Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 262 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 262 Week
» 7067 Month
» 114013 Year
» 1335578 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5040   01/07/1935

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/07/1935 STOKESAY CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 01/07/1935 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Mon 28/10/1963 off St Philips Marsh (82B)
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Coopers Metals (Sharpness)
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2673 29/06/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2638 18/03/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2427 04/05/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2802 22/05/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2727 21/03/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2650 06/02/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2422 09/06/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2669 30/11/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4007 19/09/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2597 27/02/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2886 11/07/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4056 27/08/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4071 27/02/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4121 24/01/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2403 29/02/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2535 18/12/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2681 19/06/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4057 01/04/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2547 04/09/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 01/07/1935
82C Swindon 04/09/1961
82B St Philips Marsh 19/10/1961
   Stored (St Philips Marsh) 13/02/1962
   Withdrawn 28/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   28/10/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/07/1935 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6627)
21/03/1941 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6626)
09/06/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6642)
17/02/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6640)
30/11/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6622)
19/09/1950 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4655)
25/01/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6637)
27/08/1953 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4645)
19/06/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6667)
15/09/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6617)
01/04/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6608)
04/09/1961 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6655)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 27/11/1935 14/12/1935 18 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 01/02/1937 21/03/1937 49 days Intermediate
Tender number 2638 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
115446
Swindon Works 13/03/1939 13/05/1939 62 days Intermediate
Tender number 2427 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
240720
Swindon Works 15/04/1940 25/05/1940 41 days Light Repair
Tender number 2802 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/02/1941 28/03/1941 53 days General
Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2727 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
330739
Swindon Works 05/01/1943 08/02/1943 35 days Intermediate
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
431879
Swindon Works 21/04/1945 09/06/1945 50 days General
Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2422 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
541356
Swindon Works 11/01/1947 17/02/1947 38 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB)
630477
Swindon Works 26/10/1948 30/11/1948 36 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2669 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
722762
Swindon Works 21/08/1950 19/09/1950 30 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
826799
Swindon Works 12/12/1951 25/01/1952 45 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
902145
Swindon Works 11/02/1952 27/02/1952 17 days Unclassified
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 24/07/1953 27/08/1953 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4056 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
979360
Swindon Works 29/11/1954 24/01/1955 57 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4121 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1062348
Swindon Works 20/01/1956 29/02/1956 41 days Light Casual
Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 13/10/1956 18/12/1956 67 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2535 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/05/1958 19/06/1958 44 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6667 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2681 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1155045
Swindon Works 19/01/1960 01/04/1960 74 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1332502
Swindon Works 17/06/1961 04/09/1961 80 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1393286

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/06/1935 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2673    
01/07/1935 To Service To service as GWR Number 5040, name: STOKESAY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
27/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1935. Dep: 14/12/1935.    
01/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/02/1937. Dep: 21/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2638 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1939. Dep: 13/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2427 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2802 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1941. Dep: 28/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2727 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/01/1943. Dep: 08/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 21/04/1945. Dep: 09/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2422 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 17/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB)
   
26/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1948. Dep: 30/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2669 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 19/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
12/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1951. Dep: 25/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
   
11/02/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/02/1952. Dep: 27/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/07/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2886    
24/07/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/07/1953. Dep: 27/08/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4645 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4056 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4071    
29/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/11/1954. Dep: 24/01/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4121 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/01/1956. Dep: 29/02/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/10/1956. Dep: 18/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2535 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/05/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/05/1958. Dep: 19/06/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6667 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2681 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/09/1959 Modification Diagram HB number 6617 boiler fitted    
19/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/01/1960. Dep: 01/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6608 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
17/06/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/06/1961. Dep: 04/09/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2547 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
19/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
13/02/1962 To Store To Store at St Philips Marsh (82B)    
28/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5040 from St Philips Marsh (82B)    
05/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Coopers Metals: Sharpness    

prev prev