Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 148 Today
» 1075 Yesterday
» 1223 Week
» 22125 Month
» 22125 Year
» 1243690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5051 05/12/1959

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 24
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Crewe Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/12/1959
Withdrawn 02/12/1967
Time in Service 7 yrs, 11 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 09/1968
Cut At Locomotive Works (Inverurie)
Information Last sighted intact on 21st September 1968, so the cutting date may be later than stated above
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
31B March (New) 05/12/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 14/01/1961
65A Eastfield w/e 08/10/1966
   Withdrawn 02/12/1967

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
10/05/1963 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/12/1959 To Service To service as D5051
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to March (31B)
   
14/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
08/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
11/1967 Sightings Caught fire while working a Waterside (Ayrshire) coal train. Damage was so severe that the loco was condemned and became the only Sulzer Type 2 broken up at Inverurie Works.    
02/12/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as D5051    
15/08/1968 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Derelict shell in the yard RO 10/1968 Link
28/08/1968 Sightings Inverurie Works visit: In Works - Dumped at station end of works yard RO 11/1968 Link
09/1968 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie    

prev prev