Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 164 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 2071 Week
» 20853 Month
» 269146 Year
» 1153527 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 5082   16/06/1939

Names Carried
Date From Name
16/06/1939 POWIS CASTLE
01/1941 SWORDFISH

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class Castle
Company History GWR
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Mon 16/06/1939 to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)
Withdrawal Mon 02/07/1962 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 23 yrs , 16 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2784 06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2598 03/04/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2821 12/09/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2441 01/03/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2413 07/04/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2655 11/11/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2530 21/04/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2433 14/07/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2871 13/08/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2868 31/07/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2861 22/07/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2679 21/12/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4067 21/03/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4060 07/11/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2867 01/03/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2652 09/08/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2659 12/10/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2565 18/04/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4070 03/11/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2736 07/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2398 03/02/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2553 03/12/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BRD Bristol Bath Road (New) 16/06/1939
Brd Weston-super-Mare m/e 04/1944
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 05/1944
81A Old Oak Common 07/11/1952
   Withdrawn 02/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 29/11/1952
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
16/06/1939 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6669)
21/04/1945 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4612)
31/07/1947 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4606)
22/07/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4608)
21/03/1951 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6652)
07/11/1952 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4610)
12/10/1955 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 6696)
03/02/1959 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7644)
02/12/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7625)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 21/06/1939 27/06/1939 7 days Running Repairs  
Swindon Works 10/02/1941 08/04/1941 58 days Intermediate
Tender number 2598 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
98616
Swindon Works 20/01/1943 02/03/1943 42 days Intermediate
Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
206647
Swindon Works 24/11/1943 21/12/1943 28 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 06/03/1945 21/04/1945 47 days General
Boiler number 4612 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2530 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
312679
Swindon Works 04/06/1945 06/06/1945 3 days Running Repairs  
Swindon Works 14/06/1947 31/07/1947 48 days Intermediate
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
408371
Swindon Works 18/11/1947 03/12/1947 16 days Running Repairs  
Swindon Works 08/06/1949 22/07/1949 45 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2861 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
486298
Swindon Works 05/12/1949 21/12/1949 17 days Light Casual
Tender number 2679 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 20/02/1951 21/03/1951 30 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4067 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
566157
Swindon Works 06/10/1952 07/11/1952 33 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4060 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
646659
Swindon Works 05/01/1954 01/03/1954 56 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
720581
Swindon Works 06/09/1955 12/10/1955 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
817198
Swindon Works 28/01/1956 18/04/1956 82 days Heavy Casual
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 06/05/1957 17/07/1957 73 days Heavy Intermediate
Tender number 2736 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
903586
Swindon Works 13/12/1958 03/02/1959 53 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7644 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
993964
Swindon Works 10/10/1960 03/12/1960 55 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7625 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1089719

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1939 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2784    
16/06/1939 To Service To service as GWR Number 5082, name: POWIS CASTLE
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)
Diagram HB boiler fitted
   
21/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 21/06/1939. Dep: 27/06/1939.    
01/1941 Naming Renamed 'SWORDFISH'    
10/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/02/1941. Dep: 08/04/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2598 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
12/09/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2821    
20/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 20/01/1943. Dep: 02/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2441 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/04/1943 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2413    
11/11/1943 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2655    
24/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/11/1943. Dep: 21/12/1943.    
04/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Weston-super-Mare (Brd)    
05/1944 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
06/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1945. Dep: 21/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4612 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2530 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
04/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 04/06/1945. Dep: 06/06/1945.    
14/07/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2433    
13/08/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2871    
14/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/06/1947. Dep: 31/07/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4606 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2868 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
18/11/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Running Repairs) - Arr: 18/11/1947. Dep: 03/12/1947.    
08/06/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 22/07/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4608 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2861 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
05/12/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/12/1949. Dep: 21/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2679 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
20/02/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/02/1951. Dep: 21/03/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6652 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4067 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
06/10/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 07/11/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4060 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
07/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
05/01/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 05/01/1954. Dep: 01/03/1954.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/08/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2652    
06/09/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 06/09/1955. Dep: 12/10/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6696 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2659 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 28/01/1956. Dep: 18/04/1956.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2565 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/11/1956 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4070    
06/05/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1957. Dep: 17/07/1957.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2736 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/12/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/12/1958. Dep: 03/02/1959.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7644 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2398 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/10/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/10/1960. Dep: 03/12/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7625 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 2553 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
02/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 5082 from Old Oak Common (81A)    
12/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev