578 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
497515
Swindon Works 20/10/1943 06/11/1943 18 days Running Repairs
Tender number 2686 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/03/1944 09/04/1944 38 days Light Repair
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/08/1944 20/09/1944 23 days Running Repairs
Tender number 2673 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/05/1945 04/07/1945 42 days General
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2917 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
570190
Swindon Works 01/06/1946 02/07/1946 32 days Light Repair
Tender number 2625 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 26/07/1947 01/09/1947 38 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6631 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
680980
Swindon Works 16/01/1948 09/02/1948 25 days Light Repair
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 19/08/1949 20/09/1949 33 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2546 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
772848
Swindon Works 20/03/1951 26/04/1951 38 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
869825
Swindon Works 23/02/1953 01/04/1953 38 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4018 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
986708
Swindon Works 13/04/1955 20/05/1955 38 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB)
1079873
Swindon Works 28/07/1955 11/08/1955 15 days Light Casual
Tender number 4104 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/12/1956 29/03/1957 100 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2802 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1177302
Swindon Works 08/11/1958 17/12/1958 40 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1275038
Swindon Works 29/11/1960 27/01/1961 60 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2751 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1353383

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1934 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2643    
01/06/1934 To Service To service as GWR Number 5030, name: SHIRBURN CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exeter (EXE)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
06/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/02/1935. Dep: 17/02/1935.    
13/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1936. Dep: 14/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2652 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/05/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
18/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/01/1938. Dep: 10/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2605 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/01/1939. Dep: 23/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1939. Dep: 25/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (NPT )    
04/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1941. Dep: 13/09/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
15/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 15/07/1943. Dep: 05/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2578 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 20/10/1943. Dep: 06/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2686 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1944. Dep: 09/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2435 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 29/08/1944. Dep: 20/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2673 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1945. Dep: 04/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2917 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/06/1946. Dep: 02/07/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2625 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/07/1947. Dep: 01/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6631 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2725 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/01/1948. Dep: 09/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
19/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/08/1949. Dep: 20/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2546 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/07/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2706    
20/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/03/1951. Dep: 26/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2544 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/09/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4048    
23/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 23/02/1953. Dep: 01/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4018 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/07/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4052    
06/11/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4092    
04/12/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4052    
13/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 20/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB)
   
28/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1955. Dep: 11/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4104 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/12/1956. Dep: 29/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2802 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/08/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
08/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/11/1958. Dep: 17/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
16/06/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
07/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
29/11/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/11/1960. Dep: 27/01/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2751 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/03/1961 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2744    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5030 from Carmarthen (87G)    
10/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    
06/10/1962 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2643    

prev prev