Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1767 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15173 Week
» 68189 Month
» 187716 Year
» 3214569 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5054 |
18/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24054 |
02/1974 |
|
Departmental (Dept) |
TDB968008 |
08/1976 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
18/12/1959 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
01/07/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 6 mths , 13 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
18/12/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 11/1970 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
30/04/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
10/08/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
30/04/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
10/08/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5054 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
06/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
10/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24054 |
|
|
08/05/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
01/07/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24054 |
|
|
08/1976 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to TDB968008 |
|
|