Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 428 Today
» 961 Yesterday
» 5385 Week
» 12569 Month
» 320550 Year
» 1204931 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5073   13/07/1938

Names Carried
Date From Name
13/07/1938 CRANBROOK CASTLE
01/1941 BLENHEIM

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 13/07/1938 to Laira (LA)
Withdrawal Wed 26/02/1964 off Cardiff East Dock (88A)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2746 07/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2792 24/12/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2676 19/05/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2633 20/03/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2671 09/01/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2443 14/06/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 21/03/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2651 19/05/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2541 17/06/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2713 27/03/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2842 16/01/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4057 07/09/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4060 08/09/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4118 25/09/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2853 31/07/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2687 30/11/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LA Laira (New) 13/07/1938
SRD Stafford Road m/e 12/1938
4A Shrewsbury m/e 02/1939
82A Bristol Bath Road 20/03/1958
83B Taunton 13/09/1960
88A Cardiff Canton 11/09/1961
88L Cardiff East Dock 07/09/1962
   Withdrawn 26/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   26/03/1964
WDN   5w/e 30/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
13/07/1938 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6660)
19/05/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4628)
09/01/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6664)
21/03/1950 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4629)
16/01/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6615)
07/09/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6617)
25/09/1957 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7655)
31/07/1959 Double Chimney fitted
31/07/1959 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7686)
30/11/1961 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7687)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 24/01/1940 09/03/1940 46 days Intermediate 83993
Swindon Works 23/05/1940 26/06/1940 35 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 14/10/1941 24/12/1941 72 days Light Repair
Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 31/03/1943 28/05/1943 59 days General
Boiler number 4628 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2676 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
206124
Swindon Works 12/02/1945 20/03/1945 37 days Intermediate
Tender number 2633 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
292520
Swindon Works 02/12/1947 09/01/1948 39 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6664 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2671 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
375776
Swindon Works 15/02/1950 21/03/1950 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
448483
Swindon Works 01/03/1951 27/03/1951 27 days Light Casual
Tender number 2713 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 04/12/1951 16/01/1952 44 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2842 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
515461
Swindon Works 04/08/1953 24/08/1953 21 days Heavy General  
Swindon Works 04/08/1953 07/09/1953 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
593673
Swindon Works 06/08/1955 08/09/1955 34 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 4060 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
683075
Swindon Works 24/11/1956 25/09/1957 306 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7655 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4118 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
732359
Swindon Works 28/05/1959 31/07/1959 65 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7686 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2853 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
825556
Swindon Works 07/10/1961 30/11/1961 55 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7687 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
926274

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1938 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2746    
13/07/1938 To Service To service as GWR Number 5073, name: CRANBROOK CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Laira (LA)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
12/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
02/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
24/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 24/01/1940. Dep: 09/03/1940.    
23/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1940. Dep: 26/06/1940.    
01/1941 Naming Renamed 'BLENHEIM'    
14/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/10/1941. Dep: 24/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2792 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1943. Dep: 28/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4628 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2676 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/02/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1945. Dep: 20/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2633 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/12/1947. Dep: 09/01/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6664 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2671 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
14/06/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2443    
15/02/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 15/02/1950. Dep: 21/03/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4629 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/05/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2651    
17/06/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2541    
01/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/03/1951. Dep: 27/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2713 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 04/12/1951. Dep: 16/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6615 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2842 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 07/09/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6617 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4057 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
04/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/08/1953. Dep: 24/08/1953.    
06/08/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/08/1955. Dep: 08/09/1955.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4060 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
24/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/11/1956. Dep: 25/09/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7655 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4118 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
20/03/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
28/05/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 28/05/1959. Dep: 31/07/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7686 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2853 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
13/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Taunton (83B)    
11/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
07/10/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/10/1961. Dep: 30/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7687 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2687 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
07/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
26/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 5073 from Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev