|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 03/02/1936 | 27/03/1936 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2640 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
114391 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1937 | 01/12/1937 | 85 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2409 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
232321 | |
Swindon Works | 17/10/1938 | 12/12/1938 | 57 days | Light Repair | Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB) |
296689 | |
Swindon Works | 18/07/1939 | 11/09/1939 | 56 days | Intermediate | 341002 | ||
Swindon Works | 21/02/1941 | 22/04/1941 | 61 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2721 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 02/04/1942 | 22/05/1942 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2413 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
466870 | |
Swindon Works | 26/03/1943 | 24/04/1943 | 30 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/02/1944 | 03/04/1944 | 49 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2812 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
555269 | |
Swindon Works | 08/09/1945 | 24/10/1945 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
629782 | |
Swindon Works | 03/04/1947 | 15/05/1947 | 43 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2449 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
692467 | |
Swindon Works | 12/11/1948 | 20/12/1948 | 39 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2845 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
776167 | |
Swindon Works | 27/07/1950 | 07/09/1950 | 43 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2697 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
858215 | |
Swindon Works | 15/05/1952 | 18/06/1952 | 35 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4013 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
940443 | |
Swindon Works | 13/10/1953 | 09/11/1953 | 28 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4041 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1017686 | |
Swindon Works | 29/12/1954 | 01/02/1955 | 35 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1077263 | |
Swindon Works | 24/11/1955 | 03/01/1956 | 41 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6679 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2545 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1120488 | |
Swindon Works | 03/10/1957 | 10/01/1958 | 100 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6632 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1204766 | |
Swindon Works | 24/04/1959 | 24/06/1959 | 62 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7654 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2855 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
1273020 | |
Swindon Works | 27/05/1961 | 08/08/1961 | 74 days | Light Intermediate | Tender number 2394 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1357375 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1943 | Sheds noted 1/43 | 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). | SLS/194302 |
30/11/1948 | Swindon Works | New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. | SLS/194901 |
23/07/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | 'A' Shop: D602/4, D805/11/28/70, D1000-11, D2137, D2372-9, D3257, D3431, D3744, D6306/11/9, 13186, 13264/5, 15100/2, 2829, 3817/43, 4090, 4922/8/56/78, 5000/1/31/49/60, 5306/51, 5903/4/36/9/67, 6000/4/7, 6363/95, 6871, 6919/46/59/86/97/8, 7020, 7209/15/21/2, 7826, 82031, 92226/34. Works Yard: D804/15/23/41/51/2, D2188/9/94, 1604/34/47, 2516, 3667/70, 3822/41, 4003, 4203, 4916/98, 5015/80/1, 5103/10/76/7/95, 5336, 5949, 6027, 6349, 6831, 6969, 7745/56/75/98, 8789/98, 9400/14, 9749, 78001/8. 92215/45. Triangle: 6021, 9736/67. Dump: 1361/2/4/6, 1419/33, 3657/76, 3724, 6426, 7700/61, 8429, 8705/22/40/77/96, 9735/62/71/81. 'C' Shop: 8457 intact, Outside 'C' Shop: 5771, 8726 being cut up. | SLS/196109 |
30/12/1962 | Western Regionboundary changes | The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. | SLS/196303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/05/1934 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5031, name: TOTNES CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Stafford Road (SRD) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
03/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1936. Dep: 27/03/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2640 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/09/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/09/1937. Dep: 01/12/1937. Work undertaken: Tender number 2409 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/10/1938. Dep: 12/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB) |
||
18/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/07/1939. Dep: 11/09/1939. | ||
21/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1941. Dep: 22/04/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2721 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1942. Dep: 22/05/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2413 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2579 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 15/02/1944. Dep: 03/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4618 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2812 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1945. Dep: 24/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2412 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/07/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2673 | ||
03/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/04/1947. Dep: 15/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2449 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stafford Road (SRD) | ||
12/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/11/1948. Dep: 20/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2845 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/07/1950. Dep: 07/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2697 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/09/1950 | To Store | To Store (Swindon Works) | ||
07/11/1950 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
15/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/05/1952. Dep: 18/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4013 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1953. Dep: 09/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4041 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1954. Dep: 01/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2856 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/02/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Chester West (84K) | ||
03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
24/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/11/1955. Dep: 03/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6679 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2545 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/10/1957. Dep: 10/01/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6632 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2747 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/04/1959. Dep: 24/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7654 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2855 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
27/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/05/1961. Dep: 08/08/1961. Work undertaken: Tender number 2394 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
22/10/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5031 from Oxley (2B) | ||
05/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Morriston |