Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 775 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 6380 Week
» 17927 Month
» 417609 Year
» 494196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5043   13/03/1936

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/03/1936 BARBURY CASTLE
10/09/1937 EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 13/03/1936 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Mon 16/12/1963 off Cardiff East Dock (88A)
Service Life 27 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2682 14/03/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2432 04/11/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2747 09/12/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2403 30/12/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2746 05/02/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2552 10/10/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2698 19/11/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2431 14/07/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2386 29/08/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2660 23/05/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2730 01/11/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2689 05/08/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2656 21/06/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4126 07/02/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4066 08/12/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4116 20/12/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4095 24/10/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2823 16/05/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2928 18/04/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4007 03/03/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4005 01/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2803 06/04/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 13/03/1936
SDN Swindon 12/1941
PDN Old Oak Common 04/04/1942
SDN Swindon 23/05/1947
PDN Old Oak Common 16/06/1947
   Stored (Old Oak Common) 17/02/1951
87G Carmarthen (Reinstated) 06/1952
81A Old Oak Common 02/1956
88A Cardiff Canton 21/04/1962
88L Cardiff East Dock 07/09/1962
   Withdrawn 16/12/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 23/04/1955
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 21/04/1962
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   16/12/1963
WDN   4w/e 31/12/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/03/1936 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6630)
09/12/1941 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6636)
14/07/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6617)
23/05/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6683)
05/08/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4654)
21/06/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6606)
07/02/1951 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4634)
08/12/1952 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7647)
20/12/1954 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7649)
24/10/1956 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7673)
16/05/1958 Double Chimney fitted
03/03/1960 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7665)
06/04/1962 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7655)

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 25/10/1937 10/12/1937 47 days Intermediate 134453
Swindon Works 24/01/1938 06/03/1938 42 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 27/09/1939 08/11/1939 43 days Intermediate
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
252444
Swindon Works 20/10/1941 12/1941   General  
Swindon Works 05/10/1942 12/10/1942 8 days Light Repair
Tender number 2552 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/10/1943 24/11/1943 49 days Intermediate
Tender number 2698 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
427586
Swindon Works 01/06/1945 14/07/1945 44 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
491308
Swindon Works 15/04/1947 23/05/1947 39 days General
Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2660 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
597687
Swindon Works 08/06/1948 05/08/1948 59 days Light Repair
Boiler number 4654 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2689 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
654423
Swindon Works 19/05/1949 21/06/1949 34 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
698931
Swindon Works 02/01/1951 07/02/1951 37 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4126 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
792235
Swindon Works 27/10/1952 08/12/1952 43 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7647 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
889828
Swindon Works 11/11/1954 20/12/1954 40 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7649 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4116 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
979733
Swindon Works 14/09/1956 24/10/1956 41 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7673 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4095 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1068238
Swindon Works 31/10/1956 05/11/1956 6 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 28/03/1958 16/05/1958 50 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2823 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1151507
Swindon Works 02/01/1960 03/03/1960 62 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7665 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1243148
Swindon Works 08/02/1962 21/04/1962 73 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7655 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2803 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1335766

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/03/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 5043, name: BARBURY CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
14/03/1936 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2682    
10/09/1937 Naming Renamed 'EARL OF MOUNT EDGCUMBE'    
25/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/10/1937. Dep: 10/12/1937.    
24/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/01/1938. Dep: 06/03/1938.    
27/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1939. Dep: 08/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2432 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1941. Dep: ?/12/1941.    
12/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
09/12/1941 Modification Diagram HB number 6636 boiler fitted    
09/12/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2747    
30/12/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2403    
05/02/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2746    
04/04/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
05/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/10/1942. Dep: 12/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2552 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/10/1943. Dep: 24/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2698 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/06/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2431 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/08/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2386    
15/04/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1947. Dep: 23/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2660 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/05/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
16/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
01/11/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2730    
08/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/06/1948. Dep: 05/08/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4654 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2689 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/05/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/05/1949. Dep: 21/06/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6606 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/01/1951. Dep: 07/02/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4634 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4126 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
17/02/1951 To Store To Store at Old Oak Common (PDN)    
06/1952 Reinstated Reinstated to Carmarthen (87G)    
27/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/10/1952. Dep: 08/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7647 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4066 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/11/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/11/1954. Dep: 20/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7649 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4116 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
14/09/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/09/1956. Dep: 24/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7673 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4095 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
31/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/10/1956. Dep: 05/11/1956.    
28/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1958. Dep: 16/05/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2823 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
06/08/1958 Sightings Seen at Paddington having arrived with the Bristolian BackTrack Jan 2007  
18/04/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2928    
02/01/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/01/1960. Dep: 03/03/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7665 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
01/1962 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4005    
08/02/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/02/1962. Dep: 21/04/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7655 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2803 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/03/1962 Sightings Swindon Works visit.: Around the works. - "A" shop.   Link
21/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
07/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
16/12/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5043 from Cardiff East Dock (88A)    

prev prev