|
|
Where Repaired | Date Stopped | Days Since Last Stopped | Works Entry | Departure | Class of Repair | Waiting Repair Decision | Waiting Works | On Works | Total Duration | Cost of Repair | Mileage | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Derby Works | 13/08/1962 | n/a | 19/08/1962 | 21/09/1962 | Light Casual | 34 days | £1,602.00 | 90,937 | ||||
Derby Works | 26/09/1962 | 5 days | 01/10/1962 | 27/10/1962 | Light Casual BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
27 days | £349.00 | 91,117 | ||||
Derby Works | 24/08/1963 | 301 days | 27/08/1963 | 25/11/1963 | Heavy Intermediate | 91 days | 131,113 |
Year | Annual Mileage | Cumulative Mileage | Fuel Oil Utilised | Approximate Miles/Gallon | Classified Wait Repair | Classified Wait Works | Classified On Works | Classified Total (Wkdys) | Running Repairs | Running Repair & Exams Cost | Wkdys Not Required for Service | Wkdys Stored Serviceable | Wkdys Stored Unserviceable | Total Weekdays Unavailable |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1959 | 3,876 | 3,876 | ||||||||||||
1960 | 28,943 | 32,819 | ||||||||||||
1961 | 65,007 | 97,826 | ||||||||||||
1962 | 99,234 | 197,060 | ||||||||||||
1963 | 135,118 | 332,178 |
Start | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/08/1959 | To Service | To service as British Railways number D5033 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
||
08/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
11/04/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Willesden (1A) | ||
19/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/08/1962. Dep: 21/09/1962. Stopped on 13/08/1962 |
||
01/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/10/1962. Dep: 27/10/1962. Stopped on 26/09/1962 Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted Modification: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
27/08/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Derby Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/08/1963. Dep: 25/11/1963. Stopped on 24/08/1963 |
||
30/11/1963 | Modification | Modification: Modify 'catch and stay' on water duct | ||
30/11/1963 | Modification | Modification: Providing auto-refuelling shut off valves | ||
30/11/1963 | Modification | Modification: Provision of discharge pipes | ||
11/07/1964 | Modification | Modification: Mods to Stone Vapour generator | ||
08/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) | ||
18/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to London Division (D01) | ||
05/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Birmingham Division (D02) | ||
12/08/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) | ||
06/1969 | Livery | Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front | ||
06/01/1970 | Modification | Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated | ||
30/08/1970 | Modification | Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated | ||
06/1971 | Modification | Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes | ||
03/1974 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 24033 | ||
09/08/1975 | To Store | To Store | ||
04/10/1975 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 24033 | ||
03/1977 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |