Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 605 Today
» 1315 Yesterday
» 605 Week
» 30103 Month
» 366949 Year
» 1588514 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5050 on 02/05/1936

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/05/1936 DEVIZES CASTLE
27/08/1937 EARL OF ST GERMANS

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 303
To Service Thu 02/05/1936 to Worcester (WOS)
Withdrawal Thu 29/08/1963 off St Philips Marsh (82B)
Scrapping During 05/1964 at Coopers Metals (Sharpness)
Service Life 27 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2689 02/05/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 02/04/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 01/03/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2637 20/07/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2539 09/11/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2735 21/03/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2633 14/06/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2747 18/04/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2408 05/10/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2812 06/10/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2388 20/06/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2442 15/05/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4005 09/09/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2797 27/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4105 22/05/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2879 24/02/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2840 16/07/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4082 20/10/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4049 21/08/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4093 26/08/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2792 03/05/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2557 02/03/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
WOS Worcester (New) on 02/05/1936
GLO Gloucester Horton Road on 22/07/1939
EXE Exeter on 13/11/1939
LA Laira m/e 11/1942
4A Shrewsbury m/e 09/1948
81A Old Oak Common on 16/09/1960
82B St Philips Marsh on 08/08/1961
82C Swindon on 18/01/1962
82B St Philips Marsh on 05/04/1962
   Withdrawn on 29/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SALOP Shrewsbury 4w/e 07/08/1948
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 09/09/1961
WDN   on 29/08/1963
WDN   5w/e 31/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/05/1936 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6637)
14/06/1940 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6601)
06/10/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4644)
20/06/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4630)
09/09/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6682)
22/05/1952 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4624)
24/02/1954 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4626)
16/08/1955 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7658)
21/08/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6699)
26/08/1959 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7616)
03/05/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7627)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 14/02/1938 07/04/1938 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 11/01/1939 06/03/1939 55 days Light Repair
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 16/06/1939 22/07/1939 37 days Light Repair
Tender number 2637 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/10/1939 13/11/1939 35 days Intermediate
Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
209010
Swindon Works 08/03/1940 23/03/1940 16 days Light Repair
Tender number 2735 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/05/1940 18/06/1940 30 days Light Repair
Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2633 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
238810
Swindon Works 31/10/1941 24/12/1941 55 days Intermediate 319762
Swindon Works 17/08/1944 05/10/1944 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2408 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
440947
Swindon Works 08/08/1945 06/10/1945 60 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2812 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
466614
Swindon Works 17/05/1947 20/06/1947 35 days General
Boiler number 4630 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
530938
Swindon Works 27/07/1949 24/06/1950 333 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
612681
Swindon Works 10/04/1952 22/05/1952 43 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4105 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
681390
Swindon Works 16/01/1954 24/02/1954 40 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2879 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
766552
Swindon Works 13/07/1955 16/08/1955 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7658 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2840 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
835238
Swindon Works 17/06/1957 21/08/1957 66 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6699 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4049 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
928552
Swindon Works 16/06/1959 26/08/1959 72 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7616 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4093 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1002291
Swindon Works 13/03/1961 04/05/1961 53 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7627 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1070516

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during May included: 111, 1336, 1716, 1796, 2046, 2061, 2266, 2458, 2651, 2777, 2780, 2827, 2834, 2870, 2924, 2987, 3032, 3044, 3046, 3341, 3364, 3382, 3625, 3711, 3837, 3855, 4079, 4083, 4086, 4297, 4706, 4901, 4921, 4943, 4974, 4976, 4994, 4996, 5005, 5007,, 5029, 5044, 5050, 5092, 5322, 5326, 5392, 5937, 5963, 6117, 6342, 6383, 6906, 6929, 6955, 6964, 6969, 7210 and 9755. SLS/194708
31/07/1949 Swindon Works New Work July: Nos. 1501 (1/7), 1502 (27/7). Both are unlined black. Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos. 1005/12/25, 1467/68, 2206, 2856/86, 2920, 3663, 3779, 3853, 4013/41/56/61, 4133, 4381, 4631, 4901/43, 5050/69, 5238, 5369, 5552/59, 5918, 6003, 6103/08/22, 6320 (for re-conversion), 6336/45/54, 6417, 6804/38, 6910, 7307, 7809, 7905, 8762. Condemned: 2708 an 9087. No. 3837 (ex 4854) has been re-converted to coal-burning. No. 6020 has been painted blue, while No. 4961 has been Painted black and fully lined. The first of the contractor built series of 94XX arrived on Works on 27/7 viz: Nos. 8400 an 8401; they have entered shops to have the A.T.C. gear fitted. Works' Nos. checked are: Bagnall 2910/11 of 1949.
Awaiting Works at the east end of the yard- were Nos. 1000, 2708, 2875, 3635, 4981, 5057, 5554/57, 6844; No. 2863 (ex 4805-oil-burning) was also in evidence. B shop contained Nos. 1363, 1467/68, 2206/11, 2572, 3663/77, 4631, 6408/09/17, 7735, 9638. New engines from Bagnall's were Nos. 8400/1 (makers Nos. 2910/1) and Swindon construction included Nos. 7026 (painted), 7027, 1504 (painted), 1505 and the frames of a diesel (Lot 363). Barry 0-6-2T's Nos. 212, 213 an 246 were acting as Works' shunters.
SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/05/1936 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5050, name: DEVIZES CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Worcester (WOS)
Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
27/08/1937 Naming Renamed 'EARL OF ST GERMANS'    
14/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/02/1938. Dep: 07/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1939. Dep: 06/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/06/1939. Dep: 22/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2637 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO)    
10/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/10/1939. Dep: 13/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/11/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (EXE)    
08/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2735 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/05/1940. Dep: 18/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2633 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/10/1941. Dep: 24/12/1941.    
11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (LA)    
18/04/1943 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2747    
17/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 05/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2408 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1945. Dep: 06/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2812 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1947. Dep: 20/06/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4630 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2388 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/05/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2442    
09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
27/07/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/07/1949. Dep: 24/06/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6682 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4005 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
27/06/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2797    
10/04/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 10/04/1952. Dep: 22/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4105 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
16/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1954. Dep: 24/02/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2879 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/07/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/07/1955. Dep: 16/08/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7658 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2840 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/10/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4082    
17/06/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 17/06/1957. Dep: 21/08/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6699 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4049 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
16/06/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/06/1959. Dep: 26/08/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7616 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4093 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
16/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
13/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/03/1961. Dep: 04/05/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7627 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
18/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
02/03/1962 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2557    
05/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
29/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5050 from St Philips Marsh (82B)    

prev prev