|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 14/01/1937 | 1 day | Running Repairs | ||||
Swindon Works | 10/05/1938 | 14/07/1938 | 66 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2688 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
120649 | |
Swindon Works | 28/06/1939 | 23/07/1939 | 26 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 12/03/1940 | 11/05/1940 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 6628 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
224980 | |
Swindon Works | 07/02/1941 | 14/02/1941 | 8 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/10/1942 | 16/11/1942 | 42 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
351430 | |
Swindon Works | 12/10/1944 | 30/11/1944 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 6639 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2551 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
437234 | |
Swindon Works | 18/12/1945 | 22/01/1946 | 36 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2809 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 11/03/1947 | 23/04/1947 | 44 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2533 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
530046 | |
Swindon Works | 10/09/1948 | 11/10/1948 | 32 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 21/01/1949 | 11/02/1949 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 29/03/1949 | 06/05/1949 | 39 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
607350 | |
Swindon Works | 09/08/1949 | 19/08/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 23/01/1950 | 17/02/1950 | 26 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4031 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 09/08/1950 | 31/08/1950 | 23 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2409 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 19/01/1951 | 01/03/1951 | 42 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2722 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
687140 | |
Swindon Works | 23/10/1951 | 22/11/1951 | 31 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/03/1952 | 30/04/1952 | 37 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4072 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 25/07/1952 | 10/09/1952 | 48 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
772537 | |
Swindon Works | 01/09/1953 | 08/10/1953 | 38 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2904 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 03/04/1954 | 08/06/1954 | 67 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7651 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
868089 | |
Swindon Works | 09/10/1954 | 22/11/1954 | 45 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4051 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 23/03/1955 | 09/05/1955 | 48 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 15/02/1956 | 05/04/1956 | 51 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2773 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
951085 | |
Swindon Works | 09/05/1958 | 31/07/1958 | 84 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7675 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
1057634 | |
Swindon Works | 04/01/1960 | 24/03/1960 | 81 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4099 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1135127 | |
Swindon Works | 12/03/1962 | 17/05/1962 | 67 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7672 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1226505 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during March included: 1701, 2401, 2474, 2534, 2612, 2702, 2787, 2843, 2908, 2924, 2938, 2981, 3018, 3024, 3029, 3447, 4000, 4075, 4098, 4318, 5001, 5014, 5057, 5065, 5066, 5077, 5093, 5348, 5367, 6320, 6340, 6394, 7316, L.M.S. 8454, W.D. 77288, 78671 and 79234. (Last of the present batch of W.D. 2-8-00 to undergo repair here). Further locos. to receive T.F. boilers are: 4634, 5423, 5750, 6414 and 7428. Works' pilots during March included: 200, 201, 242, 1731, 1795, 2733, 2773 and 3561. 5705 has appeared with the G.W.R. monogram painted on the pannier tanks. New engines reported are: 1027 WES, 1028 BRD, 9402/3 PDN. Straight-sided 4,000 gallon tenders: The design as modified to suit the 'Castles' differs from the original tenders built for the '1000' Class as follows: It is 6in. narrower across the sides to match the cab width of the engine, and the running-plate is lowered to the same height as that under the engine cab. (It may not be generally realised that the '1000' Class have wider cabs and slightly higher running-plates under the cabs than what has always been standard). The coal space between the tanks is narrower so as to maintain the width of tank unchanged, and the shovel hole is also narrower. There are one or two other very minor differences, but otherwise the two types are the same. It appears that while the modified design can be used with all engine classes for which 4,000 gallon tenders are authorised, the original type will be restricted to the '1000' Class. | SLS/194705 |
30/09/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during September included: Nos. 1000/25, 1430/40/61, 1957/91, 2144/81/88/94, 2224/46/71, 2827/38/42/72/77/82, 2948, 3617, 3861/64/66, 3904/55, 4000/37/44/58/88, 4128, 4280, 4407, 4509/32/37/40/50, 4639, 4704, 4804, 4973/75/78, 5011/57/71/79, 5153/56, 5207, 5369/75, 5510/54/74, 5718/33/61, 5903/34/51/62/69/84, 6005/06/12, 6133, 6337/40/75/93, 6406/30, 6801/47, 6905/16/52/70, 7004/05/17, 7306/09, 7402/22, 7800/18, 8722/37/39, 9612, 9730. New work; September: Nos. 7435 (-), 7436 (OXF), 7437 (WOS), 7438 (DG) (completed 5/10); 4160 (-). 4161 (BRY), 4162 (-), 4163 (BRY) and 4164 (DYD), nearly completed. Works' pilots have been Nos. 212, 1713, 1900 an 2764. Outside the Works and awaiting scrapping are the following:-Nos. 1730, 2643/80, 2734/46/51, 3002/06/27, 3165/84, 3440, 5127, 5343/49 an 9006. In addition, Nos. 2709, 2928, 3005 an 3395 came in for scrapping at the beginning of October. All locomotives receiving a general repair (except express passenger locomotives) are now coming out painted plain black with the exception of No. 5156, which was fully lined, but without 'British Railways' on the tank sides. The majority of locomotives are now receiving smokebox number-plates. No. 7017 was ex. Works on 22/9 after light repairs and is now running without nameplates |
SLS/194811 |
31/01/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted |
SLS/194903 |
31/03/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48. No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear. |
SLS/194905 |
31/07/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work July: Nos. 1501 (1/7), 1502 (27/7). Both are unlined black. Locomotives entering Works during July included: Nos. 1005/12/25, 1467/68, 2206, 2856/86, 2920, 3663, 3779, 3853, 4013/41/56/61, 4133, 4381, 4631, 4901/43, 5050/69, 5238, 5369, 5552/59, 5918, 6003, 6103/08/22, 6320 (for re-conversion), 6336/45/54, 6417, 6804/38, 6910, 7307, 7809, 7905, 8762. Condemned: 2708 an 9087. No. 3837 (ex 4854) has been re-converted to coal-burning. No. 6020 has been painted blue, while No. 4961 has been Painted black and fully lined. The first of the contractor built series of 94XX arrived on Works on 27/7 viz: Nos. 8400 an 8401; they have entered shops to have the A.T.C. gear fitted. Works' Nos. checked are: Bagnall 2910/11 of 1949. Awaiting Works at the east end of the yard- were Nos. 1000, 2708, 2875, 3635, 4981, 5057, 5554/57, 6844; No. 2863 (ex 4805-oil-burning) was also in evidence. B shop contained Nos. 1363, 1467/68, 2206/11, 2572, 3663/77, 4631, 6408/09/17, 7735, 9638. New engines from Bagnall's were Nos. 8400/1 (makers Nos. 2910/1) and Swindon construction included Nos. 7026 (painted), 7027, 1504 (painted), 1505 and the frames of a diesel (Lot 363). Barry 0-6-2T's Nos. 212, 213 an 246 were acting as Works' shunters. |
SLS/194909 |
31/08/1949 | Swindon Works | New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. | SLS/194910 |
28/11/1959 | Banbury MPD | With the increased traffic occasioned by the transfer of Wolverhampton-Birmingham-London trains from the LMR, this shed has acquired three Castles viz. 4078, 5057 an 7011 i.e. including Banbury Castle. Crewe's last steam engine (92250) has been transferred away to Newport (86A) but additional 9Fs ex Swindon Works have been allocated viz. 92211/2/3. | SLS/196001 |
15/02/1960 | Banbury MPD | In mid-February, one 'Castle' only was in service (4078) as 5057 was at Swindon and 7011 at Stafford Road Works; 'Halls' were deputising. In store are 2248(85B), 2858(86A) and 5375(84C)-wdn. 10/59. | SLS/196003 |
26/04/1964 | Swindon Works (Dump) | Works Yard: D3508, D3811, 1024, 1447, 1666, 2818, 3721, 4652, 4923, 6106, 6147, 6871, 6915, 6952, 7812, 8102, 8732, 8738, 9425, 9431, 9484, 9486, 9743, 9752, 42961, 42978, 42983, 43001, 43115, 43132, 73003, 73021. A Shop: D812, D831, D846, D1004, D1005, D1013, D1027, D1035, D1041, D848, D1043, D1058, D1065, D1067, D3421, D3808, D3816, D3823, D3828, D3831, D7026, D7029, D7064, D7071, D7080, D9500, D9501, D9502, D9503, D9504, D9505, D9506, D9057 motors mounted, D9508, D9509, D9510, D9511 frames only, 4144, 7019, 7915, 8486, 42954, 42958, 43002, 43044, 43056, 43075, 43090, 43109, 73053, 73066, 76077, 76081, 92225. C Shop: 6025. Dump: 1650, 4706, 5057, 6010, 6603, 6680, 6824, 9420, 9603, 47623. | SLS/196406 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/06/1936 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5057, name: PENRICE CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Newton Abbot (NA) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
14/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 14/01/1937. | ||
06/10/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'EARL WALDEGRAVE' | ||
03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Exeter (EXE) | ||
04/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA) | ||
10/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/05/1938. Dep: 14/07/1938. Work undertaken: Tender number 2688 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
28/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/06/1939. Dep: 23/07/1939. | ||
12/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/03/1940. Dep: 11/05/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6628 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
07/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/02/1941. Dep: 14/02/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2443 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
21/06/1941 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2682 | ||
06/10/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/10/1942. Dep: 16/11/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2405 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1944. Dep: 30/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6639 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2551 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/12/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1945. Dep: 22/01/1946. Work undertaken: Tender number 2809 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/03/1947. Dep: 23/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2533 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Laira (LA) | ||
10/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/09/1948. Dep: 11/10/1948. | ||
21/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/01/1949. Dep: 11/02/1949. | ||
29/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/03/1949. Dep: 06/05/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1949. Dep: 19/08/1949. | ||
23/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/01/1950. Dep: 17/02/1950. Work undertaken: Tender number 4031 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/08/1950. Dep: 31/08/1950. Work undertaken: Tender number 2409 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/01/1951. Dep: 01/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2722 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/01/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
01/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
23/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/10/1951. Dep: 22/11/1951. Work undertaken: Tender number 2389 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) | ||
25/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1952. Dep: 30/04/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 4072 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
30/04/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (83D) | ||
25/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/07/1952. Dep: 10/09/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 2693 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/09/1953. Dep: 08/10/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2904 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/04/1954. Dep: 08/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7651 (Diagram HD) Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
09/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/10/1954. Dep: 22/11/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 4051 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/03/1955. Dep: 09/05/1955. Work undertaken: Tender number 2847 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/02/1956. Dep: 05/04/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2773 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
09/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/05/1958. Dep: 31/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7675 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached. Double Chimney fitted |
||
04/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Banbury (84C) | ||
04/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/01/1960. Dep: 24/03/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4099 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
12/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/03/1962. Dep: 17/05/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7672 (Diagram HD) Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5057 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
08/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |