Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5044   29/03/1936

Names Carried
Date From Name
29/03/1936 BEVERSTON CASTLE
23/09/1937 EARL OF DUNRAVEN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Tue 29/03/1936 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Tue 03/04/1962 off Cardiff Canton (88A)
Scrapping During 06/1962 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 26 yrs , 5 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2675 21/03/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2410 30/04/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2772 25/01/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2437 18/11/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 30/11/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2807 29/01/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2896 16/05/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2412 04/10/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2724 21/10/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2567 16/11/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2837 04/01/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2711 17/02/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2717 26/02/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2644 20/11/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2713 27/09/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2621 26/09/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2674 04/10/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2792 07/09/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2698 26/05/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 29/03/1936
82C Swindon 04/07/1960
86C Cardiff Canton 05/07/1960
87A Neath (Court Sart) 13/06/1961
88A Cardiff Canton 05/07/1961
   Withdrawn 03/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 13/08/1960
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 15/07/1961
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 04/11/1961
WDN   m/e 30/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
29/03/1936 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6628)
25/01/1939 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4634)
30/11/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6611)
29/01/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6623)
21/10/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4635)
04/01/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6611)
26/02/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6665)
20/11/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6621)
27/09/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6644)
26/09/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6613)
07/09/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6683)
26/05/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7629)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 07/12/1937 23/01/1938 48 days Intermediate  
Swindon Works 24/02/1938 03/1938   Light Repair  
Swindon Works 13/06/1939 21/08/1939 70 days Intermediate  
Swindon Works 14/01/1941 14/03/1941 60 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 22/09/1941 12/11/1941 52 days Intermediate  
Swindon Works 11/08/1943 22/09/1943 43 days Intermediate  
Swindon Works 29/06/1945 20/08/1945 53 days General  
Swindon Works 24/05/1947 26/06/1947 34 days Intermediate  
Swindon Works 26/04/1949 31/05/1949 36 days Heavy General  
Swindon Works 20/03/1950 05/04/1950 17 days Light Casual 793645
Swindon Works 04/01/1951 12/02/1951 40 days Heavy Intermediate  
Swindon Works 07/11/1952 16/12/1952 40 days Heavy General  
Swindon Works 18/06/1954 17/08/1954 61 days Heavy Intermediate  
Swindon Works 22/03/1955 06/05/1955 46 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 06/01/1956 14/02/1956 40 days Heavy General  
Swindon Works 28/11/1957 16/01/1958 50 days Heavy Intermediate  
Swindon Works 22/12/1958 09/04/1959 109 days Heavy Casual  
Swindon Works 28/04/1960 29/06/1960 63 days Heavy General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/03/1936 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2675    
29/03/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 5044, name: BEVERSTON CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
30/04/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2410    
23/09/1937 Naming Renamed 'EARL OF DUNRAVEN'    
07/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/12/1937. Dep: 23/01/1938.    
24/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1938. Dep: ?/03/1938.    
25/01/1939 Modification Diagram HA number 4634 boiler fitted    
25/01/1939 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2772    
13/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/06/1939. Dep: 21/08/1939.    
18/11/1940 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2437    
14/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1941. Dep: 14/03/1941.    
22/09/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/09/1941. Dep: 12/11/1941.    
30/11/1942 Modification Diagram HB number 6611 boiler fitted    
30/11/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2603    
11/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/08/1943. Dep: 22/09/1943.    
29/01/1945 Modification Diagram HB number 6623 boiler fitted    
29/01/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2807    
29/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1945. Dep: 20/08/1945.    
16/05/1946 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2896    
24/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1947. Dep: 26/06/1947.    
04/10/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2412    
21/10/1947 Modification Diagram HA number 4635 boiler fitted    
21/10/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2724    
16/11/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2567    
04/01/1949 Modification Diagram HB number 6611 boiler fitted    
04/01/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2837    
26/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/04/1949. Dep: 31/05/1949.    
17/02/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2711    
20/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1950. Dep: 05/04/1950.    
04/01/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/01/1951. Dep: 12/02/1951.    
26/02/1952 Modification Diagram HB number 6665 boiler fitted    
26/02/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2717    
07/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/11/1952. Dep: 16/12/1952.    
20/11/1953 Modification Diagram HB number 6621 boiler fitted    
20/11/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2644    
18/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/06/1954. Dep: 17/08/1954.    
22/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955.    
27/09/1955 Modification Diagram HB number 6644 boiler fitted    
27/09/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2713    
06/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/01/1956. Dep: 14/02/1956.    
26/09/1957 Modification Diagram HB number 6613 boiler fitted    
26/09/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2621    
28/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1957. Dep: 16/01/1958.    
04/10/1958 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2674    
22/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1958. Dep: 09/04/1959.    
07/09/1959 Modification Diagram HB number 6683 boiler fitted    
07/09/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2792    
28/04/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/04/1960. Dep: 29/06/1960.    
04/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
05/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
26/05/1961 Modification Diagram HC number 7629 boiler fitted    
26/05/1961 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2698    
13/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
05/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
03/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5044 from Cardiff Canton (88A)    
06/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev