Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 31 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7772 Week
» 28214 Month
» 365060 Year
» 1586625 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 5080 on 19/05/1939

Names Carried
Date From Name
19/05/1939 OGMORE CASTLE
01/1941 DEFIANT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 310
To Service Thu 19/05/1939 to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Withdrawal Thu 11/04/1963 off Llanelly (87F)
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2782 19/05/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2697 03/01/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2630 24/11/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2620 02/05/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2774 19/02/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2654 22/04/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2620 31/07/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2624 07/02/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2548 20/11/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2618 13/09/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2622 15/07/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2704 29/08/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 05/07/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2720 30/05/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4051 16/03/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing 4127 11/07/1953 GWR 3,800g
Hawksworth 4,000g 4051 05/09/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2895 28/04/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2669 19/03/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2543 15/03/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2912 07/09/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2928 01/01/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4046 15/05/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2822 17/02/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2550 07/09/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common (New) on 19/05/1939
CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 08/1940
SDN Swindon on 09/01/1941
CDF Cardiff Canton on 20/03/1941
SDN Swindon on 16/08/1949
CDF Cardiff Canton on 13/09/1949
87E Landore m/e 12/1955
87F Llanelly on 07/09/1961
   Stored (Llanelly) on 01/05/1962
   Withdrawn on 11/04/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 31/12/1955
ALLOC 87G Carmarthen 4w/e 06/10/1956
ALLOC 87E Landore 4w/e 26/01/1957
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 17/06/1961
WDN   4w/e 04/05/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 19/11/1940 09/01/1941 52 days Intermediate
Tender number 2697 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Named DEFIANT
 
Swindon Works 21/02/1941 20/03/1941 28 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 31/03/1942 06/05/1942 37 days Light Repair
Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/01/1943 21/02/1943 31 days Light Repair
Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 10/06/1944 02/08/1944 54 days Intermediate
Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/01/1946 07/02/1946 31 days General
Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 23/10/1947 20/11/1947 29 days Intermediate
Tender number 2548 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 25/03/1948 08/04/1948 15 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 28/07/1950 29/08/1950 33 days Light Casual
Tender number 2704 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 25/05/1951 05/07/1951 42 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 02/05/1952 30/05/1952 29 days Light Casual
Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/06/1952 18/06/1952 7 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 11/02/1953 16/03/1953 34 days Heavy General
Tender number 4051 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 22/03/1954 28/04/1954 38 days Light Casual
Tender number 2895 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 18/01/1955 10/03/1955 52 days Heavy Intermediate  
Swindon Works 30/03/1955 14/04/1955 16 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 16/01/1957 15/03/1957 59 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/11/1958 01/01/1959 34 days Heavy General
Tender number 2928 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/12/1960 17/02/1961 59 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2822 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 02/08/1961 07/09/1961 37 days Heavy Casual
Tender number 2550 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1946 Swindon Works Locos entering works during January: 207/42/70, 1751/86, 2084, 2116, 2221/74, 2679, 2766, 2802/11/53/62/98, 2912/51, 3034, 3188, 3219/64, 3754, 3808/63, 4004/13/7/21, 4125, 4299, 4326, 4539/47/98, 4615, 4811/5/54, 4909/51/6/63/90, 5019/46/55/6/80, 5161, 5361, 5403, 5534/40/52/65, 5906/25/51/72/4/85, 6003/10/4/9/22/6, 6112, 6314/45/7/56, 6690, 6721, 6919/61/5, 7300/9, 7700/8, 7804, 8359, 8704/14/22/70, 9301, 9768/89/91, WD 71488, 75046. SLS/194604
30/09/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. SLS/194712
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805
31/08/1949 Swindon Works New Work August: Nos. 7025 Sudeley Castle PDN (2/8), 7026 Tenby Castle (15/8), 7027 Thornbury Castle LA (25/8); 1503 PDN (8/8), 1504 PDN (17/8), 1505 PDN (29/8). Nos. 7025-27 are painted dark green and lined, while Nos. 1503-05 are unlined black. Contractor built: Nos. 8400 TYS, 8401 CDF, 8402 (W.G.B. 2912/49) PILL (26/8), 8450 (Y.E. Co. 2443/49) NPT (17/8). Nos. 8400-02/50 are unlined black. Condemned: Nos. 289 (original T.V. R/T boiler and curved top tanks), 1884 (closed cab), 1930 (open cab), 2902, 3182 an 3419. No. 6320 has been re-converted to coal-burning. Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. 1000/04/25, 1427/37, 2117 (closed cab), 2211/12/14/21/67, 2462, 2815/52/75/87, 3016/20, 3174/86, 3635/77, 3715/99, 3805/14/43, 4013/15/33/47/80, 4107/48/49/55, 4269/78, 4502/10/59/65/82/92/95, 4637/50/79/97, 4906/51/81, 5001/18/30/42/57/76/80/94/99, 5206, 5344/45/80, 5501/05/22/37/54, 5749, 5804, 5904/12/21/27/44/45/47/66, 6000/04/19, 6105/07/43/61, 6338/77, 6408/31, 6741, 6808/19/28/29/44, 6905/65, 7219/36, 7310, 7414, 7718, 7815/16, 7904, 8789, 9638 an 90712. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 1005/12, 4901/23/50, 5912/18 an 6920. September: A batch of new Class '2' 2-6-2T's and Class '4' 2-6-0's is to be built here. They will be similar to existing L.M.S. designs, but will have modified G.W.R. boilers. The frames have already been cut for five of the 2-6-0's. SLS/194910
14/05/1962 Cardiff Canton MPD By mid-May the following type 3 diesels had arrived-D7010, D7022/5/8-32. Although only diagrammed for the London main line, they have already appeared at Shrewsbury on the 1-13 p.m. Manchester and at Salisbury on the 12-50 p.m. Portsmouth. Four Neath Castles are stored at Canton, 4090, 5062, 5080 an 7028 whilst 5041/8 also scheduled to be stored at Canton are believed to be stored at Barry Works. SLS/196206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
19/05/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 5080, name: OGMORE CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)
Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g
   
08/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
19/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/11/1940. Dep: 09/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2697 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Named DEFIANT
   
09/01/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
21/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/02/1941. Dep: 20/03/1941.    
20/03/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
24/11/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2630    
31/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/03/1942. Dep: 06/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1943. Dep: 21/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2774 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/04/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2654    
10/06/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/06/1944. Dep: 02/08/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1946. Dep: 07/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2624 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/10/1947. Dep: 20/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2548 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/03/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1948. Dep: 08/04/1948.    
16/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
13/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CDF)    
13/09/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2618    
15/07/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2622    
28/07/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/07/1950. Dep: 29/08/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2704 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/05/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/05/1951. Dep: 05/07/1951.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/05/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1952. Dep: 30/05/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2720 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/06/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/06/1952. Dep: 18/06/1952.    
11/02/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 11/02/1953. Dep: 16/03/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4051 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
11/07/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing number 4127    
05/09/1953 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4051    
22/03/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/03/1954. Dep: 28/04/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2895 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/01/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/01/1955. Dep: 10/03/1955.    
19/03/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2669    
30/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/03/1955. Dep: 14/04/1955.    
12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87E)    
16/01/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/01/1957. Dep: 15/03/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2543 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/09/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2912    
29/11/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/11/1958. Dep: 01/01/1959.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2928 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/05/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4046    
21/12/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/12/1960. Dep: 17/02/1961.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2822 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/08/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 02/08/1961. Dep: 07/09/1961.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2550 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/09/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
01/05/1962 To Store To Store at Llanelly (87F)    
11/04/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5080 from Llanelly (87F)    

prev prev