|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 14/10/1936 | 16/10/1936 | 3 days | Running Repairs | |||
Swindon Works | 12/05/1938 | 18/07/1938 | 68 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
139821 | |
Swindon Works | 15/06/1939 | 13/08/1939 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 6603 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2718 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
211725 | |
Swindon Works | 01/01/1941 | 13/02/1941 | 44 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/04/1941 | 13/06/1941 | 60 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/03/1942 | 27/04/1942 | 53 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2586 (Collett 8 wheeled 4,000g) attached. |
342130 | |
Swindon Works | 13/05/1944 | 04/07/1944 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2422 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
453580 | |
Swindon Works | 13/03/1946 | 15/04/1946 | 34 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2690 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
543935 | |
Swindon Works | 18/08/1947 | 26/09/1947 | 40 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 7610 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2588 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
619258 | |
Swindon Works | 18/11/1947 | 22/12/1947 | 35 days | Running Repairs | |||
Swindon Works | 01/11/1948 | 01/12/1948 | 31 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2817 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 02/11/1949 | 19/12/1949 | 48 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2790 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
717834 | |
Swindon Works | 23/08/1950 | 21/09/1950 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 15/11/1951 | 28/12/1951 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2880 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
825828 | |
Swindon Works | 12/09/1952 | 22/10/1952 | 41 days | Unclassified | Tender number 2798 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/11/1953 | 15/12/1953 | 41 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7650 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
915344 | |
Swindon Works | 07/11/1955 | 14/12/1955 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1004377 | |
Swindon Works | 29/06/1956 | 09/11/1956 | 134 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2909 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 26/08/1957 | 24/12/1957 | 121 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 4033 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1098860 | |
Swindon Works | 24/06/1959 | 04/09/1959 | 73 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7647 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4098 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
1188096 | |
Swindon Works | 15/06/1961 | 01/09/1961 | 79 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 9608 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2712 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1262368 | |
Swindon Works | 27/07/1962 | 14/09/1962 | 50 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2879 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1943 | Sheds noted 1/43 | 2870 ABDR; 8710, 9797 ABG; 3821, 4909, 6835/9, 7800/11 (BAN); 2220, 5025/76, 5564, 6014/7/24, 7802 (BL); 6863 BL/SPM; 4094, 5049, 5970, 6353 (CDF); 5951, 7815 (GLO); 3446, 5060, 6000, 6911 (LA); 6857 (LDR); 5028 (NA); 2636 (NPT); 9317 (OXF); 8302 (OXY); 2881, 4037/89, 4900/98, 5027, 5922/41/96(); 6155, 6902/20, 9306/8 (PDN); 5975 (PPR); 9315 (RDG); 4956, 5566, 6387, 7253 (SDN); 5994 (SLP); 2838/62, 6873 (STJ); 4013/53, 5031, 5957, 6321 (SRD); 5346 (TYS); 5954/99 (TN); 4045, 5406 (WES); 5983, 6877, 6921 (WOS). | SLS/194302 |
31/03/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. | SLS/194606 |
31/08/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). | SLS/194710 |
30/09/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during September included: Nos. 1005, 1925, 1935, 2112, 2148, 2195, 2444, 2551, 2612, 3005, 3017, 3022, 3023, 5318, 5319, 5335, 5398, W.D. 77368, 78543 an 79274. Works' pilots recently have been: Nos. 200, 2723, 2731, 2733 an 2768. No. 5049 CDF (ex Works 23/9) has been fitted with an experimental Swindon design mechanical lubricator (similar to that fitted to No. 4905) and also a 4-row superheater. The present batch of new 'Hall' Class locos. which are of the modified or '6959' Class are being fitted with straight sided tenders; No. 6974 and onwards are being lined out. | SLS/194711 |
30/11/1948 | Swindon Works | New Work November: Nos. 6761 DYD (3/11), 6762 (4/11), 6763 (10/11), 6764 (12/11), 6765 (26/11); 4169 (15/11); 6991 Acton Burnell Hall WES (22/11), 6992 Arborfield Hall (26/11); Nos. 4168 an 6760 PILL were both completed on 29/10. Locomotives entering Works 28/10/48 to 26/11/48: These included Nos. 184 (condemned), 1013/27, 1331, 1435, 1538 (condemned - at present being used as Works pilot), 1749 (condemned), *1867 (condemned), *2010, *2121, *2187, 2249, *2706, *2717 (both condemned), 2819/71/74/88/96, 2906/32/40/43/53, 3169/86, 3624/77, 3733, 3806/41/64, 3951, 4015/18/25/60/81/83/92/93, 4123, 4287, 4508/53/84, 4665/91, 4900/60, 5031/32/49/67, 5121 (condemned), 5128/77, 5345, 5406/11, 5537/44/48, 5689, 5744/72/81/94, 5801, 5926/67/89, 6021, 6146, 6382/88, 6407, 6715, 6835/43/52, 6915/35/40/47/50/59/61, 7760, 7808, 8751, **9019 (condemned), 9310, 9754, 'Austerity' 77380. *Open cab. **Fitted small 2,000 gallon tender (No. 1128 of 4/96). Nos. 6991/92 came out painted black and fully lined, While Nos. 4168/69, 6760/65 are black and unlined. The following have been painted black and fully lined:-Nos. 4966/96, 5967/92, 6922/40/50 while Nos. 1362, 2194, 2252, 2840, 3685/96, 3811, 4290, 5214, 5384, 5563, 7234, 7716/64, 8768/77, 9310 an 9711 are painted black, but not lined. Nos. 3720 an 7702 have 'G.W.R.' on the tank sides and are fitted with smokebox numberplates. No. 6009 has been fitted with a new standard cast iron smokebox num-berplate, in place of the former smaller brass one, all locomotives leaving Works are now fitted with smokebox numberplates. Locomotives noted with top feed boilers:-Nos. 3624/85/96, 5772/81, 5801, 7702/16/64, 8710/68/77, 9745. | SLS/194901 |
31/01/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted |
SLS/194903 |
23/07/1961 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | 'A' Shop: D602/4, D805/11/28/70, D1000-11, D2137, D2372-9, D3257, D3431, D3744, D6306/11/9, 13186, 13264/5, 15100/2, 2829, 3817/43, 4090, 4922/8/56/78, 5000/1/31/49/60, 5306/51, 5903/4/36/9/67, 6000/4/7, 6363/95, 6871, 6919/46/59/86/97/8, 7020, 7209/15/21/2, 7826, 82031, 92226/34. Works Yard: D804/15/23/41/51/2, D2188/9/94, 1604/34/47, 2516, 3667/70, 3822/41, 4003, 4203, 4916/98, 5015/80/1, 5103/10/76/7/95, 5336, 5949, 6027, 6349, 6831, 6969, 7745/56/75/98, 8789/98, 9400/14, 9749, 78001/8. 92215/45. Triangle: 6021, 9736/67. Dump: 1361/2/4/6, 1419/33, 3657/76, 3724, 6426, 7700/61, 8429, 8705/22/40/77/96, 9735/62/71/81. 'C' Shop: 8457 intact, Outside 'C' Shop: 5771, 8726 being cut up. | SLS/196109 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/04/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5049, name: DENBIGH CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Worcester (WOS) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 14/10/1936. Dep: 16/10/1936. | ||
27/08/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'EARL OF PLYMOUTH' | ||
12/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/05/1938. Dep: 18/07/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2656 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1939. Dep: 13/08/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6603 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2718 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
01/01/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/01/1941. Dep: 13/02/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/04/1941. Dep: 13/06/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2411 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/03/1942. Dep: 27/04/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2586 (Collett 8 wheeled 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 04/07/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2422 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/03/1946. Dep: 15/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2690 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
18/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/08/1947. Dep: 26/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7610 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2588 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 18/11/1947. Dep: 22/12/1947. | ||
01/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/11/1948. Dep: 01/12/1948. Work undertaken: Tender number 2817 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/11/1949. Dep: 19/12/1949. Work undertaken: Tender number 2790 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/07/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2644 | ||
23/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1950. Dep: 21/09/1950. | ||
15/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/11/1951. Dep: 28/12/1951. Work undertaken: Tender number 2880 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/06/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4006 | ||
12/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/09/1952. Dep: 22/10/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2798 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/11/1953. Dep: 15/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7650 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1955. Dep: 14/12/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1956. Dep: 09/11/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2909 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
26/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/08/1957. Dep: 24/12/1957. Work undertaken: Tender number 4033 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) | ||
24/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/06/1959. Dep: 04/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7647 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4098 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
22/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
16/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
15/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/06/1961. Dep: 01/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9608 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2712 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1962. Dep: 14/09/1962. Work undertaken: Tender number 2879 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/03/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5049 from St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
04/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |