Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 1925 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15331 Week
» 68347 Month
» 187874 Year
» 3214727 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5038 |
15/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24038 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
15/09/1959 to Ipswich (32B) |
Withdrawn |
17/07/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
06/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
15/09/1959 |
GSYP |
Two tone green with small yellow warning panel |
07/1965 |
GFYE |
Two tone green with full yellow ends |
by 06/1969 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
02/1974 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5038 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Ipswich (32B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
11/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
12/08/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24038 |
|
|
09/08/1975 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
20/12/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
28/02/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
17/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24038 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|