Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 137 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7878 Week
» 28320 Month
» 365166 Year
» 1586731 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4064 m/e 12/1922
Great Western Railway (Renum) 5084 on 16/04/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1922 READING ABBEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class Star
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Star12/1922
Castle16/04/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 217
Works Number 2918
To Service During 12/1922
Withdrawal Tue 02/07/1963 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Scrapping During 12/1962 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 2 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2710 12/1922 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2812 26/01/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2627 25/09/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2561 02/12/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2558 23/05/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2580 15/08/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2744 21/12/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2551 24/06/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2530 21/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2909 07/05/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2623 07/11/1945 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2554 17/09/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2860 16/04/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2428 17/09/1948 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2645 30/05/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2867 12/04/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2773 10/04/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing 4128 17/03/1952 GWR 3,800g
Collett 4,000g 2773 20/03/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4085 22/08/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2926 17/06/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4116 19/10/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2799 22/10/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2695 16/05/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2563 01/07/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2794 03/1962 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1922
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 06/1937
WEY Weymouth Radipole (GWR) m/e 10/1937
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 11/1937
Brd Weston-super-Mare on 15/01/1943
BRD Bristol Bath Road m/e 02/1943
SDN Swindon on 21/05/1948
82A Bristol Bath Road on 22/08/1952
82C Swindon on 02/11/1952
81A Old Oak Common on 15/07/1955
82C Swindon on 01/09/1955
81A Old Oak Common on 19/10/1956
   Withdrawn on 02/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SDN Swindon m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   m/e 31/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/03/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted
02/12/1941 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6609)
07/11/1945 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6666)
17/09/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6665)
30/05/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4626)
10/04/1951 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4653)
22/08/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6626)
17/06/1954 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6616)
19/10/1956 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7667)
22/10/1958 Double Chimney fitted
22/10/1958 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7678)
01/07/1960 Diagram HD boiler fitted (number 7676)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 11/10/1938 29/11/1938 50 days Intermediate 117991
Swindon Works 11/12/1939 30/01/1940 51 days Intermediate
Tender number 2812 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
197683
Swindon Works 09/09/1940 28/09/1940 20 days Light Repair
Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/10/1941 06/12/1941 61 days General
Boiler number 6609 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2561 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
285841
Swindon Works 03/08/1942 16/08/1942 14 days Light Repair
Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 11/11/1943 24/12/1943 44 days Intermediate
Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
383120
Swindon Works 10/11/1944 21/12/1944 42 days Light Repair
Tender number 2530 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 03/04/1945 02/05/1945 30 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 01/10/1945 07/11/1945 38 days General
Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2623 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
455058
Swindon Works 13/08/1947 17/09/1947 36 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2554 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
539622
Swindon Works 03/05/1948 21/05/1948 19 days Light Repair  
Swindon Works 17/08/1948 17/09/1948 32 days Light Repair
Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 13/04/1949 30/05/1949 48 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
598324
Swindon Works 03/08/1949 15/08/1949 13 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 17/01/1950 06/02/1950 21 days Unclassified  
Swindon Works 31/03/1950 12/04/1950 13 days Unclassified
Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 08/03/1951 10/04/1951 34 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2773 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
670239
Swindon Works 15/07/1952 22/08/1952 39 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4085 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
741160
Swindon Works 08/05/1954 17/06/1954 41 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2926 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
824842
Swindon Works 27/07/1954 10/09/1954 46 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 03/01/1956 19/10/1956 291 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7667 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4116 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
899020
Swindon Works 12/09/1958 22/10/1958 41 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7678 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2799 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
1002753
Swindon Works 04/05/1960 01/07/1960 59 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7676 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2563 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
1098347

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1945 Swindon Works Locos entering works during October, 1945: 2184, 2206, 2530/41, 2638, 2805/14/72/3/82/8, 2915/33/46, 3025/36, 3656, 3810/3/66, 4016/7/32/40/4154/618/96, 4517/51/64/80, 4603/17/41/53/65, 4704, 4818/31/6, 4925/9/47, 5065/84, 5208/37, 5312/56/81, 5422, 5508/22/66/72, 5718/23, 5902/21/4/8/9/64 6000/6/9/24, 6116, 6378/9, 6437, 6732/9, 6955, 7214, 7719/26/40, 8741/6, 9304/17, 9702/64. L.M.S. 8402/6/14. L.N.E. K3 17. SLS/194602
31/08/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during August included: 992, 1004, 1758, 2023, 2280, 2289, 2409, 2568, 2818, 2833, 2886, 3170, 3375, 3582, 3845, 4015, 4021, 4049, 4055, 4082, 4701, 4800, 4924, 4931, 4945, 4957, 4989, 5006, 5049, 5056, 5069, 5084, 5088, 5094, 5318, 5337, 5347, 5353, 5370, 5913, 5922, 5923, 5940, 5962, 6333, 6909, 6931, an 6965. 2-8-0's which have recently been converted to oil-burning were ex Works as follows: Nos. 4809 (2845) 11/8, 4810 (2853) 13/8, 4857 (3831) 16/8 and 4811 (2847) 20/8. The construction of Lot 366 is under way and No. 6971 (coal-burning) is nearing completion. (16/9). SLS/194710
31/08/1948 Swindon Works New work August: No. 7016 CDF, 7017 G. J. Churchward PDN; 7430/32 STB, 7431/33 CNYD, 7434. No. 4160 is nearing completion (26/8). Locomotives entering Works during August included: Nos. *100A1, 1018, 1461, 1934/57, 2144, 2340, 2746/64, 2882, 2938/39, 3613/76, 3823/25/57, *3902, *3953, 4045/85, 4119, 4269, 4552, 4671, *4802, *4850, *4852, 4902/14/20/25/28/69/76, 5006/39/63/64/84, 5107/83, 5261, 5325, 5416/20, 5540, 5756, 5932/71/80/93, 6000/08/10/22, 6311/33/85, 6433. 6746, 6849/79, 6945/60, 7206/30, 7726/82, 7800/15, 8104, **8393, 8709, 9301. *Oil-burning. **Converted to 53XX. Works' pilots of late have been: Nos. 212 (since sent for scrap, w/e 21/8), 906, 1713, 1900, 2751 SLS/194810
30/04/1949 Swindon Works New Work April: Nos. *7903 Foremarke Hall (8/4), *7904 Fountains Hall (14/4), 7905 Fowey Hall LA (28/4); 9678 NA (1/4), 9679 CED (11/4), 9680 TYS (22/4), 9681 TDU (29/4). *Not allocated. Nos. 7903- 05 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 9678-81 are plain black. Nos. 7018 Cranbrook Castle and 7019 were nearly complete on 9/5 and the frames and cylinders for the first of the 15XX were in position for drilling. No. 4971 TN has been re-converted to coal-burning.
Locomotives entering Works during April included: Nos. 1003/15, 1418/48, 2014 (open cab), 2154 (open cab), 2213/34/65/73, 2812/50/55/61, 2908/12/42/50, 3011, 3666/86, 3737, 3846. 4051/75/88/94, 4138, 4267, 4500, 4663/89, 4805 (for re-conversion), 4908/15/22/41/49/86, 5016/44/54/56/69/74/84/89, 5311/53/60/82, 5523/39/55/74, 5800, 5970/73, 6018/28, 6351/63/67/93, 6812/16/41/48/60, 7236, 7749/53, 8703/43. Condemned: Nos. 47, 1758, 3592 (all to Concentration Yard), No. 277 (acting as Works' pilot). No. 3175 has been cut up in 'A' Shop. Nos. 6100/01/03/59 have had the footsteps set further inwards, to enable them to work on the Reading-Redhill line. No. 155 ex Works, has been fitted with a copper-capped parallel chimney replacing the tapered cast-iron one formerly carried. No. 3033, ex Works, now carries the frames, cylinders and cab sides of No. 3005 (condemned) and the boiler of No. 3033. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined include: Nos. 1003, 5931, 6907/33; Nos. 4003/07/49 are painted dark green and fully lined. The contents of the Stock Shed on 3/5 were:-Nos. 2948, 4124/68/69, 4914, 5153, 5411, 5919, 6915/19/97/8/9 an 7902.
SLS/194906
08/10/1950 Swindon Works On the occasion of the visit on 8/10/50, interesting engines were 7925 Westol Hall (83G), 6770, 9429 (RSH.7566/50), 8464 (YEC.2457/50), 7926 (not painted), 7924 Thornycroft Hall; new construction included 7927-7929 an 6771 onwards. The stock shed contained 5 Portishead, 992, 1366/69/71, 2014/7, 2195, 2754, 2894/5, 3453, 3645, 3666, 3866, 4055, 4901/25/56, 5068, 5084, 5086, 5523, 5534, 5700, 5924, 6102/7, 6716, 6915, 6924, 7037 (no name), 7923 Speke Hall; there were two new tanks in the running shed, 8422 an 9428 (RSH.7565/50). On the dump were 46, 281, 294, 422, 428, 1747, 1919, 1949, 1989, 2006, 2022, 2047, 2064, 2716, 2794, 3386, and S. & M. 'Coal Engines' 8108 (8182 & 8236 partly dismantled). It is reported that 8463 (0-6-0T) has no works plate, and that 9427 is RSH. 7564/50, but it may not be generally known that the makers' plates are fixed only to the left side leading splashers on these engines. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1922 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4064, name: READING ABBEY
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2918
   
24/03/1937 Modification Diagram HB number 6645 boiler fitted    
04/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2710    
16/04/1937 Renumbered Renumbered to 5084    
06/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
10/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (WEY)    
11/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
11/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/10/1938. Dep: 29/11/1938.    
11/12/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/12/1939. Dep: 30/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2812 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
09/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/09/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2627 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/10/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1941. Dep: 06/12/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6609 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2561 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
23/05/1942 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2558    
03/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/08/1942. Dep: 16/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
15/01/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Weston-super-Mare (Brd)    
02/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (BRD)    
11/11/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 11/11/1943. Dep: 24/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2744 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
24/06/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2551    
10/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/11/1944. Dep: 21/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2530 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/04/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/04/1945. Dep: 02/05/1945.    
07/05/1945 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2909    
01/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1945. Dep: 07/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6666 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2623 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/08/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/08/1947. Dep: 17/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6665 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2554 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/04/1948 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2860    
03/05/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/05/1948. Dep: 21/05/1948.    
21/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN)    
17/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2428 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/04/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 13/04/1949. Dep: 30/05/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4626 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2645 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/08/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1949. Dep: 15/08/1949.    
17/01/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/01/1950. Dep: 06/02/1950.    
31/03/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1950. Dep: 12/04/1950.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2867 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
08/03/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/03/1951. Dep: 10/04/1951.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4653 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2773 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/03/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 3,800g Self Weighing number 4128    
20/03/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2773    
15/07/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/07/1952. Dep: 22/08/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6626 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4085 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
22/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
02/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
08/05/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 08/05/1954. Dep: 17/06/1954.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6616 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2926 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
27/07/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1954. Dep: 10/09/1954.    
15/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
01/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
03/01/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 03/01/1956. Dep: 19/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7667 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 4116 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
19/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
12/09/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 12/09/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7678 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2799 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
Double Chimney fitted
   
16/05/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2695    
04/05/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/05/1960. Dep: 01/07/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7676 (Diagram HD)
Tender number 2563 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/1962 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2794    
02/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5084 from Old Oak Common (81A)    

prev prev