Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5082 |
29/03/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24082 |
19/10/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
29/03/1960 to March (31B) |
Withdrawn |
01/03/1979 off Crewe Diesel (CD) |
Time in Service |
18 yrs, 11 mths , 0 dys |
Cut Up |
04/1979 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
29/03/1960 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
11/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
29/03/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
11/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
29/03/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5082 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to March (31B) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
02/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
21/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
12/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Watford (1C) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
07/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
11/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
19/10/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24082 |
|
|
10/07/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
02/10/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
01/03/1979 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24082 from Crewe Diesel (CD) |
|
|
04/1979 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|