|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 05/06/1939 | 03/08/1939 | 60 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
126417 | |
Swindon Works | 24/03/1941 | 16/05/1941 | 54 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2771 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
224212 | |
Swindon Works | 25/09/1942 | 19/10/1942 | 25 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2548 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 13/06/1943 | 06/08/1943 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2682 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
330689 | |
Swindon Works | 29/09/1943 | 09/10/1943 | 11 days | Running Repairs | Tender number 2783 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 01/02/1944 | 17/02/1944 | 17 days | Running Repairs | Tender number 2662 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 16/05/1944 | 09/06/1944 | 25 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2781 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 14/11/1944 | 22/12/1944 | 39 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 26/10/1945 | 03/12/1945 | 39 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2571 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
432217 | |
Swindon Works | 01/03/1947 | 09/04/1947 | 40 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 19/01/1948 | 20/02/1948 | 33 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2685 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
531117 | |
Swindon Works | 20/09/1949 | 26/10/1949 | 37 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
619334 | |
Swindon Works | 17/04/1951 | 16/05/1951 | 30 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4018 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 08/11/1951 | 18/12/1951 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4011 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
701581 | |
Swindon Works | 08/04/1952 | 02/05/1952 | 25 days | Light Casual | Tender number 4102 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 05/02/1953 | 23/03/1953 | 47 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2533 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 24/10/1953 | 04/12/1953 | 42 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
803473 | |
Swindon Works | 12/09/1955 | 19/10/1955 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7632 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4044 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
902452 | |
Swindon Works | 28/05/1956 | 09/10/1956 | 135 days | Heavy Casual | Tender number 2683 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 06/06/1957 | 06/08/1957 | 62 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6697 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4076 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
984407 | |
Swindon Works | 14/04/1959 | 08/06/1959 | 56 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 7621 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1079540 | |
Swindon Works | 08/12/1960 | 02/02/1961 | 57 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7620 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4070 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1162659 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1945 | Swindon Works | Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. | SLS/194602 |
31/03/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during March included: 1701, 2401, 2474, 2534, 2612, 2702, 2787, 2843, 2908, 2924, 2938, 2981, 3018, 3024, 3029, 3447, 4000, 4075, 4098, 4318, 5001, 5014, 5057, 5065, 5066, 5077, 5093, 5348, 5367, 6320, 6340, 6394, 7316, L.M.S. 8454, W.D. 77288, 78671 and 79234. (Last of the present batch of W.D. 2-8-00 to undergo repair here). Further locos. to receive T.F. boilers are: 4634, 5423, 5750, 6414 and 7428. Works' pilots during March included: 200, 201, 242, 1731, 1795, 2733, 2773 and 3561. 5705 has appeared with the G.W.R. monogram painted on the pannier tanks. New engines reported are: 1027 WES, 1028 BRD, 9402/3 PDN. Straight-sided 4,000 gallon tenders: The design as modified to suit the 'Castles' differs from the original tenders built for the '1000' Class as follows: It is 6in. narrower across the sides to match the cab width of the engine, and the running-plate is lowered to the same height as that under the engine cab. (It may not be generally realised that the '1000' Class have wider cabs and slightly higher running-plates under the cabs than what has always been standard). The coal space between the tanks is narrower so as to maintain the width of tank unchanged, and the shovel hole is also narrower. There are one or two other very minor differences, but otherwise the two types are the same. It appears that while the modified design can be used with all engine classes for which 4,000 gallon tenders are authorised, the original type will be restricted to the '1000' Class. | SLS/194705 |
30/09/1947 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. | SLS/194712 |
31/01/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds | SLS/194803 |
19/08/1962 | Wolverhampton Works (Awaiting works) | In Works: 1020, 1630, 3615, 3721, 4636, 4697, 4703, 5181/4, 5564, 6160, 6614/8, 7739, 7816, 8104, 9422/70, 9613/24/6/47/65, 82008; Weigh house: 6156; Awaiting works: 3217, 4938/61, 5065, 5658, 7002, 7824, 9415. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/07/1937 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 5065, name: UPTON CASTLE Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Exeter (EXE) Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g Diagram HB boiler fitted |
||
03/09/1937 | Naming | Renamed 'NEWPORT CASTLE' | ||
05/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 05/06/1939. Dep: 03/08/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2558 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/08/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF) | ||
24/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/03/1941. Dep: 16/05/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2771 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
25/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/09/1942. Dep: 19/10/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2548 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1943. Dep: 06/08/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6671 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2682 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 29/09/1943. Dep: 09/10/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2783 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 01/02/1944. Dep: 17/02/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2662 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/05/1944. Dep: 09/06/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2781 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/11/1944. Dep: 22/12/1944. Work undertaken: Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
26/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1945. Dep: 03/12/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6601 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2571 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 09/04/1947. Work undertaken: Tender number 2566 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
19/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/01/1948. Dep: 20/02/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4623 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2685 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/09/1949. Dep: 26/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6637 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
26/10/1949 | To Store | To Store at Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
14/04/1950 | To Store | To Store at Swindon (82C) | ||
08/1950 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
17/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/04/1951. Dep: 16/05/1951. Work undertaken: Tender number 4018 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/11/1951. Dep: 18/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6640 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4011 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1952. Dep: 02/05/1952. Work undertaken: Tender number 4102 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/02/1953. Dep: 23/03/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2533 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 24/10/1953. Dep: 04/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6642 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2729 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
12/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/09/1955. Dep: 19/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7632 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4044 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
28/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/05/1956. Dep: 09/10/1956. Work undertaken: Tender number 2683 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/03/1957 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2640 | ||
06/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/06/1957. Dep: 06/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6697 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4076 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/04/1959. Dep: 08/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7621 (Diagram HC) Tender number 2539 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/12/1960. Dep: 02/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7620 (Diagram HC) Tender number 4070 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/04/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2843 | ||
07/10/1961 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4039 | ||
07/01/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5065 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |