Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 2319 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15725 Week
» 68741 Month
» 188268 Year
» 3215121 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D5092 |
15/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
24092 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
24 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Bo-Bo |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4610 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
15/07/1960 to Cricklewood East (14A) |
Withdrawn |
04/10/1975 |
Time in Service |
15 yrs, 2 mths , 19 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1976 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Swindon) |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
15/07/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 05/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
12/1971 |
|
Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/07/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
12/1971 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
Modified Triple Valve Brake |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
09/06/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D5092 Built at Crewe Works Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A) Livery applied: Green all over with a narrow white band around the bottom of the bodywork |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
12/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to London Division (D01) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
12/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Fitted with Modified Triple Valve (MTV) Brakes |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 24092 |
|
|
04/10/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 24092 |
|
|
12/1976 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|