Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 74 Today
» 1159 Yesterday
» 2308 Week
» 23210 Month
» 23210 Year
» 1244775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5059   08/06/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/06/1937 POWIS CASTLE
15/10/1937 EARL ST ALDWYN

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 08/06/1937 to Exeter (EXE)
Withdrawal Fri 22/06/1962 off Shrewsbury (89A)
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 25 yrs , 14 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2718 29/05/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2416 19/08/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2638 01/06/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2809 20/11/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2923 29/01/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2923 20/06/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2879 03/05/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4002 24/08/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4007 14/08/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2777 20/05/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2778 01/03/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4001 27/03/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2852 02/04/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2870 31/10/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2819 17/05/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2757 24/04/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXE Exeter (New) 08/06/1937
83A Newton Abbot m/e 05/1953
84A Stafford Road 02/04/1958
84G Shrewsbury 17/05/1960
   Withdrawn 22/06/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 13/06/1953
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 13/06/1959
WDN   m/e 30/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/06/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6648)
20/11/1944 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6603)
03/05/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4604)
24/08/1950 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4610)
14/08/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6678)
01/03/1956 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4647)
31/10/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6619)
24/04/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6691)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 26/06/1939 29/09/1939 96 days Intermediate
Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
125132
Swindon Works 09/10/1944 20/11/1944 43 days General
Boiler number 6603 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2809 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
368388
Swindon Works 01/01/1946 29/01/1946 29 days Light Repair
Tender number 2923 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/05/1946 20/06/1946 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2923 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 19/03/1948 03/05/1948 46 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2879 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
494794
Swindon Works 21/07/1950 24/08/1950 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4002 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
568313
Swindon Works 24/06/1952 14/08/1952 52 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
644029
Swindon Works 24/03/1954 20/05/1954 58 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2777 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/01/1956 01/03/1956 32 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4647 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
816987
Swindon Works 06/03/1956 27/03/1956 22 days Unclassified
Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 13/12/1957 02/04/1958 111 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
922269
Swindon Works 25/08/1958 31/10/1958 68 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 6619 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2870 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
946471
Swindon Works 30/04/1959 17/05/1960 384 days Heavy Casual
Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/03/1961 24/04/1961 53 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2757 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1001629

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/05/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2718    
08/06/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 5059, name: POWIS CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Exeter (EXE)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
15/10/1937 Naming Renamed 'EARL ST ALDWYN'    
26/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/06/1939. Dep: 29/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2416 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/06/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2638    
09/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1944. Dep: 20/11/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6603 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2809 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/01/1946. Dep: 29/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2923 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 20/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2923 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1948. Dep: 03/05/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4604 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2879 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/07/1950. Dep: 24/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4002 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
24/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/06/1952. Dep: 14/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6678 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
24/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1954. Dep: 20/05/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2777 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 30/01/1956. Dep: 01/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4647 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2778 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/03/1956. Dep: 27/03/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4001 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/12/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 13/12/1957. Dep: 02/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2852 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
25/08/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/08/1958. Dep: 31/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6619 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2870 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/04/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1959. Dep: 17/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2819 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
03/03/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/03/1961. Dep: 24/04/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2757 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/06/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5059 from Shrewsbury (89A)    
02/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev