Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 133 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 6522 Week
» 26964 Month
» 363810 Year
» 1585375 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4063 m/e 11/1922
Great Western Railway (Renum) 5083 on 07/06/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1922 BATH ABBEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class Star
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Star11/1922
Castle07/06/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 217
Works Number 2917
To Service During 11/1922
Withdrawal Wed 07/01/1959 off Worcester (85A)
Scrapping Sat 31/01/1959 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 36 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2723 11/1922 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 14/06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2583 23/06/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2799 03/06/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2433 09/09/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2834 31/03/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2628 11/07/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g Oil 2827 06/12/1946 GWR 4,000g
Collett 4,000g 2814 15/01/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2824 22/12/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2881 31/03/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2839 13/12/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4069 20/09/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2419 01/07/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4097 06/05/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1922
LDR Landore on 07/06/1937
NEA Neath (Court Sart) on 02/10/1937
LDR Landore on 24/11/1937
SDN Swindon on 06/12/1946
BRD Bristol Bath Road on 29/08/1947
SDN Swindon on 21/07/1948
85A Worcester m/e 06/1956
   Withdrawn on 07/01/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BRD Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC SDN Swindon m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 16/06/1956
WDN   m/e 31/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/06/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6646)
11/07/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6669)
06/12/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6674)
13/12/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6645)
20/09/1951 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4603)
01/07/1953 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6605)
06/05/1955 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4644)
22/05/1957 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7621)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 30/08/1937 02/10/1937 34 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 25/10/1937 24/11/1937 31 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 02/05/1939 1 day Intermediate  
Swindon Works 19/06/1939 03/07/1939 15 days Light Repair
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
109214
Swindon Works 10/04/1941 08/06/1941 60 days Intermediate
Tender number 2799 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
226780
Swindon Works 17/07/1943 13/09/1943 59 days Intermediate
Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 29/05/1945 11/07/1945 44 days General
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2628 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
407862
Swindon Works 22/10/1946 06/12/1946 46 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2827 (Collett 4,000g Oil) attached.
472104
Swindon Works 28/05/1948 21/07/1948 55 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 11/10/1948 09/11/1948 30 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 09/11/1949 13/12/1949 35 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
556694
Swindon Works 16/08/1951 20/09/1951 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
633296
Swindon Works 27/04/1953 01/07/1953 66 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
715543
Swindon Works 19/03/1955 06/05/1955 49 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4097 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
803380
Swindon Works 09/03/1957 22/05/1957 75 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7621 (Diagram HC)
903274

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during December included the following: 100, 1943, 2132, 2792, 2809, 2825, 2837, 2840, 2844, 2851, 2891, 2912, 2955, 2980, 2989, 3016, 3026, 3040, 3804, 3829, 3838, 3865, 4025, 4038, 4059, 4080, 4704, 4950, 4955, 5001, 5023, 5039, 5060, 5063, 5079, 5083, 5085, 5349, 5374, 5376, 5380, 5926, 5956, 5961, 6009, 6029, 6333, 6354, 6929, 6933, 6935, 6956, 7320, and W.D. 77001. Works' pilots during the same period have included: 200, 207, 242, 1731, 1732, 1761, 2723, and 2773. Practically all 57XX going through the works are now receiving a top-feed boiler. Locos. noted recently so altered are: 3766, 6709, 8711, 8753, and 8780 NEA (the latter was seen at Paddington on 28/12, working empty stock!). 5083 Bath Abbey ('Castle') is an oil burner with large tender having different shape fuel tanks. New 'Counties' reported are: 1020 (SRD), 1021 (PDN), and 1022 (LA) SLS/194702
31/05/1947 General No. 5083 (oil-burner) has been observed, fitted with cab backs extending about one-quarter of the way across the back and fitted with glass windows for running tender-first, etc. SLS/194708
30/06/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during June included: Nos 1003, 1338, 1436/49, 1782, 2135, 2816/18/29/57/85/95, 2920/40, 3802, 4031/34/83, 4805, 4908/16/52/99. 5013/16/17/26/43/51/54/72/83, 5341/53/71/79, 5411, 5908/54/72/87/99, 6007/16, 6300/01/05/16, 6400, W.D. 77325, 77407, 79266. New work (June): Nos. 7010 OXF, 7012 NYA, 7013 PDN are all painted pea green and lined out in red, cream and grey, while No. 7014 is being painted G.W. green-they are all fitted with smokebox number plates. No. 6910 has been painted black and lined out in red, cream and grey -a smokebox number plate has been fitted, while No. 7007 has had the G.W. coat of arms transfer placed on each middle splasher. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 and D.E. 15105 PDN. Nos. 1196 an 1197 were noted cut-up in the concentration yard, early in the month. Locomotives painted in the new livery, apart from new construction include: Nos. 4091, 5010/21 (green) and No. 6025 (blue); it is under-stood that No. 6001 has also been painted blue. All locomotives in the new livery have smokebox number plates, the actual figures being in brass. No. 7009, although in G.W.R. livery, has a smokebox number plate, as has No. 6022. SLS/194808
31/10/1948 Swindon Works New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered.
Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn.
SLS/194812

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1922 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4063, name: BATH ABBEY
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2917
   
07/06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
07/06/1937 Renumbered Renumbered to 5083    
12/06/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2723    
28/06/1937 Modification Diagram HB number 6646 boiler fitted    
30/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 30/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.    
02/10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (NEA )    
25/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1937. Dep: 24/11/1937.    
24/11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (LDR)    
02/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 02/05/1939.    
14/06/1939 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2645    
19/06/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1939. Dep: 03/07/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2583 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 10/04/1941. Dep: 08/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2799 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/07/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/07/1943. Dep: 13/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2433 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
31/03/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2834    
29/05/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1945. Dep: 11/07/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6669 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2628 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
22/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 22/10/1946. Dep: 06/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6674 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2827 (Collett 4,000g Oil) attached.
   
06/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
15/01/1947 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2814    
29/08/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
28/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/05/1948. Dep: 21/07/1948.    
21/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
11/10/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/10/1948. Dep: 09/11/1948.    
22/12/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2824    
31/03/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2881    
09/11/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 13/12/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6645 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2839 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/08/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/08/1951. Dep: 20/09/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4603 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4069 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
27/04/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/04/1953. Dep: 01/07/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2419 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
19/03/1955 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/03/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4097 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
09/03/1957 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 09/03/1957. Dep: 22/05/1957.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7621 (Diagram HC)
   
07/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 5083 from Worcester (85A)    

prev prev