Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 134 Today
» 1048 Yesterday
» 2119 Week
» 9303 Month
» 317284 Year
» 1201665 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5058   23/05/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
23/05/1937 NEWPORT CASTLE
01/09/1937 EARL OF CLANCARTY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 23/05/1937 to Newton Abbot (NA)
Withdrawal Wed 06/03/1963
Scrapping During 04/1963 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 25 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2717 05/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 06/07/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2734 08/05/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2814 20/06/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2597 03/07/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2549 18/11/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2777 27/02/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2440 13/02/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2552 10/10/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2811 27/07/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2613 20/06/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2659 29/12/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2805 30/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 28/01/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2857 11/08/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2745 08/04/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2883 21/07/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NA Newton Abbot (New) 23/05/1937
83D Laira m/e 03/1950
83A Newton Abbot 29/05/1957
83D Laira 01/06/1957
82C Swindon 22/09/1959
83D Laira 30/11/1959
85B Gloucester Horton Road 11/09/1961
   Stored (Gloucester Horton Road) 12/11/1962
   Withdrawn 06/03/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 25/03/1950
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN 65   4w/e 09/03/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
23/05/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6647)
03/07/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4614)
10/10/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6666)
25/03/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4639)
27/07/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6616)
28/02/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6612)
29/12/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6662)
28/01/1957 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4614)
08/04/1960 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6607)
16/07/1962 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6647)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 27/05/1939 15/07/1939 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
124317
Swindon Works 20/03/1941 11/05/1941 53 days Light Repair
Tender number 2734 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/05/1942 25/06/1942 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
259497
Swindon Works 25/05/1943 09/07/1943 46 days Light Repair
Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
309791
Swindon Works 30/09/1944 18/11/1944 50 days Intermediate
Tender number 2549 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
362449
Swindon Works 02/09/1947 10/10/1947 39 days General
Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2552 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
462589
Swindon Works 18/02/1949 25/03/1949 36 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA)
517813
Swindon Works 08/06/1950 27/07/1950 50 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2811 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
576427
Swindon Works 20/05/1951 20/06/1951 32 days Light Casual
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/01/1952 28/02/1952 31 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB)
667143
Swindon Works 02/11/1953 29/12/1953 58 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6662 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
769686
Swindon Works 05/02/1955 30/03/1955 54 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2805 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
847216
Swindon Works 16/04/1956 28/01/1957 288 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
920592
Swindon Works 07/03/1957 21/03/1957 15 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 05/06/1958 11/08/1958 68 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2857 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1016686
Swindon Works 10/02/1960 08/04/1960 59 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1118751
Swindon Works 16/05/1962 16/07/1962 62 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB)
1209419

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2717    
23/05/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 5058, name: NEWPORT CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Newton Abbot (NA)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
01/09/1937 Naming Renamed 'EARL OF CLANCARTY'    
27/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 27/05/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/03/1941. Dep: 11/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2734 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 04/05/1942. Dep: 25/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/05/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/05/1943. Dep: 09/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1944. Dep: 18/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2549 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/02/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2777    
13/02/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2440    
02/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1947. Dep: 10/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2552 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 18/02/1949. Dep: 25/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA)
   
03/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
08/06/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/06/1950. Dep: 27/07/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2811 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/05/1951. Dep: 20/06/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2613 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/01/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 29/01/1952. Dep: 28/02/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6612 (Diagram HB)
   
02/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/11/1953. Dep: 29/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6662 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/02/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/02/1955. Dep: 30/03/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2805 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/04/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/04/1956. Dep: 28/01/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4614 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1957. Dep: 21/03/1957.    
29/05/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
05/06/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/06/1958. Dep: 11/08/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2857 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
30/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
10/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1960. Dep: 08/04/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6607 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
11/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
16/05/1962 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/05/1962. Dep: 16/07/1962.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6647 (Diagram HB)
   
21/07/1962 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2883    
12/11/1962 To Store To Store at Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
06/03/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5058 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
04/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev