Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5045   03/04/1936

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/04/1936 BRIDGWATER CASTLE
27/09/1937 EARL OF DUDLEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 03/04/1936 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off Stafford Road (84A)
Scrapping During 09/1962 at Cox and Danks (Oldbury)
Service Life 26 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2684 28/03/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2690 04/01/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2795 21/09/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2589 26/09/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2639 22/01/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2584 21/07/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2674 08/04/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2650 01/06/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2442 25/02/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2388 15/05/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2566 12/06/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4007 11/01/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 22/09/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4004 06/06/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2744 02/04/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2934 30/12/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4044 07/11/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2406 19/02/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 03/04/1936
   Stored (Swindon) 28/09/1950
84A Stafford Road (Reinstated) 06/11/1950
   Withdrawn 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 02/12/1950
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/04/1936 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6632)
21/09/1939 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6600)
01/06/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4653)
25/02/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6642)
11/01/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6604)
22/09/1950 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4616)
06/06/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6623)
02/04/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6637)
30/12/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6657)
07/11/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6629)
19/02/1958 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4643)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 17/11/1937 17/01/1938 62 days Intermediate
Tender number 2690 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
135956
Swindon Works 10/08/1939 30/09/1939 52 days General
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2795 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
252624
Swindon Works 06/08/1941 01/10/1941 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
360169
Swindon Works 29/12/1942 04/02/1943 38 days Light Repair
Tender number 2639 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 01/06/1943 25/07/1943 55 days Intermediate
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
452501
Swindon Works 11/03/1944 13/04/1944 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/04/1945 01/06/1945 45 days General
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
534917
Swindon Works 25/01/1947 25/02/1947 32 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2442 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
638087
Swindon Works 06/12/1948 22/11/1949 352 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6604 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
725287
Swindon Works 25/08/1950 28/09/1950 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4616 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
826775
Swindon Works 28/04/1952 06/06/1952 40 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4004 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
910070
Swindon Works 03/03/1954 02/04/1954 31 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1004959
Swindon Works 23/11/1955 30/12/1955 38 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6657 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1093537
Swindon Works 02/10/1956 07/11/1956 37 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4044 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1140238
Swindon Works 10/12/1957 19/02/1958 72 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4643 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1190996
Swindon Works 15/02/1960 20/04/1960 66 days Light Intermediate 1292375

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/03/1936 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2684    
03/04/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 5045, name: BRIDGWATER CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
27/09/1937 Naming Renamed 'EARL OF DUDLEY'    
17/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/11/1937. Dep: 17/01/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2690 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/08/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6600 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2795 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/08/1941. Dep: 01/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2589 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/12/1942. Dep: 04/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2639 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/06/1943. Dep: 25/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/03/1944. Dep: 13/04/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2674 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1945. Dep: 01/06/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2650 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/01/1947. Dep: 25/02/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2442 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/05/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2388    
12/06/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2566    
06/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/12/1948. Dep: 22/11/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6604 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
25/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/08/1950. Dep: 28/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4616 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/09/1950 To Store To Store at Swindon (82C)    
06/11/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Stafford Road (84A)    
28/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/04/1952. Dep: 06/06/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4004 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
03/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/03/1954. Dep: 02/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/11/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/11/1955. Dep: 30/12/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6657 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2934 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/10/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/10/1956. Dep: 07/11/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4044 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
10/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/12/1957. Dep: 19/02/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4643 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2406 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/02/1960. Dep: 20/04/1960.    
09/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Oldbury    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5045 from Stafford Road (84A)    

prev prev