Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 680 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14086 Week
» 67102 Month
» 186629 Year
» 3213482 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Western Railway |
5106 |
m/e |
11/1929 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
C. Collett |
Class |
5101 |
Company History |
GWR |
Wheels |
2-6-2T |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
257 |
To Service |
During 11/1929 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 14/03/1960 |
Service Life |
30 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
84E |
Tyseley |
m/e |
31/10/1951 |
ALLOC |
84E |
Tyseley |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
ALLOC |
84E |
Tyseley |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
ALLOC |
84E |
Tyseley |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
ALLOC |
84A |
Stafford Road |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
ALLOC |
83D |
Laira |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1929 |
To Service |
To service as Great Western Railway Number 5106 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tyseley (TYS) |
|
|
31/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
29/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
31/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
30/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyseley (84E) |
|
|
29/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A) |
|
|
02/11/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (83D) |
|
|
14/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 5106 |
|
|
06/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|