Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 214 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 214 Week
» 11785 Month
» 260078 Year
» 1144459 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5064   08/07/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
08/07/1937 TRETOWER CASTLE
09/1937 BISHOP'S CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Fri 08/07/1937 to Newton Abbot (NA)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off Gloucester Horton Road (85B)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 25 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2730 26/07/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2630 28/06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2577 24/04/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2662 19/08/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2571 21/08/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2732 23/05/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2760 27/08/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2700 20/09/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4003 03/10/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2913 17/12/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4121 09/12/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2569 17/02/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4092 24/01/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4065 19/12/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2726 26/09/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4006 18/11/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NA Newton Abbot (New) 08/07/1937
SRD Stafford Road m/e 09/1937
4A Shrewsbury m/e 10/1937
82A Bristol Bath Road 05/10/1950
82C Swindon 23/04/1958
85B Gloucester Horton Road 11/09/1961
   Withdrawn 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 82C Swindon 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 07/10/1961
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/07/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6653)
19/08/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6687)
27/08/1946 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4609)
20/09/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6677)
05/10/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6603)
17/12/1952 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7648)
19/12/1956 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7646)
26/09/1958 Double Chimney fitted
18/11/1960 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7697)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 10/05/1939 05/07/1939 57 days Intermediate
Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
108890
Swindon Works 03/03/1941 28/04/1941 57 days Light Repair
Tender number 2577 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/06/1942 24/08/1942 64 days General
Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2662 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
228371
Swindon Works 05/04/1944 27/05/1944 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2732 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
314524
Swindon Works 23/07/1946 27/08/1946 36 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2760 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
415832
Swindon Works 18/08/1948 20/09/1948 34 days General
Boiler number 6677 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
507198
Swindon Works 01/09/1950 05/10/1950 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6603 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
592570
Swindon Works 04/11/1952 17/12/1952 44 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7648 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2913 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
691303
Swindon Works 05/11/1953 09/12/1953 35 days Light Casual
Tender number 4121 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/12/1954 17/02/1955 59 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
788597
Swindon Works 03/11/1956 19/12/1956 47 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7646 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4065 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
889280
Swindon Works 22/07/1958 26/09/1958 67 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2726 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
980154
Swindon Works 16/09/1960 18/11/1960 64 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7697 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1073216

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/07/1937 To Service To service as GWR Number 5064, name: TRETOWER CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Newton Abbot (NA)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
26/07/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2730    
09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
09/1937 Naming Renamed 'BISHOP'S CASTLE'    
10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
10/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/05/1939. Dep: 05/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/03/1941. Dep: 28/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2577 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1942. Dep: 24/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6687 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2662 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/04/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/04/1944. Dep: 27/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2732 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/07/1946. Dep: 27/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4609 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2760 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1948. Dep: 20/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6677 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2700 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
01/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/09/1950. Dep: 05/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6603 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4003 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
05/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
04/11/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/11/1952. Dep: 17/12/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7648 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2913 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/11/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/11/1953. Dep: 09/12/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4121 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
21/12/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/12/1954. Dep: 17/02/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2569 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/01/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4092    
03/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/11/1956. Dep: 19/12/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7646 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4065 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
23/04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
22/07/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/07/1958. Dep: 26/09/1958.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2726 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
16/09/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/09/1960. Dep: 18/11/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7697 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4006 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5064 from Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev