|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 30/08/1937 | 02/10/1937 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 25/10/1937 | 24/11/1937 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 02/05/1939 | 1 day | Intermediate | ||||
Swindon Works | 19/06/1939 | 03/07/1939 | 15 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
109214 | |
Swindon Works | 10/04/1941 | 08/06/1941 | 60 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2799 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
226780 | |
Swindon Works | 17/07/1943 | 13/09/1943 | 59 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 29/05/1945 | 11/07/1945 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2628 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
407862 | |
Swindon Works | 22/10/1946 | 06/12/1946 | 46 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2827 (Collett 4,000g Oil) attached. |
472104 | |
Swindon Works | 28/05/1948 | 21/07/1948 | 55 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 11/10/1948 | 09/11/1948 | 30 days | Light Repair | |||
Swindon Works | 09/11/1949 | 13/12/1949 | 35 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
556694 | |
Swindon Works | 16/08/1951 | 20/09/1951 | 36 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
633296 | |
Swindon Works | 27/04/1953 | 01/07/1953 | 66 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
715543 | |
Swindon Works | 19/03/1955 | 06/05/1955 | 49 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4097 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
803380 | |
Swindon Works | 09/03/1957 | 22/05/1957 | 75 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 7621 (Diagram HC) |
903274 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during December included the following: 100, 1943, 2132, 2792, 2809, 2825, 2837, 2840, 2844, 2851, 2891, 2912, 2955, 2980, 2989, 3016, 3026, 3040, 3804, 3829, 3838, 3865, 4025, 4038, 4059, 4080, 4704, 4950, 4955, 5001, 5023, 5039, 5060, 5063, 5079, 5083, 5085, 5349, 5374, 5376, 5380, 5926, 5956, 5961, 6009, 6029, 6333, 6354, 6929, 6933, 6935, 6956, 7320, and W.D. 77001. Works' pilots during the same period have included: 200, 207, 242, 1731, 1732, 1761, 2723, and 2773. Practically all 57XX going through the works are now receiving a top-feed boiler. Locos. noted recently so altered are: 3766, 6709, 8711, 8753, and 8780 NEA (the latter was seen at Paddington on 28/12, working empty stock!). 5083 Bath Abbey ('Castle') is an oil burner with large tender having different shape fuel tanks. New 'Counties' reported are: 1020 (SRD), 1021 (PDN), and 1022 (LA) | SLS/194702 |
31/05/1947 | General | No. 5083 (oil-burner) has been observed, fitted with cab backs extending about one-quarter of the way across the back and fitted with glass windows for running tender-first, etc. | SLS/194708 |
30/06/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. | SLS/194808 |
31/10/1948 | Swindon Works | New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered. Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn. |
SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4063, name: BATH ABBEY Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2917 |
||
07/06/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
07/06/1937 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5083 | ||
12/06/1937 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2723 | ||
28/06/1937 | Modification | Diagram HB number 6646 boiler fitted | ||
30/08/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937. | ||
02/10/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (NEA ) | ||
25/10/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1937. Dep: 24/11/1937. | ||
24/11/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Landore (LDR) | ||
02/05/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1939. | ||
14/06/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2645 | ||
19/06/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1939. Dep: 03/07/1939. Work undertaken: Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/04/1941. Dep: 08/06/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2799 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/07/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/07/1943. Dep: 13/09/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
31/03/1944 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2834 | ||
29/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1945. Dep: 11/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2628 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
22/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1946. Dep: 06/12/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2827 (Collett 4,000g Oil) attached. |
||
06/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
15/01/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2814 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
29/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD) | ||
30/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
28/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/05/1948. Dep: 21/07/1948. | ||
21/07/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) | ||
11/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1948. Dep: 09/11/1948. | ||
22/12/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2824 | ||
31/03/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2881 | ||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 13/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
16/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/08/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/04/1953. Dep: 01/07/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4097 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
09/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/03/1957. Dep: 22/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7621 (Diagram HC) |
||
07/01/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5083 from Worcester (85A) | ||
31/01/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |