Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 200 Today
» 1192 Yesterday
» 4712 Week
» 27218 Month
» 330408 Year
» 1551973 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 4066 m/e 12/1922
Great Western Railway (Renum) 5086 on 11/12/1937

Names Carried
Date From Name
12/1922 VISCOUNT HORNE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class Star
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Star12/1922
Castle11/12/1937
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 217
Works Number 2920
To Service During 12/1922
Withdrawal Mon 10/11/1958 off Swindon (82C)
Scrapping During 12/1958 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Service Life 35 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2597 13/12/1937 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2661 28/11/1939 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2591 10/12/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2636 31/05/1941 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2597 30/07/1942 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2634 06/07/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2421 29/04/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2652 28/07/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2610 24/01/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2542 14/11/1947 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4015 11/04/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2862 26/09/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2563 20/11/1951 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4050 31/07/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4019 11/05/1953 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2603 09/02/1955 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4050 19/02/1957 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1922
SRD Stafford Road on 11/12/1937
4A Shrewsbury m/e 02/1938
SRD Stafford Road on 29/11/1939
4A Shrewsbury on 03/08/1942
   Stored (Shrewsbury) on 26/09/1950
85A Worcester (Reinstated) on 06/11/1950
82C Swindon on 30/12/1954
85A Worcester on 09/02/1955
82C Swindon on 03/10/1958
   Withdrawn on 10/11/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 02/12/1950
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 22/03/1958
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 19/04/1958
WDN   m/e 30/11/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
28/12/1937 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6672)
30/07/1942 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6622)
24/01/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6651)
14/11/1947 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6673)
11/04/1949 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6685)
26/09/1950 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4651)
29/01/1952 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6643)
11/05/1953 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4650)
09/02/1955 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6624)
19/02/1957 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6600)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 17/10/1939 29/11/1939 44 days Intermediate
Tender number 2661 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
114044
Swindon Works 08/11/1940 12/12/1940 35 days Light Repair
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 21/04/1941 02/06/1941 43 days Light Repair
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 26/05/1942 03/08/1942 70 days General
Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
241582
Swindon Works 09/06/1943 12/07/1943 34 days Light Repair
Tender number 2634 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
 
Swindon Works 07/03/1944 06/05/1944 61 days Intermediate
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
328634
Swindon Works 19/12/1945 24/01/1946 37 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6651 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
411699
Swindon Works 10/10/1947 14/11/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 6673 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
491567
Swindon Works 17/02/1949 11/04/1949 54 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4015 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
546422
Swindon Works 21/08/1950 26/09/1950 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
605259
Swindon Works 26/11/1951 29/01/1952 65 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
666948
Swindon Works 27/03/1953 11/05/1953 46 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4019 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
737456

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 Swindon Works Locos. entering Works during September included:-907, 1011, 1012, 2054, 2066, 2262, 2737, 2804, 2814, 2826, 3014, 3036, 3562, 3809, 3840, 4033, 4054, 4090, 4092, 4920, 4929, 4930, 4944, 4983, 4985, 4997, 5041, 5052, 5056, 5060, 5061, 5065, 5076, 5080, 5086, 5905, 5912, 5938, 5991, 6808, 6831, 6876, 7817, 7819, W.D.77508 an 78542; the latter having been stored since last July. The following were ex Works as follows:-Nos. 6972 (4/10), 6973 (8/10), 6974 (14/10), 6975 (18/10), 6976 (29/10), 79274 (7/10), 78543 (16/10). Works' pilots recently have been Nos. 200, 242, 2723, 2731, 3561. SLS/194712
08/10/1950 Swindon Works On the occasion of the visit on 8/10/50, interesting engines were 7925 Westol Hall (83G), 6770, 9429 (RSH.7566/50), 8464 (YEC.2457/50), 7926 (not painted), 7924 Thornycroft Hall; new construction included 7927-7929 an 6771 onwards. The stock shed contained 5 Portishead, 992, 1366/69/71, 2014/7, 2195, 2754, 2894/5, 3453, 3645, 3666, 3866, 4055, 4901/25/56, 5068, 5084, 5086, 5523, 5534, 5700, 5924, 6102/7, 6716, 6915, 6924, 7037 (no name), 7923 Speke Hall; there were two new tanks in the running shed, 8422 an 9428 (RSH.7565/50). On the dump were 46, 281, 294, 422, 428, 1747, 1919, 1949, 1989, 2006, 2022, 2047, 2064, 2716, 2794, 3386, and S. & M. 'Coal Engines' 8108 (8182 & 8236 partly dismantled). It is reported that 8463 (0-6-0T) has no works plate, and that 9427 is RSH. 7564/50, but it may not be generally known that the makers' plates are fixed only to the left side leading splashers on these engines. SLS/195012

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1922 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 4066, name: VISCOUNT HORNE
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2920
   
13/12/1937 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2597    
28/12/1937 Modification Diagram HB number 6672 boiler fitted    
28/12/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
28/12/1937 Renumbered Renumbered to 5086    
02/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
17/10/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 17/10/1939. Dep: 29/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2661 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
29/11/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (SRD)    
08/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/11/1940. Dep: 12/12/1940.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2591 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/04/1941. Dep: 02/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2636 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1942. Dep: 03/08/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6622 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2597 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
03/08/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (4A)    
09/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/06/1943. Dep: 12/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2634 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
07/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 07/03/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2421 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
28/07/1944 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2652    
19/12/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 19/12/1945. Dep: 24/01/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6651 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2610 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
10/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1947. Dep: 14/11/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6673 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2542 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
17/02/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1949. Dep: 11/04/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4015 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
21/08/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 21/08/1950. Dep: 26/09/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4651 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2862 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
26/09/1950 To Store To Store at Shrewsbury (84G)    
06/11/1950 Reinstated Reinstated to Worcester (85A)    
20/11/1951 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2563    
26/11/1951 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 29/01/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6643 (Diagram HB)
   
31/07/1952 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4050    
27/03/1953 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 27/03/1953. Dep: 11/05/1953.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4650 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4019 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
30/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
09/02/1955 Modification Diagram HB number 6624 boiler fitted    
09/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
09/02/1955 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2603    
19/02/1957 Modification Diagram HB number 6600 boiler fitted    
19/02/1957 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4050    
03/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (82C)    
10/11/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 5086 from Swindon (82C)    

prev prev