|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 22/10/1936 | 11/11/1936 | 21 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 05/01/1938 | 27/02/1938 | 54 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2652 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
117030 | |
Swindon Works | 17/06/1938 | 11/07/1938 | 25 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 28/07/1939 | 28/09/1939 | 63 days | General | Boiler number 6649 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2793 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
211455 | |
Swindon Works | 13/04/1942 | 25/05/1942 | 43 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2387 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
347029 | |
Swindon Works | 22/02/1944 | 11/08/1944 | 172 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2634 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
440603 | |
Swindon Works | 10/01/1946 | 11/02/1946 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 4643 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
525383 | |
Swindon Works | 07/08/1947 | 11/09/1947 | 36 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB) |
613666 | |
Swindon Works | 31/03/1949 | 09/05/1949 | 40 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2893 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
700946 | |
Swindon Works | 11/09/1950 | 10/10/1950 | 30 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB) |
783336 | |
Swindon Works | 18/06/1952 | 01/08/1952 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
887127 | |
Swindon Works | 28/12/1953 | 26/01/1954 | 30 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4034 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
979999 | |
Swindon Works | 26/05/1955 | 19/08/1955 | 86 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2683 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1060624 | |
Swindon Works | 25/09/1956 | 25/01/1957 | 123 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6662 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2643 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1134110 | |
Swindon Works | 07/10/1958 | 05/12/1958 | 60 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2802 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1225523 | |
Swindon Works | 26/09/1960 | 17/11/1960 | 53 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7656 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2796 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
1328420 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. | SLS/194604 |
31/08/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). | SLS/194710 |
30/09/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. | SLS/194712 |
30/04/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902. |
SLS/194906 |
04/03/1962 | Swindon Works ('A' Shop) | Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. | SLS/196204 |
15/11/1964 | Crewe North MPD (Also on shed) | Ex-Works: D208, D380, D1631/2, 42546, 46491 44803, 70033, 78023; Stored: 45552/4/6, 45617/72/6, 45704, 46228/35/9/40/5/8,51/4/6, 71000. Also on shed: D1585, D1697, D1744, 5056. | SLS/196412 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/06/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5056, name: OGMORE CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
22/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/10/1936. Dep: 11/11/1936. | ||
20/09/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'EARL OF POWIS' | ||
05/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/01/1938. Dep: 27/02/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2652 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/06/1938. Dep: 11/07/1938. | ||
28/07/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 28/07/1939. Dep: 28/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6649 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2793 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/04/1942. Dep: 25/05/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2387 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/02/1944. Dep: 11/08/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2634 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1946. Dep: 11/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4643 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
04/03/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2607 | ||
28/07/1946 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2437 | ||
18/04/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2627 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
07/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/08/1947. Dep: 11/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB) |
||
31/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/03/1949. Dep: 09/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4620 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2893 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/09/1950. Dep: 10/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB) |
||
23/10/1950 | To Store | To Store at Swindon (82C) | ||
04/11/1950 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
04/11/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2700 | ||
18/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/06/1952. Dep: 01/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/12/1953. Dep: 26/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4034 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/01/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2428 | ||
29/01/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2630 | ||
26/03/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2883 | ||
26/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/05/1955. Dep: 19/08/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2683 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/09/1956. Dep: 25/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6662 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2643 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/06/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2819 | ||
06/09/1958 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2563 | ||
07/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/10/1958. Dep: 05/12/1958. Work undertaken: Tender number 2802 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/09/1960. Dep: 17/11/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7656 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2796 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
29/03/1962 | Modification | Diagram HD number 7679 boiler fitted | ||
29/03/1962 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4017 | ||
26/07/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L) | ||
13/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hereford (86C) | ||
14/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Oxley (2B) | ||
21/11/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5056 from Oxley (2B) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |