Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5034   21/05/1935

Names Carried
Date From Name
21/05/1935 CORFE CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 21/05/1935 to Newton Abbot (NA)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 27 yrs , 4 mths

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2670 18/05/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2655 28/07/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2718 06/02/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2535 14/02/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2755 02/07/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2764 03/01/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2646 20/03/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2396 18/11/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2553 17/04/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 3,500g 2253 27/11/1948 GWR 3,500g 5t 10cwt
Collett 4,000g 2862 04/01/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2416 04/11/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4011 01/11/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4122 24/12/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2650 29/04/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2889 21/04/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2594 12/02/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2718 23/03/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4059 07/08/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2597 02/06/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2643 09/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2862 05/06/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2740 10/02/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NA Newton Abbot (New) 21/05/1935
PZ Penzance m/e 01/1940
NA Newton Abbot m/e 06/1940
   Stored (Swindon) 09/10/1950
81A Old Oak Common (Reinstated) 11/11/1950
81D Reading (W.R.) m/e 12/1950
81A Old Oak Common m/e 12/1953
   Withdrawn 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/05/1935 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6621)
22/02/1939 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6622)
14/02/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6617)
20/03/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
18/11/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6668)
04/01/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4640)
09/10/1950 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4646)
29/04/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6660)
21/04/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6625)
12/02/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7642)
10/02/1961 Double Chimney fitted
10/02/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7699)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 03/06/1937 04/08/1937 63 days Intermediate
Tender number 2655 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
115357
Swindon Works 17/08/1938 15/09/1938 30 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 09/01/1939 27/02/1939 50 days General
Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB)
198357
Swindon Works 10/12/1940 10/02/1941 63 days Intermediate
Tender number 2718 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
288390
Swindon Works 03/01/1942 20/02/1942 49 days Light Repair
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2535 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
338386
Swindon Works 29/05/1942 03/07/1942 36 days Light Repair
Tender number 2755 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/12/1942 06/02/1943 47 days Intermediate
Tender number 2764 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
372817
Swindon Works 12/02/1945 20/03/1945 37 days General
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2646 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
460137
Swindon Works 16/10/1946 1 day Intermediate  
Swindon Works 02/12/1948 04/01/1949 34 days General
Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
613451
Swindon Works 04/09/1950 09/10/1950 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4646 (Diagram HA)
699597
Swindon Works 13/11/1952 24/12/1952 42 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4122 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
788004
Swindon Works 12/03/1954 29/04/1954 49 days Light Casual
Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
845795
Swindon Works 17/03/1955 21/04/1955 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2889 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
897071
Swindon Works 14/11/1956 12/02/1957 91 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7642 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2594 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
995796
Swindon Works 25/07/1957 07/08/1957 14 days Light Casual
Tender number 4059 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/04/1958 02/06/1958 56 days Light Casual
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 31/01/1959 05/06/1959 126 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1095488
Swindon Works 10/12/1960 10/02/1961 63 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7699 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2740 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1173906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
18/05/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2670    
21/05/1935 To Service To service as GWR Number 5034, name: CORFE CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Newton Abbot (NA)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
03/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/06/1937. Dep: 04/08/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2655 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/08/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1938. Dep: 15/09/1938.    
09/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1939. Dep: 27/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB)
   
01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Penzance (PZ)    
06/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
10/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1940. Dep: 10/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2718 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/01/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/01/1942. Dep: 20/02/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2535 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/05/1942. Dep: 03/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2755 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/12/1942. Dep: 06/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2764 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1945. Dep: 20/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2646 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/10/1946.    
18/11/1946 Modification Diagram HB number 6668 boiler fitted    
18/11/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2396    
17/04/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2553    
27/11/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 3,500g number 2253    
02/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1948. Dep: 04/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4640 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 09/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4646 (Diagram HA)
   
09/10/1950 To Store To Store at Swindon (SDN)    
04/11/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2416    
11/11/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
01/11/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4011    
13/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/11/1952. Dep: 24/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4122 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
12/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/03/1954. Dep: 29/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/03/1955. Dep: 21/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6625 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2889 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/11/1956. Dep: 12/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7642 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2594 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/03/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2718    
25/07/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/07/1957. Dep: 07/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4059 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
08/04/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1958. Dep: 02/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/08/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2643    
31/01/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/01/1959. Dep: 05/06/1959.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/12/1960. Dep: 10/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7699 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2740 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5034 from Old Oak Common (81A)    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev