Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4062 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17468 Week
» 70484 Month
» 190011 Year
» 3216864 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5059 |
29/12/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24059 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
29/12/1959 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
04/10/1975 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 9 mths , 5 dys |
Cut Up |
03/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
29/12/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1970 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/12/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
28/05/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
07/11/1963 |
Not severe |
|
Train heating boiler burners |
Not known |
|
|
06/04/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Electrical insulation |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5059 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
18/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
01/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
15/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
07/1970 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24059 |
|
|
04/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24059 |
|
|
03/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|