Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 630 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18433 Week
» 71449 Month
» 190976 Year
» 3217829 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5037 |
07/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24037 |
31/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
07/09/1959 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
17/07/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
07/09/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1974 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
01/1972 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
01/1972 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/01/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
26/11/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Electrical overloads or arcs |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
20/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5037 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
01/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
31/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24037 |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
23/08/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
17/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24037 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|