|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 23/02/1937 | 06/03/1937 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 19/10/1937 | 17/11/1937 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 25/02/1938 | 25/04/1938 | 60 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
125369 | |
Swindon Works | 24/11/1939 | 19/12/1939 | 26 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2536 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 09/03/1940 | 27/04/1940 | 50 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2821 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
236136 | |
Swindon Works | 25/11/1941 | 22/01/1942 | 59 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
321549 | |
Swindon Works | 18/10/1943 | 27/11/1943 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2666 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
396167 | |
Swindon Works | 01/10/1946 | 11/11/1946 | 42 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB) |
513026 | |
Swindon Works | 09/12/1948 | 12/01/1949 | 35 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6650 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2680 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
604585 | |
Swindon Works | 09/11/1950 | 12/12/1950 | 34 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2881 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
692589 | |
Swindon Works | 20/01/1953 | 04/03/1953 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4102 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
806372 | |
Swindon Works | 02/10/1954 | 03/11/1954 | 33 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4080 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
905353 | |
Swindon Works | 14/08/1956 | 28/11/1956 | 107 days | Heavy Intermediate | 1004425 | ||
Swindon Works | 21/07/1958 | 11/09/1958 | 53 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Swindon Works | 17/10/1960 | 16/12/1960 | 61 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2561 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1167438 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1948 | Swindon Works | New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. | SLS/194902 |
31/07/1962 | Withdrawn GWR engines | It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. | SLS/196210 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/04/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5047, name: COMPTON CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Landore (LDR) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
23/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1937. Dep: 06/03/1937. | ||
20/08/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'EARL OF DARTMOUTH' | ||
19/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/10/1937. Dep: 17/11/1937. | ||
25/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/02/1938. Dep: 25/04/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1939. Dep: 19/12/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2536 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 09/03/1940. Dep: 27/04/1940. Work undertaken: Tender number 2821 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/04/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
25/11/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1941. Dep: 22/01/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
18/10/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4605 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2666 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/11/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
01/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/10/1946. Dep: 11/11/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB) |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
16/03/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
27/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
09/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/12/1948. Dep: 12/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6650 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2680 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/11/1950. Dep: 12/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4636 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2881 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/01/1953. Dep: 04/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4102 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/10/1954. Dep: 03/11/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4080 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) | ||
14/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/08/1956. Dep: 28/11/1956. | ||
21/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/07/1958. Dep: 11/09/1958. | ||
17/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/10/1960. Dep: 16/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2561 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5047 from Stafford Road (84A) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |