Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 216 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 216 Week
» 11787 Month
» 260080 Year
» 1144461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5055   14/06/1936

Names Carried
Date From Name
14/06/1936 LYDFORD CASTLE
20/08/1937 EARL OF ELDON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 14/06/1936 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Mon 28/09/1964 off Gloucester Horton Road (85B)
Scrapping During 02/1965 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 28 yrs, 3 mths , 14 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2694 13/06/1936 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2426 01/11/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2639 01/02/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2634 17/04/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2441 21/05/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2584 21/03/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2924 20/02/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2871 02/08/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2688 22/04/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4124 12/01/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2852 18/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 28/07/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2841 26/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2722 08/10/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2847 15/03/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2550 16/11/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 14/12/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2922 16/02/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) 14/06/1936
OXF Oxford m/e 05/1939
PDN Old Oak Common m/e 07/1939
RDG Reading (W.R.) 15/06/1942
PDN Old Oak Common m/e 10/1942
83A Newton Abbot 20/03/1958
   Stored (Newton Abbot) 24/09/1962
87G Carmarthen (Reinstated) 21/12/1962
   Stored (Carmarthen) 14/01/1963
87J Fishguard Goodwick (Reinstated) 27/07/1963
   Stored (Fishguard Goodwick) 09/09/1963
86C Hereford (Reinstated) 02/11/1963
85B Gloucester Horton Road 20/07/1964
   Withdrawn 28/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 12/01/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 09/02/1963
ALLOC 87J Fishguard Goodwick 4w/e 27/07/1963
TOSTORE   4w/e 29/09/1963
ALLOC 86C Hereford 5w/e 02/11/1963
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   28/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
14/06/1936 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6642)
01/11/1939 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6602)
21/03/1944 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4641)
20/02/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6615)
02/08/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4631)
22/04/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4627)
12/01/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6672)
18/09/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6659)
28/07/1954 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
15/03/1956 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4610)
15/11/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6640)
14/12/1959 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6689)
16/02/1962 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7635)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 14/11/1936 17/11/1936 4 days Running Repairs  
Swindon Works 01/01/1938 13/02/1938 44 days Intermediate 121241
Swindon Works 27/09/1939 12/11/1939 47 days General
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
234877
Swindon Works 04/03/1942 21/04/1942 49 days Intermediate
Tender number 2634 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
351130
Swindon Works 08/06/1943 09/07/1943 32 days Running Repairs  
Swindon Works 16/02/1944 25/03/1944 39 days General
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
430612
Swindon Works 13/08/1945 17/08/1945 5 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 22/01/1946 20/02/1946 30 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2924 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
526866
Swindon Works 18/06/1947 02/08/1947 46 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4631 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2871 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
610289
Swindon Works 18/03/1949 22/04/1949 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2688 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
719748
Swindon Works 04/12/1950 12/01/1951 40 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4124 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
817941
Swindon Works 13/08/1952 18/09/1952 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
919236
Swindon Works 12/06/1954 28/07/1954 47 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1024183
Swindon Works 08/02/1956 15/03/1956 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1118898
Swindon Works 24/09/1957 15/11/1957 53 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB)
1209312
Swindon Works 24/10/1959 14/12/1959 52 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6689 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1319422
Swindon Works 15/12/1961 16/02/1962 64 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2922 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1404791

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
13/06/1936 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2694    
14/06/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 5055, name: LYDFORD CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
14/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 14/11/1936. Dep: 17/11/1936.    
20/08/1937 Naming Renamed 'EARL OF ELDON'    
01/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 01/01/1938. Dep: 13/02/1938.    
05/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Oxford (OXF)    
07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
27/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1939. Dep: 12/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2426 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/02/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2639    
04/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/03/1942. Dep: 21/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2634 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/06/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (RDG)    
10/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
21/05/1943 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2441    
08/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 08/06/1943. Dep: 09/07/1943.    
16/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1944. Dep: 25/03/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4641 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/08/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/08/1945. Dep: 17/08/1945.    
22/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/01/1946. Dep: 20/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2924 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 18/06/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4631 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2871 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/03/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 18/03/1949. Dep: 22/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4627 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2688 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/12/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/12/1950. Dep: 12/01/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6672 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4124 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/08/1952. Dep: 18/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6659 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/06/1954. Dep: 28/07/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/03/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2841    
08/10/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2722    
08/02/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/02/1956. Dep: 15/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/09/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/09/1957. Dep: 15/11/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB)
   
16/11/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2550    
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
24/10/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/10/1959. Dep: 14/12/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6689 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/12/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/12/1961. Dep: 16/02/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2922 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/09/1962 To Store To Store at Newton Abbot (83A)    
21/12/1962 Reinstated Reinstated to Carmarthen (87G)    
14/01/1963 To Store To Store at Carmarthen (87G)    
27/07/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
09/09/1963 To Store To Store at Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
02/11/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Hereford (86C)    
20/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
28/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5055 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
02/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev