|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 25/06/1941 | 05/09/1941 | 73 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
112938 | |
Swindon Works | 23/08/1943 | 02/10/1943 | 41 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2673 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
222590 | |
Swindon Works | 24/03/1945 | 03/05/1945 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
298709 | |
Swindon Works | 03/12/1946 | 10/01/1947 | 39 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4002 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
395988 | |
Swindon Works | 21/10/1948 | 25/11/1948 | 36 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2588 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
494463 | |
Swindon Works | 19/06/1950 | 08/08/1950 | 51 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB) |
591512 | |
Swindon Works | 26/03/1952 | 20/05/1952 | 56 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) |
683016 | |
Swindon Works | 03/03/1954 | 15/04/1954 | 44 days | Heavy Intermediate | Tender number 2900 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
777242 | |
Swindon Works | 29/08/1955 | 11/10/1955 | 44 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6613 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
867339 | |
Swindon Works | 27/03/1957 | 27/08/1957 | 154 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2384 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
962637 | |
Swindon Works | 05/02/1959 | 15/05/1959 | 100 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2536 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1046883 | |
Swindon Works | 03/03/1961 | 26/04/1961 | 55 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6675 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4081 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1146004 | |
Swindon Works | 02/05/1961 | 10/05/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified | Tender number 2924 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Swindon Works | Locos. entering works during December included the following: 100, 1943, 2132, 2792, 2809, 2825, 2837, 2840, 2844, 2851, 2891, 2912, 2955, 2980, 2989, 3016, 3026, 3040, 3804, 3829, 3838, 3865, 4025, 4038, 4059, 4080, 4704, 4950, 4955, 5001, 5023, 5039, 5060, 5063, 5079, 5083, 5085, 5349, 5374, 5376, 5380, 5926, 5956, 5961, 6009, 6029, 6333, 6354, 6929, 6933, 6935, 6956, 7320, and W.D. 77001. Works' pilots during the same period have included: 200, 207, 242, 1731, 1732, 1761, 2723, and 2773. Practically all 57XX going through the works are now receiving a top-feed boiler. Locos. noted recently so altered are: 3766, 6709, 8711, 8753, and 8780 NEA (the latter was seen at Paddington on 28/12, working empty stock!). 5083 Bath Abbey ('Castle') is an oil burner with large tender having different shape fuel tanks. New 'Counties' reported are: 1020 (SRD), 1021 (PDN), and 1022 (LA) | SLS/194702 |
31/10/1948 | Swindon Works | New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered. Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn. |
SLS/194812 |
03/08/1963 | August Bank Holiday Saturday at Shrewsbury | I (C. H. Rodway. - SLS) decided that on August Bank Holiday Saturday this year to visit Shrewsbury to see how much steam working was left on Express Passenger Trains. Having not been to Shrewsbury for two years I was particularly anxious to film some steam engines working whilst there was still a chance. I was agreeably surprised to find, despite dieselisation, a considerable amount of steam was on long distance passenger trains. In the main most of the steam hauled passenger trains were being worked by Halls or Granges and the trains off the Crewe line were, as two years ago, a mixed bag. The first Class 8P of the day was 46248 City of Leeds which arrived on the 8-22 a.m. Manchester-Penzance. The pacific came off and was replaced by D821. The next train in, off the Crewe line, was the 8-45 a.m. Liverpool to Kingswear which arrived behind 45417 of Cricklewood. The Class 5 was detached and the substitute was the only Castle of the day. This was 5085 Evesham Abbey and was in a rather grimy condition. Another Class 5 which was a bit off its beaten track was 45302 of Northampton which arrived on the 9-15 a.m. Blackpool to Cardiff. Two Britannia Class 7Ps were seen, 70054 Dornoch Firth which was on the 9-20 a.m. Liverpool-Plymouth and 70052 Firth of Tay which took the 7-35 a.m. Cardiff-Blackpool forward from Shrewsbury. Only one 'Royal Scot' was observed, this was 46141 on the 10-25 a.m. Manchester-Bournemouth and it proceded to some point south of Shrewsbury. However, it could not have gone far as it returned on the 9-28 a.m. Bournemouth-Liverpool/Manchester. Shortly after this engine had passed on its return journey the second pacific put in an appearance, this was 46256 Sir William Stanier, F.R.S. which worked the 9-18 a.m. Exmouth-Manchester forward from Shrewsbury. The only County observed was 1013 County of Dorset which arrived on the 7-30 a.m. Paignton-Manchester 11 minutes early. The County was replaced by Jubilee 45590, one of the two seen working passenger trains, the other being 45591 which took the 12-10 Paddington-Birkenhead forward from Shrewsbury. 45699 Galatea was incidentally the station pilot engine. Two Class 8Fs were noted on passenger trains, 48418 on the 12-27 p.m. to Swansea Victoria and 48507 which brought the 10-15 a.m. Swansea Victoria to Crewe into Shrewsbury. Only two types of diesel engines were seen, the Western Class on trains to and from the Paddington line and Warships on trains to and from the Hereford line. The only exception to this was D1067 which arrived on the 11-05 a.m. Swansea-Manchester. The report would not, I feel, be complete without some reference to the time-keeping. This was, in the main, very good with most trains arriving no more than 5 minutes late. The only train that was seriously late during the morning was the 9-05 a.m. Birkenhead-Poole which arrived 29 minutes late behind Hall 6934. In consequence the 9-20 Liverpool-Plymouth was delayed a few minutes making connection. After then the timekeeping was good until late afternoon when the Bournemouth trains were about 20 minutes late and I suspect that the first one had been delayed by the 12-10 p.m. from Paddington which was 19 minutes late arriving. The Hereford line trains had up to that time been excellent but as I returned on the 2-45 p.m. from Birkenhead I was unable to record what time the 6-10 a.m. Penzance-Liverpool arrived, or what the punctuality of the ensuing trains were like. When I left at 4-54 there was no sign of the 6-10 a.m. from Penzance which was due at 4-00 p.m. |
SLS/196311 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4065, name: EVESHAM ABBEY Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2919 |
||
07/1939 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5085 | ||
07/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2729 | ||
13/07/1939 | Modification | Diagram HB number 6677 boiler fitted | ||
13/07/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
25/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 25/06/1941. Dep: 05/09/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2447 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
23/08/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1943. Dep: 02/10/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2673 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
18/03/1944 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2585 | ||
24/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1945. Dep: 03/05/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6629 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2814 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/12/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 03/12/1946. Dep: 10/01/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4002 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Old Oak Common (PDN) | ||
21/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 21/10/1948. Dep: 25/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4610 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2588 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
03/12/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4014 | ||
19/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/06/1950. Dep: 08/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB) |
||
26/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 26/03/1952. Dep: 20/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6688 (Diagram HB) |
||
14/06/1952 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4036 | ||
10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
03/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/03/1954. Dep: 15/04/1954. Work undertaken: Tender number 2900 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
29/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 29/08/1955. Dep: 11/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6613 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2749 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
27/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/03/1957. Dep: 27/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6681 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2384 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
05/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 05/02/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6655 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2536 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
11/07/1959 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4117 | ||
16/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
03/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/03/1961. Dep: 26/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6675 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4081 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1961. Dep: 10/05/1961. Work undertaken: Tender number 2924 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
13/02/1962 | To Store | To Store at St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
20/05/1962 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4013 | ||
11/08/1962 | Reinstated | Reinstated to Reading (W.R.) (81D) | ||
03/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
09/02/1963 | Allocation | Loaned to Llanelli (87F) | ||
09/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
14/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5085 from St Philips Marsh (82B) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hayes: Bridgend |