Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 106 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 5915 Week
» 13099 Month
» 321080 Year
» 1205461 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 4067 m/e 01/1923
GWR (Renum) 5087   03/12/1940

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/1923 TINTERN ABBEY

Locomotive Specifics
Designer G. Churchward
Class Star
Company History GWR
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
Star01/1923
Castle03/12/1940
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 217
Works Number 2921
To Service During 01/1923
Withdrawal Thu 01/08/1963 off Llanelly (87F)
Scrapping During 01/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 40 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Tenders
Type Number From Company Water Coal
Collett 4,000g 2650 11/1940 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2653 16/03/1943 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2843 01/12/1944 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4007 12/12/1946 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2666 24/02/1949 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2687 04/11/1950 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4106 26/09/1952 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 4015 30/00/1954 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4067 16/10/1956 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2622 30/04/1958 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Collett 4,000g 2535 16/05/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4107 05/09/1959 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4102 02/05/1960 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt
Hawksworth 4,000g 4121 22/11/1961 GWR 4,000g 6t 0cwt

Allocations
Code Name From Date
PDN Old Oak Common 03/12/1940
SDN Swindon (test plant) 10/02/1949
PDN Old Oak Common 24/02/1949
SDN Swindon (test plant) 04/04/1949
PDN Old Oak Common 02/05/1949
87F Llanelly 11/01/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 09/07/1962
87F Llanelly 13/08/1962
   Withdrawn 01/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 87F Llanelly 4w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   03/08/1963
WDN   5w/e 31/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/12/1940 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6679)
01/12/1944 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4658)
12/12/1946 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6605)
19/01/1949 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4658)
12/10/1950 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6658)
26/09/1952 Diagram HA boiler fitted (number 4657)
16/10/1956 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6676)
30/04/1958 Diagram HB boiler fitted (number 6648)
02/05/1960 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7608)
22/11/1961 Diagram HC boiler fitted (number 7609)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Swindon Works 14/01/1943 17/03/1943 63 days Intermediate
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
117798
Swindon Works 13/10/1944 01/12/1944 50 days General
Boiler number 4658 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
200412
Swindon Works 06/11/1946 12/12/1946 37 days Intermediate
Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
300819
Swindon Works 14/12/1948 19/01/1949 37 days Heavy General
Boiler number 4658 (Diagram HA)
408821
Swindon Works 07/09/1950 12/10/1950 36 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB)
500638
Swindon Works 20/08/1952 26/09/1952 38 days Heavy Casual
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4106 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
594964
Swindon Works 25/06/1954 30/08/1954 67 days Heavy Intermediate 677814
Swindon Works 03/03/1956 16/10/1956 228 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4067 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
767516
Swindon Works 26/11/1956 12/12/1956 17 days Light Casual  
Swindon Works 19/03/1958 30/04/1958 43 days Heavy General
Boiler number 6648 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
850339
Swindon Works 27/02/1960 02/05/1960 66 days Heavy Intermediate
Boiler number 7608 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4102 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
955536
Swindon Works 16/09/1961 22/11/1961 68 days Heavy General
Boiler number 7609 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4121 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
1024552

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1923 To Service To service as GWR Number 4067, name: TINTERN ABBEY
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2921
   
11/1940 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2650    
03/12/1940 Modification Diagram HB number 6679 boiler fitted    
03/12/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
03/12/1940 Renumbered Renumbered to 5087    
14/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 14/01/1943. Dep: 17/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
13/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1944. Dep: 01/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4658 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 2843 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
06/11/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 06/11/1946. Dep: 12/12/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6605 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4007 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
14/12/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 14/12/1948. Dep: 19/01/1949.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4658 (Diagram HA)
   
10/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) (test plant)    
24/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
24/02/1949 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2666    
04/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Swindon (SDN) (test plant)    
02/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (PDN)    
07/09/1950 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 07/09/1950. Dep: 12/10/1950.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6658 (Diagram HB)
   
04/11/1950 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2687    
20/08/1952 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 20/08/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 4657 (Diagram HA)
Tender number 4106 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
30/00/1954 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 4015    
25/06/1954 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 25/06/1954. Dep: 30/08/1954.    
03/03/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/03/1956. Dep: 16/10/1956.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6676 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 4067 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
26/11/1956 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/11/1956. Dep: 12/12/1956.    
19/03/1958 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 30/04/1958.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6648 (Diagram HB)
Tender number 2622 (Collett 4,000g) attached.
   
16/05/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2535    
05/09/1959 Tender Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4107    
27/02/1960 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 27/02/1960. Dep: 02/05/1960.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7608 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4102 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
16/09/1961 Works Visit Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 16/09/1961. Dep: 22/11/1961.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 7609 (Diagram HC)
Tender number 4121 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached.
   
12/11/1961 Sightings Swindon Works visit: Around the Works - "A" shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
11/01/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
09/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
13/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Llanelly (87F)    
01/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 5087 from Llanelly (87F)    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev