Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 763 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3449 Week
» 4339 Month
» 312320 Year
» 1196701 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5081   03/06/1939

Names Carried
Date From Name
03/06/1939 PENRICE CASTLE
01/1941 LOCKHEED HUDSON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 03/06/1939 to Stafford Road (SRD)
Withdrawal Mon 21/10/1963 off Cardiff East Dock (88A)
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Hayes (Bridgend)
Service Life 24 yrs, 4 mths , 18 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2783 05/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2701 14/08/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2535 27/01/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2749 23/07/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 17/01/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2786 29/07/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4009 03/11/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2745 23/05/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2580 23/01/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing 4127 26/09/1952 GWR 3,800g
Collett 4,000g 2575 01/11/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2898 29/04/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2910 24/11/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2915 10/12/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4105 19/04/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2850 16/12/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2899 02/11/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4087 14/09/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SRD Stafford Road (New) 03/06/1939
PDN Old Oak Common 17/01/1945
NA Newton Abbot 13/01/1949
PDN Old Oak Common m/e 02/1949
85A Worcester 10/12/1954
86C Cardiff Canton 02/08/1960
87J Fishguard Goodwick (on loan) 09/03/1961
88A Cardiff Canton 10/05/1961
88L Cardiff East Dock 07/09/1962
   Withdrawn 21/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 86C Hereford 4w/e 10/09/1960
ALLOC 88L Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 08/09/1962
WDN   21/10/1963
WDN   5w/e 02/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/06/1939 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6668)
23/07/1943 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4617)
12/11/1946 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4639)
03/11/1948 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6634)
23/05/1950 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7635)
23/01/1952 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6691)
29/04/1953 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7609)
19/04/1956 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6693)
02/11/1959 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7638)
14/09/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7626)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 31/05/1941 1 day Intermediate  
Swindon Works 18/12/1942 30/01/1943 44 days Light Repair
Tender number 2535 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/06/1943 29/07/1943 52 days General
Boiler number 4617 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
217710
Swindon Works 25/11/1944 17/01/1945 54 days Intermediate
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
285940
Swindon Works 08/10/1946 12/11/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA)
382185
Swindon Works 11/06/1947 29/07/1947 49 days Light Repair
Tender number 2786 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 30/09/1948 03/11/1948 35 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4009 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
483740
Swindon Works 20/04/1950 23/05/1950 34 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
570364
Swindon Works 07/12/1951 23/01/1952 48 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
659652
Swindon Works 04/09/1952 26/09/1952 23 days Light Casual
Tender number 4127 (Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/03/1953 29/04/1953 49 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7609 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2898 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
717854
Swindon Works 06/10/1953 24/11/1953 50 days Light Casual
Tender number 2910 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 12/10/1954 10/12/1954 60 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2915 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
786974
Swindon Works 03/03/1956 19/04/1956 48 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6693 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4105 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
864851
Swindon Works 05/11/1957 19/12/1957 45 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2850 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
955080
Swindon Works 10/01/1958 04/02/1958 26 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 08/09/1959 02/11/1959 56 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7638 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2899 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1048510
Swindon Works 17/07/1961 14/09/1961 60 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7626 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4087 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1132919

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1939 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2783    
03/06/1939 To Service To service as GWR Number 5081, name: PENRICE CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Stafford Road (SRD)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
01/1941 Naming Renamed 'LOCKHEED HUDSON'    
31/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 31/05/1941.    
14/08/1941 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2701    
18/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/12/1942. Dep: 30/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2535 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1943. Dep: 29/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4617 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
25/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/11/1944. Dep: 17/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2603 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/01/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
08/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1946. Dep: 12/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4639 (Diagram HA)
   
11/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1947. Dep: 29/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2786 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/09/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 30/09/1948. Dep: 03/11/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6634 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4009 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
13/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (NA)    
02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
20/04/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 20/04/1950. Dep: 23/05/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7635 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2745 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/12/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/12/1951. Dep: 23/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6691 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/09/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 4127 (Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing) attached.
   
01/11/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2575    
12/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/03/1953. Dep: 29/04/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7609 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2898 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/10/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1953. Dep: 24/11/1953.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2910 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/10/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/10/1954. Dep: 10/12/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2915 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
03/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/03/1956. Dep: 19/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6693 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4105 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
05/11/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/11/1957. Dep: 19/12/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2850 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/01/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/01/1958. Dep: 04/02/1958.    
08/09/1959 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/09/1959. Dep: 02/11/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7638 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2899 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/08/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
09/03/1961 Allocation Loaned to Fishguard Goodwick (87J)    
10/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (88A)    
17/07/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/07/1961. Dep: 14/09/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7626 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4087 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
07/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88L)    
21/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5081 from Cardiff East Dock (88A)    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend    

prev prev