|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swindon Works | 28/03/1941 | 20/05/1941 | 54 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
112203 | |
Swindon Works | 02/04/1942 | 07/05/1942 | 36 days | Light Repair | Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 16/06/1943 | 12/08/1943 | 58 days | Intermediate | Tender number 2751 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
228947 | |
Swindon Works | 11/03/1946 | 13/04/1946 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
346194 | |
Swindon Works | 13/02/1948 | 23/03/1948 | 40 days | Intermediate | Boiler number 6619 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2536 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
412910 | |
Swindon Works | 14/04/1948 | 20/04/1948 | 7 days | Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 31/05/1950 | 21/07/1950 | 52 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
507215 | |
Swindon Works | 01/01/1952 | 07/02/1952 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
599 | |
Swindon Works | 11/05/1953 | 16/06/1953 | 37 days | Light Casual | Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
Swindon Works | 02/09/1953 | 19/10/1953 | 48 days | Heavy General | Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4038 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
694630 | |
Swindon Works | 08/04/1954 | 03/05/1954 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Swindon Works | 04/03/1955 | 02/04/1955 | 30 days | Heavy General | |||
Swindon Works | 11/02/1957 | 24/04/1957 | 73 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2588 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
893100 | |
Swindon Works | 11/12/1958 | 28/01/1959 | 49 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4119 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
1001085 | |
Swindon Works | 24/08/1960 | 19/10/1960 | 57 days | Heavy Intermediate | Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2638 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
1087493 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1946 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during March: 111, 1010, 2026/55, 2103, 2204/12/54, 2816/39/46/9, 2924/39/48/79, 3010/5/20, 3171, 3446, 3632, 3715/93 3855, 4012/33/5/55/79/82, 4136, 4365, 4565/70 4702, 4830/67, 4917/37/58/84/5, 5004/8/49/71/90, 5153/86/93, 5310/38/84/97, 5420, 5505/31/53, 5787,-5967/99, 6000/17/25/8, 6114/21/50/1, 6365/74/86/8 6417, 6916/8/41, 7312, 7713/32, 7802/10, 9721/60/3/80/7/90/6. Nameplates have been affixed to 1000/17-9, 6916/32/38/46/67. With the completion of 1019, there is a temporary halt in the programme of construction of '1000' Class locomotives and work is under way on new 'Castle' and 'Hall' Class locomotives. | SLS/194606 |
29/02/1948 | Swindon Works | Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender | SLS/194804 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/01/1901 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4105 | ||
02/1923 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 4070, name: NEATH ABBEY Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 2924 |
||
03/1937 | Modification | Modification: 'Elbow' pattern outside steam pipes fitted | ||
22/04/1939 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2779 | ||
01/05/1939 | Modification | Diagram HB number 6676 boiler fitted | ||
01/05/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Laira (LA) | ||
01/05/1939 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5090 | ||
28/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 28/03/1941. Dep: 20/05/1941. Work undertaken: Tender number 2620 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 02/04/1942. Dep: 07/05/1942. Work undertaken: Tender number 2540 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/10/1942 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2682 | ||
16/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 16/06/1943. Dep: 12/08/1943. Work undertaken: Tender number 2751 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
17/05/1944 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2642 | ||
11/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1946. Dep: 13/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6670 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2630 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/06/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2412 | ||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Laira (LA) | ||
04/10/1947 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2896 | ||
30/01/1948 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2563 | ||
13/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Intermediate) - Arr: 13/02/1948. Dep: 23/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6619 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2536 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
14/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Casual) - Arr: 14/04/1948. Dep: 20/04/1948. | ||
21/05/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2565 | ||
03/12/1949 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2569 | ||
28/01/1950 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2536 | ||
31/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 31/05/1950. Dep: 21/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6623 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2580 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
01/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/01/1952. Dep: 07/02/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4648 (Diagram HA) Tender number 2653 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Worcester (85A) | ||
11/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/05/1953. Dep: 16/06/1953. Work undertaken: Tender number 2386 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
02/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 02/09/1953. Dep: 19/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 4644 (Diagram HA) Tender number 4038 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
08/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/04/1954. Dep: 03/05/1954. | ||
04/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy General) - Arr: 04/03/1955. Dep: 02/04/1955. | ||
21/04/1955 | Modification | Diagram HB number 6658 boiler fitted | ||
21/04/1955 | Tender | Tender fitted: Hawksworth 4,000g number 4051 | ||
11/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1957. Dep: 24/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6683 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2588 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
20/03/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) | ||
11/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/12/1958. Dep: 28/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6602 (Diagram HB) Tender number 4119 (Hawksworth 4,000g) attached. |
||
24/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Swindon Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/08/1960. Dep: 19/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 6685 (Diagram HB) Tender number 2638 (Collett 4,000g) attached. |
||
19/10/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
31/12/1960 | Tender | Tender fitted: Collett 4,000g number 2769 | ||
31/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 5090 from Old Oak Common (81A) | ||
12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |