Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 271 Today
» 1240 Yesterday
» 2610 Week
» 8744 Month
» 236628 Year
» 1458193 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5042 on 11/07/1935

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/07/1935 WINCHESTER CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 296
To Service Fri 11/07/1935 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Fri 25/06/1965 off Gloucester Horton Road (85B)
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 29 yrs, 11 mths , 14 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2676 11/07/1935 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2444 21/05/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2626 10/06/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2643 20/12/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2727 20/05/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2843 21/08/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2581 19/11/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2564 23/04/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2636 04/05/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2893 09/03/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2714 22/05/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2391 14/03/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 21/10/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2853 07/01/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2767 06/09/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4104 07/04/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2738 17/02/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2862 24/12/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2403 06/04/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4065 23/03/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2886 19/02/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4030 17/12/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4079 07/04/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2574 18/06/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2426 05/11/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4101 13/06/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 11/07/1935
BRD Bristol Bath Road 09/09/1935
PDN Old Oak Common 21/03/1936
BRD Bristol Bath Road 24/05/1936
PDN Old Oak Common 16/10/1936
BRD Bristol Bath Road 10/11/1936
WOS Worcester 17/10/1937
GLO Gloucester Horton Road 27/05/1939
85A Worcester 02/02/1959
81A Old Oak Common 07/04/1960
83A Newton Abbot 11/08/1962
   Stored (Newton Abbot) 24/09/1962
87G Carmarthen (Reinstated) 12/01/1963
87F Llanelly 09/03/1963
   Stored (Llanelly) 09/09/1963
88A Cardiff East Dock (Reinstated) 31/12/1963
86C Hereford 13/04/1964
85B Gloucester Horton Road 20/07/1964
   Withdrawn 25/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 21/03/1959
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 23/04/1960
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 11/08/1962
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 09/02/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 88A Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 31/12/1963
ALLOC 86C Hereford 2w/e 13/04/1964
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   25/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/07/1935 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6629)
21/08/1940 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6624)
04/05/1944 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4642)
09/03/1946 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4641)
07/01/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4644)
06/09/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4622)
03/04/1951 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4649)
17/02/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6652)
19/02/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7603)
07/04/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7606)
13/06/1962 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7618)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. SLS/194605
24/03/1946 Stock Returns No. 92 which has been shown as withdrawn, was transferred to Wellingon in October 1938 and is still there. On 2/3 it appeared to be 100 per cent. intact but for the coupling rods. Assuming that the date of its withdrawal from service coincided with its conversion to a stationary boiler, the official date of 8/42 must be questioned for it has been functioning as such at least since the summer of 1941. No: 92 is not the only locomotive to be so employed, for 1287, which was withdrawn on 9/9/39 and subsequently reinstated, is at Leamington. However although employed for the ,same purpose as 92, and in the same condition, it still remains on the capital list. Mr. Seddon would be grateful for any information as to when 1287 first appeared at Leamington, for how long she was at work as a motive unit and also as to the last time that 92 was actively engaged at Wellington. Regarding the latter this will be co-related with the first appearance there of L.M.S. saddle tank 16027, which is permanently on loan from 4A. 3573/80 shown in the stock returns as 2-4-0T should be entered as 0-4-2T and the relevant totals altered accordingly. SLS/194605
28/02/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during February: 1499, 1967, 2034/60, 2211/59, 2573, 2753/79, 2803/17/9/41/58/79/96, 2944, 3013/23/30, 3186, 3216, 3737/64, 3865, 4030/49/52/6/73/83/92, 4117, 4231, 4531, 4607/19/38, 4833/56, 4926, 5002/24/42/53/68/77/8, 5151, 4320/36/78 5412/21, 5506/43/68, 5689, 5737, 5912/7/71/83, 6002/18/27, 6105/47/68, 6300/84/7, 6717/37, 6806/66, 6932/8/46, 8719/34/69, 9306, 9768/89/91. Nameplates were affixed to 6938/46. SLS/194605
28/02/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during February included: 2933, 2938, 2979, 2981, 3024, 3029, 3030, 3407, 3449, 3588, 4018, 4052, 4060, 4061, 4083, 4093, 4320, 5042, 5054, 5305, 5341, 5367, 6312, 6320, 6338, 6340, 6374, W.D. 70843, 77196, 77288, 78632, and 79234. Works' pilots during the same period included: 1796, 2044, and 2077. Further 'Panniers' fitted with T.F. boilers are: 3758, 3789, 5760, 7777, 8776 and 9771. 2891 and 3804 have both been fitted with side windows, side sheets and doors between engine and tender sides. SLS/194704
30/11/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during Nov. included: Nos. 905, 1001, 1010, 1413, 1450, 1713, 1799, 2327, 2722, 2781, 2838, 2864, 2868, 2927, 2941, 2979, 3186, 3383, 3817, 3834, 3852, 4039, 4056, 4058, 4073, 4088, 4089, 4919, 4925, 4969, 4979, 4995, 5008, 5042, 5070, 5078, 5336, 5355, 6115, 6136, 7311, W.D. 77291, 77393, 77508, 79278. Of these, 77291/393 and 79238 are ex Marston Sidings and repair in Belgium, and 77508/79278 are fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots during November have included Nos. 242, 905, 1713 an 2781. 'Star' Class No. 4054 EXE was ex Works on 8/11, having been lined out. W.D. No. 78542 GLO was ex Works on 12/11. This is another loco. fitted with G.W. top feed clacks and cover and Wakefield lubricator. Locos. which have been condemned during November are: Nos. 200, 207, 898, 2783 an 3007. SLS/194801
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910
22/07/1956 Tests on the Severn Bridge The largest locomotive at the moment allowed over the bridge of the former Severn and Wye Railway is the G.W.R. mogul (2-6-0) as used on the passenger trains which travel this way on Sundays during period of winter time table when the Severn Tunnel is closed for maintenance purposes. On Sundays, 15th and 22nd July, tests took place with Castles 5018 an 5042, presumably for stresses and clearances. On a former date, a 500 ton load of ballast wagons was pushed on to the bridge by the Castles and then the locomotives themselves carried out a series of runs on the spans to west side (i.e. Severn Bridge station side) SLS/195608

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 04/10/1935 23/10/1935 20 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 07/11/1935 03/12/1935 27 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 16/03/1936 21/03/1936 6 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 24/04/1936 24/05/1936 31 days Light Repair
Tender number 2444 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/06/1936 08/07/1936 9 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 15/08/1936 19/08/1936 5 days Running Repairs  
Swindon Works 22/05/1937 12/06/1937 22 days Light Repair
Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 17/08/1937 17/10/1937 62 days Intermediate 129039
Swindon Works 19/11/1938 31/12/1938 43 days Light Repair
Tender number 2643 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 16/03/1939 27/05/1939 73 days Intermediate
Tender number 2727 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
221075
Swindon Works 16/07/1940 05/09/1940 52 days Light Repair
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
276513
Swindon Works 06/10/1941 24/11/1941 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2581 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
325397
Swindon Works 02/05/1942 13/06/1942 43 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 09/03/1944 11/05/1944 64 days General
Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
420523
Swindon Works 07/02/1946 09/03/1946 31 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2893 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
497406
Swindon Works 16/05/1946 22/05/1946 7 days Running Repairs
Tender number 2714 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/02/1947 14/03/1947 16 days Light Repair
Tender number 2391 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 27/11/1947 07/01/1948 42 days Light Repair
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2853 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
585093
Swindon Works 03/08/1949 06/09/1949 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2767 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
667752
Swindon Works 26/02/1951 03/04/1951 37 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4649 (Diagram HA)
749089
Swindon Works 11/03/1952 07/04/1952 28 days Light Casual
Tender number 4104 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 15/01/1953 02/04/1953 78 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2738 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
846981
Swindon Works 03/11/1953 24/12/1953 52 days Light Casual
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/02/1955 06/04/1955 43 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
955307
Swindon Works 31/01/1956 23/03/1956 53 days Light Casual
Tender number 4065 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/11/1956 19/02/1957 90 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7603 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2886 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1045255
Swindon Works 16/10/1958 17/12/1958 63 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4030 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1139877
Swindon Works 02/02/1960 07/04/1960 66 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7606 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4079 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1206282
Swindon Works 16/04/1962 13/06/1962 59 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7618 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4101 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1302550

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/07/1935 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5042, name: WINCHESTER CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
09/09/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
04/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/10/1935. Dep: 23/10/1935.    
07/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/11/1935. Dep: 03/12/1935.    
16/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/03/1936. Dep: 21/03/1936.    
21/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
24/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/04/1936. Dep: 24/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2444 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/05/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
30/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/06/1936. Dep: 08/07/1936.    
15/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 19/08/1936.    
16/10/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
10/11/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
22/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/05/1937. Dep: 12/06/1937.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2626 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/08/1937. Dep: 17/10/1937.    
17/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (WOS)    
19/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/11/1938. Dep: 31/12/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2643 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/03/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/03/1939. Dep: 27/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2727 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO)    
16/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/07/1940. Dep: 05/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6624 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1941. Dep: 24/11/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2581 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/04/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2564    
02/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942.    
09/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1944. Dep: 11/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4642 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/02/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/02/1946. Dep: 09/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2893 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 16/05/1946. Dep: 22/05/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2714 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/02/1947. Dep: 14/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2391 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/10/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2432    
27/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/11/1947. Dep: 07/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2853 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/08/1949. Dep: 06/09/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4622 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2767 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/02/1951. Dep: 03/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4649 (Diagram HA)
   
11/03/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/03/1952. Dep: 07/04/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4104 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
15/01/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/01/1953. Dep: 02/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2738 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 24/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/02/1955. Dep: 06/04/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2403 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/01/1956. Dep: 23/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4065 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
22/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 22/11/1956. Dep: 19/02/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7603 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2886 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/10/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/10/1958. Dep: 17/12/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4030 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
02/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
02/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/02/1960. Dep: 07/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7606 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4079 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
07/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
18/06/1960 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2574    
05/11/1960 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2426    
16/04/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/04/1962. Dep: 13/06/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7618 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4101 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
24/09/1962 To Store To Store at Newton Abbot (83A)    
12/01/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Carmarthen (87G)    
09/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
09/09/1963 To Store To Store at Llanelly (87F)    
31/12/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
13/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (86C)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
25/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 5042 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    

prev prev