Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 463 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2950 Week
» 15463 Month
» 103655 Year
» 988036 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5038   21/06/1935

Names Carried
Date From Name
21/06/1935 MORLAIS CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 21/06/1935 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 17/09/1963 off Reading (W.R.) (81D)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 28 yrs, 2 mths , 27 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2671 06/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2667 04/05/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2670 13/05/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2653 10/02/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2537 17/03/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2441 04/05/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2868 12/07/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2429 24/03/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2797 12/05/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4009 20/12/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2589 09/11/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 25/02/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4004 18/08/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2879 09/04/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2749 12/03/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2636 19/01/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2649 09/10/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2674 21/05/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2909 02/12/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2386 06/07/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2423 27/05/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2893 24/02/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2547 05/08/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4083 04/10/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 21/06/1935
84G Shrewsbury 20/03/1958
81F Oxford 19/05/1962
81D Reading (W.R.) 03/11/1962
   Withdrawn 17/09/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 81F Oxford 4w/e 19/05/1962
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 03/11/1962
WDN   17/09/1963
WDN   4w/e 29/09/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
21/06/1935 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6625)
10/02/1941 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6644)
12/05/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4611)
20/12/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6648)
09/11/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6687)
18/08/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6678)
09/04/1952 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4621)
19/01/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6688)
27/05/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6624)
05/08/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6660)
04/10/1961 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6646)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 26/07/1935 12/08/1935 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 14/09/1935 29/09/1935 16 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 15/03/1937 17/05/1937 64 days Intermediate
Tender number 2667 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
121051
Swindon Works 20/03/1939 23/05/1939 65 days Intermediate
Tender number 2670 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
234273
Swindon Works 27/06/1939 08/07/1939 12 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 10/12/1940 16/02/1941 69 days General
Boiler number 6644 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
324579
Swindon Works 29/01/1943 19/03/1943 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2537 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
432026
Swindon Works 20/04/1943 15/05/1943 26 days Light Repair
Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/06/1943 18/07/1943 25 days Light Repair
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/03/1945 12/05/1945 45 days General
Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2797 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
531375
Swindon Works 12/11/1946 20/12/1946 39 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6648 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4009 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
635031
Swindon Works 11/10/1948 09/11/1948 30 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
739236
Swindon Works 04/02/1949 25/02/1949 22 days Light Casual
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 11/07/1950 18/08/1950 39 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4004 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
831575
Swindon Works 06/03/1952 09/04/1952 35 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2879 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
921541
Swindon Works 16/02/1953 12/03/1953 25 days Unclassified
Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/12/1953 19/01/1954 43 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1023162
Swindon Works 05/10/1954 04/11/1954 31 days Light Casual
Tender number 2649 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/10/1955 02/12/1955 35 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2909 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1123595
Swindon Works 31/12/1955 04/01/1956 5 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 10/05/1956 06/07/1956 58 days Light Casual
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/04/1957 27/05/1957 34 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2423 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1200656
Swindon Works 12/09/1957 05/11/1957 55 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 03/01/1958 24/02/1958 53 days Heavy Casual
Tender number 2893 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/04/1959 05/08/1959 108 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1292803
Swindon Works 05/08/1961 19/05/1962 288 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6646 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4083 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1374867

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2671    
21/06/1935 To Service To service as GWR Number 5038, name: MORLAIS CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
26/07/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/07/1935. Dep: 12/08/1935.    
14/09/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/09/1935. Dep: 29/09/1935.    
15/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 15/03/1937. Dep: 17/05/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2667 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/03/1939. Dep: 23/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2670 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1939. Dep: 08/07/1939.    
10/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/12/1940. Dep: 16/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6644 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 29/01/1943. Dep: 19/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2537 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/04/1943. Dep: 15/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/06/1943. Dep: 18/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/03/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2429    
29/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1945. Dep: 12/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2797 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/11/1946. Dep: 20/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6648 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4009 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1948. Dep: 09/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1949. Dep: 25/02/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/07/1950. Dep: 18/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4004 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
06/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/03/1952. Dep: 09/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4621 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2879 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1953. Dep: 12/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/12/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/12/1953. Dep: 19/01/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1954. Dep: 04/11/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2649 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/05/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2674    
29/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/10/1955. Dep: 02/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2909 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/12/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/12/1955. Dep: 04/01/1956.    
10/05/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1956. Dep: 06/07/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/04/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 27/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2423 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/09/1957. Dep: 05/11/1957.    
03/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 03/01/1958. Dep: 24/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2893 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
20/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/04/1959. Dep: 05/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/08/1961. Dep: 19/05/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6646 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4083 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
19/05/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (81F)    
03/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
17/09/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5038 from Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev