Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 952 Today
» 1260 Yesterday
» 4551 Week
» 10685 Month
» 238569 Year
» 1460134 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5075 on 16/08/1938

Names Carried
Date From Name
16/08/1938 DEVIZES CASTLE
08/1940 WELLINGTON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 310
To Service Fri 16/08/1938 to Stafford Road (SRD)
Withdrawal Fri 21/09/1962 off St Philips Marsh (82B)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 24 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2763 16/08/1938 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2440 08/02/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2584 26/06/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2779 27/07/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2605 08/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4000 19/02/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2397 13/01/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2387 23/11/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 30/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2593 03/03/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 18/04/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4045 06/10/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4055 16/06/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4056 23/05/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4069 14/10/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2831 22/12/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SRD Stafford Road (New) 16/08/1938
SDN Swindon 28/03/1949
CHR Chester West 15/07/1949
84A Stafford Road m/e 05/1956
83D Laira m/e 04/1958
83C Exeter 18/06/1959
87A Neath (Court Sart) 25/07/1961
88A Cardiff Canton 27/01/1962
82B St Philips Marsh 14/07/1962
   Withdrawn 21/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHR Chester West 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC SRD Stafford Road 4w/e 23/04/1949
ALLOC CHR Chester West 4w/e 18/06/1949
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 19/05/1956
ALLOC 83D Laira 4w/e 19/04/1958
ALLOC 83C Exeter 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 4w/e 12/08/1961
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Canton 4w/e 27/01/1962
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 14/07/1962
WDN   m/e 30/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/08/1938 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6662)
26/06/1942 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4611)
08/12/1944 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4624)
03/03/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4655)
19/02/1948 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4613)
28/03/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6627)
23/11/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7640)
06/10/1953 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6696)
16/06/1955 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7615)
23/05/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7641)
14/10/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6676)
22/12/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7643)


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds SLS/194803
31/03/1949 Swindon Works New Work March: Nos. *7901 Dodington Hall (23/3), *7902 Eaton Mascot Hall (31/3); 9675 MTHR 4/3), 9676 CYS (10/3), 9677 CED (17/3). *Not allocated. Locomotives entering Works 28/2/49 to 30/3/49: Nos. 1002/09, 1086 (re-numbered 1147), 1213 (re-numbered 9), 1415, 1758 SDN (condemned), 1894 NPT (condemned), 2011/12, 2226/40/92/99, 2724 CYS (condemned), 69, 2806/36/71/82/83, 2902/15/31/81/87, 3032/33/43, 3175, 3386, 3562 OXF (condemned), 3616/45/55/88, 3719/44/47, 3819/29, 3901/55 (both for re-conversion), 4000/03/07/13/49, 4213/37/60/70, 4527/35/38/58/65/69/98, 4624, 4703, 4806/51 (both for re-conversion), 4936/55, 5020/33/55/57/75/89/91/95, 5166, 5310/30/41/72/96, 5509/66, 5719/28/98, 5931/79/88, 6017/24/25/28, 6132/53, 6341/53, 6720/47, 6803/22/54, 6900/02/07/33/46/55/62/64, 7202/09, 7302, 7415, 7766/84, 8753, 9311, 9600, 9704/08 and Class '8' W.D. 77234 (re-numbered 90201). Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include:-Nos. 1002/28, 2947, 4990, 6917/24, while Nos. 4007/20 are painted green and also lined. Works' pilots recently have been:-Nos. *212/13/46 and **1900. *Condemned 7/48. **Condemned 4/48.
No. 3150 has been fitted with the curved front end frames and cylinders (outside steam pipes) of No. 3184 (condemned in 1948). The original frames of No. 3150 had a square front end and the cylinders had internal steam pipes. No. 2123 has been fitted with auto gear.
SLS/194905
31/07/1962 Withdrawn GWR engines It is understood that the following have been withdrawn and are lying at their home sheds mainly: 1004/26, 1462, 2200/29/56/71/94, 3211, 3623/30/88/94, 3741/50/83, 4037/99, 4102/6/16/8/29/52, 4236/91, 4557/67, 4906/9/13/7/21/34/7/41/4/7/8/52/60/7/9/84/99, 5007/8/11/6/7/9/21/30/2/3/4/6/45/6/7/52/61/4/6/8/75/88/94, 5190, 5357/99, 5520/5/44/50/4/62, 5617/31/46/98, 5746, 5910/1/7/8/26/30/1/40/59/64/6/73/80/1/2/99, 6001/2/7/9/12/4/5/6/9/21/2/6/7, 6146, 6330/42/62/6/88/91, 6617/30/40/1/7, 7300/1/5/11/6/21/31/6/41, 8449, 9785, 42385, 90355/6/565/693. LTE has 7749 on loan pending permanent transfer. SLS/196210

Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 09/01/1940 18/02/1940 41 days Light Repair
Tender number 2440 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/08/1940 22/10/1940 64 days Intermediate 126606
Swindon Works 05/05/1942 27/06/1942 54 days Light Repair
Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
196546
Swindon Works 09/06/1943 31/07/1943 53 days Intermediate
Tender number 2779 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
254677
Swindon Works 04/11/1944 08/12/1944 35 days General
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2605 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
325831
Swindon Works 31/01/1947 03/03/1947 32 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
422737
Swindon Works 22/01/1948 19/02/1948 29 days Light Repair
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4000 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
470164
Swindon Works 25/02/1949 28/03/1949 32 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6627 (Diagram HB)
519748
Swindon Works 06/03/1950 04/04/1950 30 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 06/10/1950 23/11/1950 49 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2387 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
584631
Swindon Works 13/08/1952 30/09/1952 49 days Light Intermediate
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/08/1953 06/10/1953 50 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4045 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
682200
Swindon Works 25/04/1955 16/06/1955 53 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7615 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4055 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
752146
Swindon Works 01/02/1957 23/05/1957 112 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7641 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4056 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
831041
Swindon Works 01/09/1958 14/10/1958 44 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
908230
Swindon Works 29/10/1960 22/12/1960 55 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7643 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2831 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
999853

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
16/08/1938 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5075, name: DEVIZES CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Stafford Road (SRD)
Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
09/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/01/1940. Dep: 18/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2440 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/1940 Naming Renamed 'WELLINGTON'    
20/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/08/1940. Dep: 22/10/1940.    
05/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/05/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4611 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2584 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 09/06/1943. Dep: 31/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2779 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 08/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4624 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2605 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/01/1947. Dep: 03/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4655 (Diagram HA)
   
22/01/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1948. Dep: 19/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4613 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4000 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
25/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/02/1949. Dep: 28/03/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6627 (Diagram HB)
   
28/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
15/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (CHR)    
13/01/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2397    
06/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/03/1950. Dep: 04/04/1950.    
06/10/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/10/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7640 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2387 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/08/1952. Dep: 30/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/03/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2593    
18/04/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2421    
18/08/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/08/1953. Dep: 06/10/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4045 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
25/04/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 16/06/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7615 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4055 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
05/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
01/02/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/02/1957. Dep: 23/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7641 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4056 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
04/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Laira (83D)    
01/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 01/09/1958. Dep: 14/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
18/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Exeter (83C)    
29/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/10/1960. Dep: 22/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7643 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2831 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/07/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
27/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
14/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
21/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5075 from St Philips Marsh (82B)    

prev prev