Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 962 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18765 Week
» 71781 Month
» 191308 Year
» 3218161 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5052 |
04/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24052 |
31/01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
04/12/1959 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
04/12/1976 |
Time in Service |
17 yrs |
Cut Up |
05/1978 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
04/12/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
04/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
12/01/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
22/07/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Severe |
|
Not known |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5052 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
14/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
31/01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24052 |
|
|
24/07/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
04/12/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24052 |
|
|
05/1978 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|