Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 775 Today
» 1106 Yesterday
» 7927 Week
» 27572 Month
» 62214 Year
» 1283779 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5039   25/06/1935

Names Carried
Date From Name
25/06/1935 RHUDDLAN CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 25/06/1935 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1964 off Cardiff East Dock (88A)
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 28 yrs, 11 mths , 21 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2672 22/06/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 17/10/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2719 21/01/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2638 15/04/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2655 07/01/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2677 30/12/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2567 24/02/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2592 09/07/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Churchward 3,500g 2141 14/12/1946 GWR 3,500g 7t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2782 24/12/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2790 22/09/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2588 29/12/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4000 10/05/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4035 01/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4054 30/01/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4082 21/09/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2897 12/10/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4099 10/09/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4081 23/11/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2400 24/05/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2740 27/03/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2572 08/12/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2643 18/01/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2744 06/10/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2694 13/07/1963 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 25/06/1935
87G Carmarthen m/e 06/1952
86C Cardiff Canton 23/11/1955
87G Carmarthen m/e 12/1955
81A Old Oak Common m/e 02/1956
87G Carmarthen m/e 03/1956
87E Landore m/e 06/1957
85A Worcester 30/12/1959
87E Landore 18/02/1960
87G Carmarthen 13/09/1960
87F Llanelly 09/02/1963
81A Old Oak Common 04/05/1963
87J Fishguard Goodwick 27/07/1963
   Stored (Fishguard Goodwick) 09/09/1963
88A Cardiff East Dock (Reinstated) 31/12/1963
   Withdrawn 15/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 18/06/1955
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 04/05/1963
ALLOC 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 27/07/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 31/12/1963
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 27/01/1964
WDN   w/e 15/06/1964
TOSTORE   3w/e 29/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
25/06/1935 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6626)
07/01/1941 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6613)
24/02/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6648)
14/12/1946 Converted to oil burnng
14/12/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6669)
22/09/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4637)
22/09/1948 Oil burning equipment removed
21/09/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6660)
12/10/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6610)
08/12/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6673)
27/03/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6636)
18/01/1962 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7613)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 07/04/1937 30/05/1937 54 days Intermediate 129392
Swindon Works 27/02/1939 17/04/1939 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2638 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
255389
Swindon Works 01/11/1940 18/01/1941 79 days General
Boiler number 6613 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2655 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
349458
Swindon Works 22/11/1942 01/01/1943 41 days Intermediate
Tender number 2677 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
456534
Swindon Works 13/01/1945 24/02/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 6648 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2567 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
551845
Swindon Works 05/06/1945 10/07/1945 36 days Light Repair
Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/10/1946 14/12/1946 47 days Intermediate
Converted to oil burning
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2141 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
Converted to oil burnng
646298
Swindon Works 10/08/1948 22/09/1948 44 days Light Repair
Converted back to coal burning
Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2790 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Oil burning equipment removed
694153
Swindon Works 25/11/1949 29/12/1949 35 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2588 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
739364
Swindon Works 10/05/1950 01/06/1950 23 days Unclassified
Tender number 4000 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/12/1950 30/01/1951 33 days Light Casual
Tender number 4054 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/08/1951 21/09/1951 33 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4082 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
831456
Swindon Works 08/09/1953 12/10/1953 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2897 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
946643
Swindon Works 11/10/1955 23/11/1955 44 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4081 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1042107
Swindon Works 29/12/1956 24/05/1957 147 days Light Intermediate
Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 25/01/1958 27/03/1958 62 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2740 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1141910
Swindon Works 19/10/1959 08/12/1959 51 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2572 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/11/1961 18/01/1962 70 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7613 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2643 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1325706

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
22/06/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2672    
25/06/1935 To Service To service as GWR Number 5039, name: RHUDDLAN CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
17/10/1936 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2591    
07/04/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/04/1937. Dep: 30/05/1937.    
21/01/1938 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2719    
27/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1939. Dep: 17/04/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2638 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6613 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2655 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/11/1942. Dep: 01/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2677 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/01/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1945. Dep: 24/02/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6648 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2567 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/06/1945. Dep: 10/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2592 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 29/10/1946. Dep: 14/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Converted to oil burning
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2141 (Churchward 3,500g) attached.
Converted to oil burnng
   
24/12/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2782    
10/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/08/1948. Dep: 22/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Converted back to coal burning
Boiler number 4637 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2790 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Oil burning equipment removed
   
25/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1949. Dep: 29/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2588 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/05/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/05/1950. Dep: 01/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4000 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
29/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/12/1950. Dep: 30/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4054 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1951. Dep: 21/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6660 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4082 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
08/09/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/09/1953. Dep: 12/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6610 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2897 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/09/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4099    
11/10/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1955. Dep: 23/11/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4081 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
23/11/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
29/12/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/12/1956. Dep: 24/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2400 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
08/12/1957 Modification Diagram HB number 6673 boiler fitted    
25/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/01/1958. Dep: 27/03/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6636 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2740 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/10/1959. Dep: 08/12/1959.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2572 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
18/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
13/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Carmarthen (87G)    
10/11/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/11/1961. Dep: 18/01/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7613 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2643 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - Triangle. SLS 1/1962 Link
06/10/1962 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2744    
09/02/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
04/05/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
13/07/1963 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2694    
27/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
09/09/1963 To Store To Store at Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
31/12/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
15/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5039 from Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev